VRC CONSULTING INC v. STERNBERG et al
Plaintiff: VRC CONSULTING INC doing business as VRC MEDICAL SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: MANFRED STERNBERG, MANFRED STERNBERG & ASSOCIATES, PC, CHARLTON HOLDING GROUP, LLC and SAMUEL GROSS
Case Number: 2:2024cv00710
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Michael E Farbiarz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Claims Against the Sternberg Defendants MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) MOTION to Transfer Case to The United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas (In the Alternative). Motion set for 5/6/2024 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
March 29, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Claims Against the Sternberg Defendants ( Responses due by 4/22/2024.), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) ( Responses due by 4/22/2024.), MOTION to Transfer Case to The United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas (In the Alternative) by MANFRED STERNBERG & ASSOCIATES, PC, MANFRED STERNBERG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Certification of Adam T. Hoffman, #3 Exhibit A to Hoffman Certification, #4 Declaration of Manfred Sternberg, #5 Exhibit 1 to Sternberg Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(HOFFMAN, ADAM)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 3/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/29/2024. (mxw, ) Modified on 2/29/2024 (mxw, ).
February 28, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #2 Complaint, Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by MANFRED STERNBERG & ASSOCIATES, PC, MANFRED STERNBERG. (HOFFMAN, ADAM)
February 28, 2024 Filing 8 Diversity Disclosure Statement by MANFRED STERNBERG & ASSOCIATES, PC, MANFRED STERNBERG. (HOFFMAN, ADAM)
February 28, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MANFRED STERNBERG & ASSOCIATES, PC. (HOFFMAN, ADAM)
February 28, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM T. HOFFMAN on behalf of MANFRED STERNBERG & ASSOCIATES, PC, MANFRED STERNBERG (HOFFMAN, ADAM)
February 19, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VRC CONSULTING INC. MANFRED STERNBERG served on 2/7/2024, answer due 2/28/2024. (ROSENBACH, PHILIP)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VRC CONSULTING INC. (ROSENBACH, PHILIP)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHARLTON HOLDING GROUP, LLC, SAMUEL GROSS, MANFRED STERNBERG & ASSOCIATES, PC, MANFRED STERNBERG. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (and)
February 7, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when filing an initial pleading, please make sure that initial pleading is the FIRST document filed, followed by the corporate disclosure statement . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
February 7, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
February 7, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. DO NOT select a party if it is not in CAPITAL LETTERS or if it does not reflect the EXACT name as is found in the pleading, Create a new party. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
February 7, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Do not enter address information when adding parties to the docket. Also, do not enter a Demand . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
February 7, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)
February 7, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT submitted by Philip Rosenbach on 2/6/2024 did not contain a signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jjc, )
February 7, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15070129) with JURY DEMAND, filed by VRC CONSULTING INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(ROSENBACH, PHILIP)
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VRC CONSULTING INC. (ROSENBACH, PHILIP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VRC CONSULTING INC v. STERNBERG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VRC CONSULTING INC doing business as VRC MEDICAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: PHILIP ROSENBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANFRED STERNBERG
Represented By: ADAM T. HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANFRED STERNBERG & ASSOCIATES, PC
Represented By: ADAM T. HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLTON HOLDING GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL GROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?