IN RE: FRAGRANCE END-USER PLAINTIFF ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff: MIRLINDA ELMAZI
Defendant: DSM-FIRMENICH AG, FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL SA, FIRMENICH INC., GIVAUDAN SA, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORP., GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORP., UNGERER & COMPANY, INC., CUSTOM ESSENCE INC., INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC., SYMRISE AG, SYMRISE INC., SYMRISE US LLC and AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC.
In Re: FRAGRANCE END-USER PLAINTIFF ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Consolidated Plaintiff: YVONNE PEYCHAL
Interested Party: ANDREA HOGAN, SANDRA KLUESSENDORF, MASEES SKENDERIAN, FRANK NOVAK and DANIEL NABAVIAN
Case Number: 2:2023cv16127
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK on behalf of AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., FIRMENICH INC. (KULIK, SARAH)
November 2, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL on behalf of AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., FIRMENICH INC. (MCCONNELL, SEAN)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER consolidating Civil Action Nos. 2:23-cv-16127-WJM-JSA and 2:23-cv-16242-WJM-JSA for all purposes. The Clerk of the Court shall establish 2:23-cv-16127-WJM-JSA as the LEAD Docket. Any end-user plaintiff actions related to the Actions that are subsequently filed or transferred to this District, or to be filed or transferred, shall be consolidated herewith. The Court appoints Kellie Lerner and Kimberly Justice as EUP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Michael Fitzgerald as EUP Liaison Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/1/2023. (dam)
October 18, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Support filed by MASEES SKENDERIAN, FRANK NOVAK, DANIEL NABAVIAN re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Interested Parties' Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Related Cases Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a) and Appoint Interim Co- Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(g) (CALDES, WILLIAM)
October 2, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, BENJAMIN D. STEINBERG, ESQ., JORDAN B. FINKEL, ESQ., and ELLEN G. JALKUT, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
September 27, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ellen G. Jalkut to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FITZGERALD, MICHAEL)
September 27, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jordan B. Finkel to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FITZGERALD, MICHAEL)
September 27, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Benjamin D. Steinberg to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FITZGERALD, MICHAEL)
September 26, 2023 Pro Hac Vice fee: $450.00, receipt number NEW49049 as to BENJAMIN D. STEINBERG, ELLEN GULBRANDSEN JALKUT & JORDAN BLAKE FINKEL. (ps)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jordan Blake Finkel, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/19/2023. (ld, )
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ellen Gulbrandsen Jalkut, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/19/2023. (ld, )
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin D. Steinberg, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/19/2023. (ld, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jordan Finkel by MIRLINDA ELMAZI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blake Finkel, Esq. In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Order Granting Jordan Finkel Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Service)(LERNER, KELLIE)
September 18, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ellen Jalkut by MIRLINDA ELMAZI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ellen Gulbrandsen Jalkut, Esq. In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Order Granting Ellen Jalkut Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Service)(LERNER, KELLIE)
September 18, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Benjamin D. Steinberg by MIRLINDA ELMAZI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin D. Steinberg, Esq. In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Order Granting Benjamin D. Steinberg Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Service)(LERNER, KELLIE)
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., CUSTOM ESSENCE INC., DSM-FIRMENICH AG, FIRMENICH INC., FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL SA, GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORP., GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORP., GIVAUDAN SA, INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC., SYMRISE AG, SYMRISE INC., SYMRISE US LLC, UNGERER & COMPANY, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
September 13, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Motion set for 10/2/2023 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 12, 2023 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Support filed by ANDREA HOGAN, SANDRA KLUESSENDORF re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Interested Parties Response in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate Related Cases Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a) and Appoint Interim Co- Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(g) (CALDES, WILLIAM)
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by MIRLINDA ELMAZI. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Related Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(A) and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G), #2 Declaration of Kellie Lerner in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Related Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(A) and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate, #6 Plaintiffs' Certificate of Service)(LERNER, KELLIE)
September 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLIE LERNER on behalf of MIRLINDA ELMAZI (LERNER, KELLIE)
September 6, 2023 Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps)
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., CUSTOM ESSENCE INC., DSM-FIRMENICH AG, FIRMENICH INC., FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL SA, GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORP., GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORP., GIVAUDAN SA, INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC., SYMRISE AG, SYMRISE INC., SYMRISE US LLC, UNGERER & COMPANY, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14644061) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MIRLINDA ELMAZI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FITZGERALD, MICHAEL) Modified on 9/5/2023 (ld).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: FRAGRANCE END-USER PLAINTIFF ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRLINDA ELMAZI
Represented By: MICHAEL D FITZGERALD
Represented By: KELLIE LERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSM-FIRMENICH AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRMENICH INC.
Represented By: SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNGERER & COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUSTOM ESSENCE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYMRISE AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYMRISE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYMRISE US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC.
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL
Represented By: SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: FRAGRANCE END-USER PLAINTIFF ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: YVONNE PEYCHAL
Represented By: WILLIAM GERALD CALDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ANDREA HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SANDRA KLUESSENDORF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MASEES SKENDERIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FRANK NOVAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DANIEL NABAVIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?