GRANT JONES REALTY, LLC v. MW CELL REIT I LLC et al
Plaintiff: GRANT JONES REALTY, LLC
Defendant: MW CELL REIT I LLC, CROWN CASTLE USA INC., XYZ CORP. (1-10) and JOHN DOES (1-10)
Case Number: 2:2024cv00701
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #10 Cross MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 Brief in Opposition to Motion, . Motion set for 5/6/2024 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
April 1, 2024 Filing 10 Cross MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 Brief in Opposition to Motion, by GRANT JONES REALTY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROSEN, ROBERT)
April 1, 2024 Filing 9 BRIEF in Opposition filed by GRANT JONES REALTY, LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and in support of cross-motion (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Robert D. Rosen, Esq., in opposition to motion and in support of cross-motion, #2 Exhibit to Rosen Cert., #3 Certificate of Service)(ROSEN, ROBERT)
March 13, 2024 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
March 12, 2024 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by GRANT JONES REALTY, LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (ROSEN, ROBERT)
February 28, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric Wyant II to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-15127163.) (SPROVIERO, JOLENE)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric Wyant II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/27/2024. (sm)
February 28, 2024 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ERIC WYANT II, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sm)
February 28, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/1/2024 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
February 27, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by MW CELL REIT I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A-D, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SPROVIERO, JOLENE)
February 27, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric Wyant II. Motion set for 4/1/2024 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
February 26, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric Wyant II by MW CELL REIT I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Jolene Sproviero, #2 Declaration of Eric Wyant, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SPROVIERO, JOLENE)
February 7, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 submitted by MW CELL REIT I LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/27/2024. (sm)
February 6, 2024 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney JOLENE SPROVIERO for MW CELL REIT I LLC added. (SPROVIERO, JOLENE)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MW CELL REIT I LLC identifying Crown Castle Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SPROVIERO, JOLENE)
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MW CELL REIT I LLC from Bergen County Superior Court, case number BER-L-6787-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15068912), filed by MW CELL REIT I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPROVIERO, JOLENE)
February 6, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint within the Notice of Removal submitted on 2/6/2024 appears to have address information for the Plaintiff's attorney that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jr)
February 6, 2024 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRANT JONES REALTY, LLC v. MW CELL REIT I LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRANT JONES REALTY, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT D. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW CELL REIT I LLC
Represented By: JOLENE SPROVIERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN CASTLE USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORP. (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?