MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. v. GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC
Plaintiff: MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.
Defendant: GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2023cv22663
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 741 Shipping
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 15 THIRD PARTY SUMMONS ISSUED as to FORD MOTOR COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
January 26, 2024 Filing 14 Request for Summons to be Issued by GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC as to FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (LEE, SUNA)
January 25, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, by GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC. (LEE, SUNA) Modified on 1/25/2024 (dam).
January 25, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #13 Answer submitted by Suna Lee on 1/25/2024 contains a Third Party Complaint. For future reference, please select the appropriate option during the filing transaction of an Answer if it includes a Third Party Complaint. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes, and this message is for informational purposes. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's request for pro hac vice admission of Michael Harowski [9, 11]. The request is denied. Local Civil Rule 101.1(c) requires that an attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must provide a certified statement of the applicant disclosing each bar in which the applicant is a member in good standing including the year of admission and the name and address of the official or office maintaining the roll of such members of its bar; in lieu thereof, the application may attach a certificate of good standing issued by the person or office maintaining the roll of the members of its bar. See Local Civ. R. 101.1 (c). Within counsel's submission, Mr. Harowski states that he is a member of the bar of the State of Louisiana, #11 . However, he has failed to provide a certificate of good standing or the name and address of the official or office maintaining roll of its members for the State of Louisiana. Defendant may resubmit the application to fully comply with the Court's local rules. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/9/24. (tad)
January 5, 2024 Filing 11 Certification on behalf of GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC Re #9 Letter. (LEE, SUNA)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint. The time for Defendant Global Shipping Services LLC to answer, move or otherwise reply to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 1/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/5/2024. (dam)
January 5, 2024 Filing 9 Letter from Suna Lee. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LEE, SUNA)
January 5, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The ECF No. #9 -1 Certification of Michael Harowski, Esq. submitted by Suna Lee on 1/5/2024 contains an improper electronic signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A WET OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. The document can be resubmitted using the CM/ECF Event, Certification which can be found under Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
January 4, 2024 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Global Shipping Services LLC. Attorney SUNA LEE for GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC added. (LEE, SUNA)
January 4, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #8 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Hammer with Proposed Consent Order filed by Suna Lee on 1/4/2024 was submitted incorrectly as an Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. For future reference, please refer to the CM/ECF Event Letter, which can be found under Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents. Any Proposed Order can be included in the Attachment field during the filing transaction. This message is for informational purposes, and there is no further action required. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
December 18, 2023 Clerk's Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/2024. Please be advised that while this Application has been GRANTED, the Application misidentifies the current Clerk of Court for the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey. The current Clerk of Court is Melissa E. Rhoads, Esq. Counsel is advised to amend future filings to reflect this information. (dam)
December 15, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC. (LEE, SUNA)
December 15, 2023 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Global Shipping Services LLC. Attorney SUNA LEE for GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC added. (LEE, SUNA)
December 15, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SUNA LEE on behalf of GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC (LEE, SUNA)
December 11, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.. GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (STEINBERG, RICK)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
November 29, 2023 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. identifying MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. as Corporate Parent.. (STEINBERG, RICK)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14897634), filed by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(STEINBERG, RICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. v. GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.
Represented By: RICK A. STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL SHIPPING SERVICES LLC
Represented By: SUNA LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?