Cuyahoga County v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Plaintiff: Cuyahoga County
Defendant: EVERNORTH HEALTH INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, Express Scripts Inc., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC, CAREMARK L.L.C., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Optum Inc., Optumrx Inc. and OptumInsight Inc.
In Re: INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2023cv21082
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Filing 24 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-01740. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 11, 2023 Filing 23 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 3) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL No. 3080 Insulin Pricing Litigation. Case transferred to District of New Jersey and assigned to the Honorable Brian R. Martinotti. (M,CE)
October 11, 2023 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, )
October 11, 2023 Member Case Direct File on 10/11/2023, for MDL 3080 INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION. (krg)
October 11, 2023 This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found #here. (krg, )
September 22, 2023 Filing 22 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon UnitedHealth Group, Inc. on 9/8/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 21 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC on 9/8/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 20 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon OptumRx Inc. on 9/8/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 19 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon OptumInsight, Inc. on 9/7/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 18 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon Optum, Inc. on 9/8/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 17 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon Novo Nordisk Inc. on 9/8/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 16 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon Medco Health Solutions, Inc. on 9/7/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 15 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon Express Scripts, Inc. on 9/7/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 14 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. on 9/7/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 13 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon Express Scripts Administrators, LLC on 9/7/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 12 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon Evernorth Health, Inc. on 9/7/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 11 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. on 9/8/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 10 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon Eli Lilly and Company on 9/7/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 9 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon CVS Pharmacy, Inc. on 9/7/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 8 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon CVS Health Corporation on 9/8/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 7 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon Caremark PCS Health, LLC on 9/7/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 6 Return of Service by commercial carrier signature required executed upon Caremark, LLC on 9/7/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 22, 2023 Filing 5 Return of Service by Commercial Carrier with signature required executed upon Caremark RX, LLC on 9/8/2023, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Reichard, Joyce)
September 6, 2023 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Evernorth Health, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc., Novo Nordisk Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., OptumRx Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (F,AW)
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 9/6/2023. (F,AW)
September 6, 2023 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Complaint Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Cuyahoga County. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(/s/ Shawn Acton, Reichard, Joyce) Modified on 9/8/2023 to denote change of event type and different /s/ signature (G,M).
September 6, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint (Redacted) with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid, $402.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12165699. Filed by Cuyahoga County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Each Named Defendant, #3 Appendix A to Complaint - Glossary) (/s/ Shawn Acton, Reichard, Joyce) Modified on to denote different /s/ signature 9/8/2023 (G,M).
September 6, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (F,AW)
September 6, 2023 Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (F,AW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuyahoga County v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREMARK L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optumrx Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumInsight Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuyahoga County
Represented By: Brian D. Schall
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Represented By: SHAWN M. ACTON
Represented By: JOHN M. MURPHY
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: John J. Spellacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?