POLICASTRO v. NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC.
Plaintiff: WILLIAM POLICASTRO
Defendant: NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC.
Case Number: 2:2023cv20924
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC..(HART, THOMAS)
October 16, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM POLICASTRO. NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC. served on 10/9/2023, answer due 10/30/2023. (DUCKWORTH, JAMES)
October 6, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
October 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14766718) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WILLIAM POLICASTRO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(DUCKWORTH, JAMES) Modified on 10/6/2023 (jd, ).
October 5, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
October 5, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POLICASTRO v. NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM POLICASTRO
Represented By: JAMES M. DUCKWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?