GORDON et al v. ABRAHAM et al
Plaintiff: SHAKEERAH L. GORDON and CARL J. CHAPMAN
Defendant: KEREN ABRAHAM, KELLER WILLIAMS VILLAGE SQUARE REALTY, PANKAJ SAVALIYA and SALLY PONCHAK
Case Number: 2:2023cv11807
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Filing 18 First MOTION to Dismiss Time-Barred Claims in Plaintiff's Complaint by KEREN ABRAHAM, SALLY PONCHAK. Responses due by 11/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification Vito Pinto, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PINTO, VITO)
October 5, 2023 Filing 17 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to SHAKEERAH L. GORDON (ld, )
October 3, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHAKEERAH L. GORDON, CARL J. CHAPMAN. KEREN ABRAHAM served on 10/2/2023, answer due 10/23/2023; SALLY PONCHAK served on 10/2/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (ld, )
October 3, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHAKEERAH L. GORDON, CARL J. CHAPMAN. PANKAJ SAVALIYA served on 9/29/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. (ld, )
September 27, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KEREN ABRAHAM, SALLY PONCHAK, PANKAJ SAVALIYA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
September 25, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KEREN ABRAHAM, PANKAJ SAVALIYA, SALLY PONCHAK., filed by SHAKEERAH L. GORDON; CARL J. CHAPMAN.(ld, )
September 25, 2023 Filing 12 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by CARL J. CHAPMAN (ld)
September 25, 2023 Filing 11 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by SHAKEERAH L. GORDON (ld)
September 25, 2023 Filing 10 Letter request to issue summons from SHAKEERAH L. GORDON, CARL J. CHAPMAN. (ld, )
September 21, 2023 Filing 9 Copy of Letter Order, D.E. #8 , Sent to pro se Plaintiffs by Certified and Regular U.S. Mail. (mfr)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER re #7 Letter: Plaintiff's are directed to file and serve the Amended Complaint on or before October 6, 2023 consistent with the applicable Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk's Office is directed to send a copy of this Order to pro se Plaintiffs by regular U.S. mail and certified mail/return receipt requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/21/2023. (mfr)
September 20, 2023 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Plaintiffs requesting to amend the Complaint to correct the list of Defendants: SALLY PONCHAK, KAREN ABRAHAM, and PANKAJ SAVALIYA. (ld)
September 18, 2023 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Plaintiffs requesting to amend the Complaint to correct the list of Defendants: SALLY PONCHAK, KAREN ABRAHAM, and PANKAJ SAVALIYA. (dam)
September 18, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #6 Letter Motion submitted by Plaintiffs SHAKEERAH L. GORDON and CARL J. CHAPMAN on 9/18/2023 did not contain a proper signature. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SCANNED OR WET SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (Notice of Mail) (dam)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of pro se Plaintiff' letter request of 9/7/23, (EC No. 4), seeking an extension of time to file an Amended Complaint. The request is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file and serve their Amended Complaint on or before 10/8/23. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiffs by regular U.S. mail. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/11/23. (jbb)
September 7, 2023 Filing 4 Letter request to Judge Martinotti for an extension of time to Amend Complaint to include additional Defendant and to Serve all Defendants the Amended Complaint from SHAKEERAH L. GORDON, CARL J. CHAPMAN. (ld)(n/m)
August 28, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KEREN ABRAHAM, KELLER WILLIAMS VILLAGE SQUARE REALTY, PANKAJ SAVALIYA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (adc, )
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (adc, )
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEREN ABRAHAM, KELLER WILLIAMS VILLAGE SQUARE REALTY, PANKAJ SAVALIYA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number NEW48898), filed by SHAKEERAH L. GORDON, CARL J. CHAPMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(adc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GORDON et al v. ABRAHAM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAKEERAH L. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL J. CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEREN ABRAHAM
Represented By: VITO A. PINTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLER WILLIAMS VILLAGE SQUARE REALTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANKAJ SAVALIYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALLY PONCHAK
Represented By: VITO A. PINTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?