PORETSKIN v. CHANEL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: COURTNEY PORETSKIN
Defendant: CHANEL, INC., CARL POULTER, LISA GASPERINI and JOHN DOES ONE THROUGH TEN
Case Number: 2:2023cv22613
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by COURTNEY PORETSKIN re #8 MOTION to Remand , #11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer to the Southern District of New York (Attachments: #1 Certification of Exhibits, #2 Exhibits A-D) (MULICK, MARK) Modified on 1/9/2024 (dam).
January 2, 2024 Filing 11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer to the Southern District of New York by CHANEL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Chanel, Inc.'s Cross-Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Arnold G. Sooklall, Esq., #4 Declaration of Tyler Beauchea, #5 Declaration of Michelle Rhee, #6 Declaration of James Galli) (RAINONE, ANTHONY) Modified on 1/2/2024 (dam).
January 2, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer to the Southern District of New York. Cross Motion set for 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
December 18, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand. Motion reset for 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #8 MOTION to Remand . (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2024 at 12:30 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 1/25/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/7/2023. (jqb, )
December 6, 2023 #8 MOTION to Remand REFERRED to Michael A. Hammer. (cds)
December 5, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand. Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by COURTNEY PORETSKIN. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Letter Brief, #3 Certification Mark Mulick, #4 Exhibits A-E) (MULICK, MARK) Modified on 12/5/2023 (dam).
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A. MULICK on behalf of COURTNEY PORETSKIN (MULICK, MARK) Modified on 12/4/2023 (dam).
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 Diversity Disclosure Statement by COURTNEY PORETSKIN. (MULICK, MARK)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHANEL, INC.. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 Diversity Disclosure Statement by CHANEL, INC.. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHANEL, INC.. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD GEWAN SOOKLALL on behalf of CHANEL, INC. (SOOKLALL, ARNOLD)
November 27, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #2 Notice of Appearance submitted by Arnold Sooklall on 11/27/2023 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov and the Manage My Account section of PACER for information and instructions on maintaining your account. Please be advised that the primary e-mail address for Counsel has been modified for this case to reflect the information found in the #2 Notice of Appearance. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
November 26, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (dam)
November 26, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (dam)
November 26, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The State Court Complaint at ECF No. #1 -1 - Exhibit 1 submitted on 11/22/2023 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case as to Mark Mulick, Esq., Counsel for Plaintiff. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov and the Manage My Account section of PACER for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (dam)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHANEL, INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, case number MID-L-005639-23. (Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14892238), filed by CHANEL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (RAINONE, ANTHONY) Modified on 11/26/2023 (dam).
November 22, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PORETSKIN v. CHANEL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY PORETSKIN
Represented By: MARK A. MULICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANEL, INC.
Represented By: ANTHONY M. RAINONE
Represented By: ARNOLD GEWAN SOOKLALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL POULTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA GASPERINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES ONE THROUGH TEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?