NAN v. MILGRAM et al
Plaintiff: CUNSHENG NAN
Defendant: ADMINISTRATOR ANNE MILGRAM, PRINCIPAL DEPUTY ADM GEORGE PAPADOPOULOS, SPECIAL AGENT IN CHA ORTIZ CHERYL, GEORGE S. PAPADOPOULOS and CHERYL ORTIZ
Case Number: 2:2024cv00922
Filed: February 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the incorrect date was referenced in the Clerk's Text Order entered on 4/16/2024. The docket text has been corrected to reflect the correct answer date. (qa, )
April 16, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #13 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by CHERYL ORTIZ, GEORGE S. PAPADOPOULOS, ANNE MILGRAM has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/24/2024. (qa, ) Modified on 4/18/2024 (qa, ).
April 9, 2024 Filing 13 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants. Attorney KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO for ANNE MILGRAM,KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO for CHERYL ORTIZ,KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO for GEORGE S. PAPADOPOULOS added. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN)
March 12, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CUNSHENG NAN. CHERYL ORTIZ served on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Service Upon Ortiz)(CURRAN, MICHAEL)
March 12, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CUNSHENG NAN. GEORGE S. PAPADOPOULOS served on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Service Upon Papadopoulos)(CURRAN, MICHAEL)
March 12, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CUNSHENG NAN. ANNE MILGRAM served on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Service Upon Milgram)(CURRAN, MICHAEL)
February 29, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANNE MILGRAM, CHERYL ORTIZ, GEORGE S. PAPADOPOULOS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
February 23, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CUNSHENG NAN. Amendment to #5 Summons - Request for Issue as to Defendant Cheryl Ortiz. (CURRAN, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CUNSHENG NAN. Amendment to #4 Summons - Request for Issue as to Defendant George S. Papadopoulos. (CURRAN, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CUNSHENG NAN. Amendment to #3 Summons - Request for Issue as to Defendant Anne Milgram. (CURRAN, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2024 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by CUNSHENG NAN as to ORTIZ CHERYL. (CURRAN, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2024 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by CUNSHENG NAN as to GEORGE PAPADOPOULOS. (CURRAN, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by CUNSHENG NAN as to ANNE MILGRAM. (CURRAN, MICHAEL)
February 19, 2024 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT to correct misfiling of documents against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CUNSHENG NAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A:I-130 Receipt, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: RFE Response to USCIS with DEA Documents Attached, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C: 10/24/2023 USCIS Letter Closing I-485 Application Due to DEA Refusal to Answer FOIA Request, #4 Exhibit Last 12/08/2023 Requesting Response, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E: 02/12/2024 Affidavit by Cunsheng Nan Reciting Facts in Support, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Opening the Case)(CURRAN, MICHAEL)
February 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15097712), filed by CUNSHENG NAN.(CURRAN, MICHAEL)
February 19, 2024 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAN v. MILGRAM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CUNSHENG NAN
Represented By: MICHAEL R. CURRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMINISTRATOR ANNE MILGRAM
Represented By: KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCIPAL DEPUTY ADM GEORGE PAPADOPOULOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIAL AGENT IN CHA ORTIZ CHERYL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE S. PAPADOPOULOS
Represented By: KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL ORTIZ
Represented By: KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?