BAMBUSER AB v. SITO MOBILE R&D IP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BAMBUSER AB
Defendant: SITO MOBILE R&D IP, LLC and SITO MOBILE, LTD.
Case Number: 2:2023cv21757
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Jamel K Semper
2 Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jamel K. Semper for all further proceedings. Judge Susan D. Wigenton no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/22/2023. (smf)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION & CONSENT ORDER extending time to file opposition through 1/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 12/18/2023. (lag, )
December 16, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #10 MOTION to Stay or in the alternative, transfer under the first-to-file rule by BAMBUSER AB. (KAPLAN, JEFFREY)
December 7, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Stay or in the alternative, transfer under the first-to-file rule. Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
December 5, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by TEDD WILLIAM VAN BUSKIRK on behalf of SITO MOBILE R&D IP, LLC, SITO MOBILE, LTD. (VAN BUSKIRK, TEDD)
December 1, 2023 Pro Hac Vice fee received for John Crossman: $ 150, receipt number 135855 (jjc, )
December 1, 2023 #10 MOTION to Stay or in the alternative, transfer under the first-to-file rule REFERRED to Jessica S. Allen. (cds)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SITO MOBILE R&D IP, LLC, SITO MOBILE, LTD. identifying SITO Mobile, Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (MAHESHWARI, SHAILENDRA)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay or in the alternative, transfer under the first-to-file rule by SITO MOBILE R&D IP, LLC, SITO MOBILE, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of Defendants' Motion to Stay or in the alternative, transfer under the first-to-file rule, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MAHESHWARI, SHAILENDRA)
November 28, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN K. CROSSMAN, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John K. Crossman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KAPLAN, JEFFREY)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JOHN K. CROSSMAN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/20/2023. (ld, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Crossman by BAMBUSER AB. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Kaplan, #2 Text of Proposed Order granting phv application, #3 Statement of John Crossman)(KAPLAN, JEFFREY)
November 14, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BAMBUSER AB. All Defendants. (KAPLAN, JEFFREY)
November 14, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BAMBUSER AB. All Defendants. (KAPLAN, JEFFREY)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SITO MOBILE R&D IP, LLC, SITO MOBILE, LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
November 1, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (ak, )
November 1, 2023 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BAMBUSER AB. Amendment to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (KAPLAN, JEFFREY)
November 1, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAMBUSER AB. (KAPLAN, JEFFREY)
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SITO MOBILE R&D IP, LLC, SITO MOBILE, LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14839851) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BAMBUSER AB. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KAPLAN, JEFFREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAMBUSER AB v. SITO MOBILE R&D IP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAMBUSER AB
Represented By: JEFFREY I. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SITO MOBILE R&D IP, LLC
Represented By: SHAILENDRA K. MAHESHWARI
Represented By: TEDD WILLIAM VAN BUSKIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SITO MOBILE, LTD.
Represented By: SHAILENDRA K. MAHESHWARI
Represented By: TEDD WILLIAM VAN BUSKIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?