INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC. v. CELGENE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC.
Defendant: CELGENE CORPORATION, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, NATCO PHARMA LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. and DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.
Case Number: 2:2023cv22117
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 53 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #2 Certification of Devora W. Allon, P.C., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to CHRISTOPHER T. HOLDING, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/5/2024. (ld, )
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to LANA SHIFERMAN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/5/2024. (ld, )
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ALEXANDRA LU, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/5/2024. (ld, )
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER: The Scheduling Conference on 1/10/2024 at 3:30 p.m. will be held telephonically. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/5/2024. (jqb, )
January 4, 2024 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher Holding, Esq. by DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Eric I. Abraham, Esq., #2 Certification Christopher Holding, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAHAM, ERIC)
January 4, 2024 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lana Shiferman, Esq. by DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Eric I. Abraham, Esq., #2 Certification Lana Shiferman, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAHAM, ERIC)
January 4, 2024 Filing 46 AMENDED DOCUMENT by NATCO PHARMA LIMITED. Amendment to #39 Notice of Appearance . (MALAKOFF, LAUREN)
January 4, 2024 Filing 45 AMENDED DOCUMENT by NATCO PHARMA LIMITED. Amendment to #38 Notice of Appearance . (RUIZ, HECTOR)
January 4, 2024 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of NATCO PHARMA LIMITED (WALSH, LIZA)
January 4, 2024 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexandra Lu, Esq. by DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Eric I. Abraham, Esq., #2 Certification Alexandra Lu, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAHAM, ERIC)
January 4, 2024 Pro Hac Vice fee for Gilad Bendheim, Esq., and Vera C. Esses, Esq.: $ 300, receipt number NEW49499 (jr)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gilad Bendheim, Esq., and Vera C. Esses, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/27/2023. (ld, )
December 26, 2023 Filing 41 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. encl. Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gilad Bendheim, #2 Certification of Vera C. Esses, #3 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
December 26, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of NATCO PHARMA LIMITED (WALSH, LIZA)
December 26, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN RUTH MALAKOFF on behalf of NATCO PHARMA LIMITED (MALAKOFF, LAUREN)
December 26, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ on behalf of NATCO PHARMA LIMITED (RUIZ, HECTOR)
December 22, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
December 21, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID S. KURTZER-ELLENBOGEN and BENJAMIN M. GREENBLUM, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mxw, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 37 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Benjamin M. Greenblum to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GUADALUPE, DANIEL)
December 20, 2023 Filing 36 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David Kurtzer-Ellenbogen to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GUADALUPE, DANIEL)
December 18, 2023 Pro Hac Vice fee received for David Kurtzer-Ellenbogen and Benjamin M. Greenblum: $ 300, receipt number 136133 (jjc, )
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' proposed briefing schedules for pre-answer motion practice. All outstanding issues in these new matters, including any requests to consolidate with Civil Action No. 19-7532, any requests to sever, and pre-answer motions will be addressed at the Rule 16 scheduling conference on January 10, 2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/15/23. (tad)
December 14, 2023 Filing 34 Letter from Jennifer Mara, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 18 Order,,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARA, JENNIFER)
December 14, 2023 Filing 33 Letter from Daniel R. Guadalupe, Esq.. (GUADALUPE, DANIEL)
December 14, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN RUTH MALAKOFF on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (MALAKOFF, LAUREN)
December 14, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (RUIZ, HECTOR)
December 14, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to BENJAMIN M. GREENBLUM, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/13/2023. (ld, )
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: The scheduling conferences in Civil Action Nos. 23-22321 and 23-22117 will be handled together on January 10, 2024 at 3:30 p.m. Note: the change in time for the conference on January 10, 2024. The conference scheduled for January 31, 2024 is cancelled. The parties shall file their proposed joint discovery plans not later than January 8, 2024. The Court will address the parties' letters #17 #26 in Civil Action No. 23-22117 and #33 #41 in Civil Action No. 23-22321 at the scheduling conference. No further letters should be filed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/13/23. (tad)
December 12, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin M. Greenblum by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin M. Greenblum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(GUADALUPE, DANIEL)
December 12, 2023 Filing 26 Letter from Eric I. Abraham, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J re #17 Letter. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
December 12, 2023 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC. identifying Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/12/2023. (ld, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Kurtzer-Ellenbogen by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(GUADALUPE, DANIEL)
December 11, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM MURTHA on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC. (MURTHA, WILLIAM)
December 11, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE-ROSE ORLANDO on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC. (ORLANDO, STEPHANIE-ROSE)
December 11, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC I. ABRAHAM on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
December 11, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC I. ABRAHAM on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The Court has received the December 8, 2023 letter from Plaintiffs in Mayo Clinic v. Celgene Corp., Civ. No. 23-22321 and Intermountain Health Inc. v. Celgene Corp., Civ. No. 23-22117. The parties in those matters will meet and confer on a jointly proposed briefing schedule for any pre-answer motion practice and submit same to the Court by December 14, 2023. In that these matters are to be consolidated into Civ. No. 19-7532, there will be no stay of discovery pending a ruling on any such motion. Accordingly, counsel will meet and confer on a proposed discovery plan for both matters in light of the ongoing discovery in Civ. No. 19-7532, and be prepared to discuss same at the January 10, 2024 conference. All counsel in Civ. No. 23-22117 and Civ. No. 23-22321 shall appear for the January 10, 2024 conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/11/2023. (Hammer, Michael)
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 Letter from Jennifer Mara, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transfer Order)(MARA, JENNIFER)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2024 at 10:00 a.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 1/29/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/7/2023. (jqb, )
December 7, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CINDY REICHLINE, ESQ., and KEITH L. BUTLER, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
December 6, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Keith L. Butler, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14923361.) (MARA, JENNIFER)
December 6, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Cindy Reichline, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14923357.) (MARA, JENNIFER)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Keith L. Butler, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/5/2023. (ld, )
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cindy Reichline, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/5/2023. (ld, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH D. MCDONALD on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, CELGENE CORPORATION (MCDONALD, KEITH)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL RENE GUADALUPE on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, CELGENE CORPORATION (GUADALUPE, DANIEL)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC.. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC. waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024. (MARA, JENNIFER)
November 16, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC.. NATCO PHARMA LIMITED waiver sent on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/15/2024. (MARA, JENNIFER)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC.. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/15/2024. (MARA, JENNIFER)
November 16, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, CELGENE CORPORATION, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., NATCO PHARMA LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
November 16, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Keith L. Butler, Esq.), #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Cindy Reichline, Esq.). Motion set for 12/18/2023 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 14, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC.. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY waiver sent on 11/13/2023, answer due 1/12/2024; CELGENE CORPORATION waiver sent on 11/13/2023, answer due 1/12/2024. (MARA, JENNIFER)
November 14, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Keith L. Butler, Esq.) by INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jennifer Mara, Esq., #2 Certification of Keith L. Butler, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MARA, JENNIFER)
November 14, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Cindy Reichline, Esq.) by INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jennifer Mara, Esq., #2 Certification of Cindy Reichline, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MARA, JENNIFER)
November 13, 2023 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC.. (MARA, JENNIFER)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, CELGENE CORPORATION, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., NATCO PHARMA LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14858883) with JURY DEMAND, filed by INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARA, JENNIFER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC. v. CELGENE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERMOUNTAIN HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER MARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELGENE CORPORATION
Represented By: DANIEL RENE GUADALUPE
Represented By: KEITH D. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL RENE GUADALUPE
Represented By: KEITH D. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATCO PHARMA LIMITED
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Represented By: LAUREN RUTH MALAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Represented By: LAUREN RUTH MALAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Represented By: STEPHANIE-ROSE ORLANDO
Represented By: WILLIAM MURTHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?