Smith v. Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp.
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SMITH
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.
Case Number: 2:2023cv04351
Filed: August 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2023. (jqb, )
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/23/2023. (lag, )
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Today's Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held at 12:30 p.m. instead of 4:00 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. Please mark your calendar accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/11/2023. (jqb, )
September 7, 2023 Filing 16 Joint Discovery Plan by MICHAEL SMITH.(WIETZKE, MARC)
August 28, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC T. WIETZKE on behalf of MICHAEL SMITH (WIETZKE, MARC)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel must become an e-filer by 9/7/2023. Defendant's counsel will kindly mail today's notices to the Plaintiff by 8/25/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/23/2023. (jqb, )
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2023 at 4:00 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 9/7/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/23/2023. (jqb, )
August 11, 2023 Filing 12 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-03725. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 11, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
August 3, 2023 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey.(yv)
August 3, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/3/2023 by Telephone Conference. Sean Constable present by telephone for Plaintiff. Kyle Costa present by telephone for Defendant. Case to be transferred to the District of New Jersey. (mf)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/3/23) (yv) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
August 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Patrick Constable on behalf of Michael Smith..(Constable, Sean)
July 31, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp...(Costa, Kyle)
July 28, 2023 Filing 8 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Michael Smith..(Wietzke, Marc)
June 26, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp. waiver sent on 5/5/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. Document filed by Michael Smith..(Wietzke, Marc)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on August 3, 2023, at 12:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to the conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-lewis-j-liman. This document should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, which are available on the same webpage. Parties should consult the Individual Practices for guidance on the matters to be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference and for the Court's rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other procedural matters. The time period for any Defendant intending to move to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 12 will be extended until further order of the Court upon the filing of a simple letter with the Court within the time permitted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a) and prior to the time the above-mentioned submission is made. Such letter should simply indicate in one sentence the Defendant's intent to make a motion to dismiss. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify Defendant of this Notice. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 8/3/2023 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/22/23) (yv)
May 4, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp...(jgo)
May 4, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Twyman Wietzke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau;. (jgo)
May 4, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 4, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 4, 2023 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 3, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc)
May 3, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc) Modified on 5/4/2023 (jgo).
May 3, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Smith..(Wietzke, Marc)
May 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27692833)Document filed by Michael Smith..(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Port Authority Trans Hudson Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SMITH
Represented By: MARC T. WIETZKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.
Represented By: KYLE COSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?