Pinellas County, Florida v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Plaintiff: Pinellas County, Florida
Defendant: EVERNORTH HEALTH INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, Express Scripts Inc., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC, CAREMARK L.L.C., UnitedHealth Group Inc, Optum Inc., Optumrx Inc., OptumInsight Inc. and ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
In Re: INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2023cv21381
Filed: October 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Filing 17 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (krg, )
October 23, 2023 Filing 16 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:23-cv-02153. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2023 Filing 15 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of New Jersey MDL case number: 3080. (Attachments: #1 Letter from District of New Jersey). (JNB)
October 23, 2023 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, )
October 23, 2023 Member Case Direct File on 10/23/2023, for MDL 3080 INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION. (krg, )
October 3, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, Florida as to Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Widlanski, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/4/2023 (GL).
October 3, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, Florida as to ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Evernorth Health, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc. (Widlanski, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/4/2023 (GL).
October 3, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, Florida as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Widlanski, Benjamin)
October 2, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, Florida as to CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC. (Widlanski, Benjamin)
October 2, 2023 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT Unredacted COMPLAINT re 8 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Pinellas County, Florida (Widlanski, Benjamin). Modified text on 10/2/2023 (BD).
September 29, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Widlanski, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/2/2023 (LSS).
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion for leave to file under seal. Plaintiff's Corrected Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Doc. 6) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of Court an unredacted version of its complaint under seal within 5 days of this Order. The unredacted complaint shall remain under seal until further order of this Court. The Clerk is directed to strike the original Motion for leave to file Unredacted Complaint under seal (Doc. 2) and this Court's order on that original Motion (Doc. 5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/29/2023. (SC)
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, Florida as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 Plaintiff's CORRECTED MOTION for leave to file DOCUMENT to file an Unredacted version of its Complaint under seal by Pinellas County, Florida (Widlanski, Benjamin).
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STRICKEN per Endorsed Order 8. ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to file under seal. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Doc. 2) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of Court an unredacted version of its complaint under seal within 5 days of this Order. The unredacted complaint shall remain under seal until further order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/26/2023. (SC) Modified text on 10/2/2023 (BD).
September 26, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Roland Tellis, Rachel Sullivan, Christopher A. Seegar, Burton LeBlanc, IV, Steven J. Doroci, Russell W. Budd, and David Buchanan of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
September 25, 2023 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:23-cv-2153-JSM-AEP. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 Plaintiff's MOTION for leave to file DOCUMENT Unredacted COMPLAINT under seal. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (ARC)
September 22, 2023 Filing 2 STRICKEN per Endorsed Order 8. MOTION for leave to file Unredacted COMPLAINT under seal by Pinellas County, Florida (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Widlanski, Benjamin). (Modified on 9/26/2023 to edit docket text) (JDR). Modified text on 10/2/2023 (BD).
September 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Evernorth Health, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc., Novo Nordisk Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21283561) filed by Pinellas County, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Widlanski, Benjamin) (Modified on 9/26/2023 to edit docket text)(JDR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinellas County, Florida v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREMARK L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optumrx Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumInsight Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinellas County, Florida
Represented By: James Lawrence Magazine
Represented By: Archie C. Lamb, Jr.
Represented By: DAVID R. BUCHANAN
Represented By: BRANDON LEE BOGLE
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: Matthew D. Schultz
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Steven J. Doroci
Represented By: TROY ALAN RAFFERTY
Represented By: Tal J. Lifshitz
Represented By: WILLIAM FRANKLIN CASH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?