FOWLER v. SECTIGO, INC.
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FOWLER
Defendant: SECTIGO, INC.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00936
Filed: February 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
2 Judge: Jamel K Semper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Scheduling Conference on 4/25/2024 is adjourned to 5/13/2024 at 12:00 p.m. before the Undersigned. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 5/9/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/9/2024. (jqb, )
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting the #25 Motion for the pro hac vice admission of Alex T. Paradiso. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/9/2024. (qa, )
April 8, 2024 Filing 25 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alex Paradiso by MICHAEL FOWLER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Alex Paradiso in support of pro hac admission, #2 Declaration Declaration of Patrick Galligan in support of pro hac admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for pro hac admission of Alex Paradiso)(GALLIGAN, PATRICK)
April 8, 2024 Filing 24 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MICHAEL FOWLER re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Defendant's Counterclaim (GORDON, JACK)
April 4, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES V MAZEWSKI on behalf of SECTIGO, INC. (MAZEWSKI, JAMES)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge E. S. Kiel no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/1/2024. (mj)
April 1, 2024 Filing 21 BRIEF in Opposition filed by SECTIGO, INC. re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Defendant's Counterclaim (BLOCK, BRIAN)
March 22, 2024 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SECTIGO, INC. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Count Two of the Complaint (BLOCK, BRIAN)
March 19, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Defendant's Counterclaim. Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Jamel K. Semper. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
March 18, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Defendant's Counterclaim by MICHAEL FOWLER. Responses due by 4/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration)(LIMBACH, JARED)
March 18, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MICHAEL FOWLER re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Count Two of the Complaint (LIMBACH, JARED)
February 29, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lauren Clement to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-15132819.) (BLOCK, BRIAN)
February 29, 2024 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gregory L. Demers to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-15132786.) (BLOCK, BRIAN)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting the #9 Motion for the pro hac vice admission of Lauren Clement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/29/2024. (qa, )
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting the #8 Motion for the pro hac vice admission of Gregory L. Demers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/29/2024. (qa, )
February 29, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by SECTIGO, INC. re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory L. Demers, Esq. (Supplemental Declaration) (BLOCK, BRIAN)
February 29, 2024 Pro Hac Vice counsel, GREGORY L. DEMERS and LAUREN CLEMENT, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (qa, )
February 28, 2024 Filing 12 Letter from Brian M. Block re: Consent to Pro Hac Vice re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory L. Demers, Esq., #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lauren Clement, Esq.. (BLOCK, BRIAN)
February 28, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Count Two of the Complaint. Motion set for 4/1/2024 before Judge Jamel K. Semper. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
February 27, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (as to Counts 1, 3, and 4, only), COUNTERCLAIM against MICHAEL FOWLER by SECTIGO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Separation Agreement and Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Confidentiality Agreement)(BLOCK, BRIAN)
February 27, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Count Two of the Complaint by SECTIGO, INC.. Responses due by 3/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Julie Gettys, #3 Exhibit 1 - Separation Agreement and Cover Letter, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BLOCK, BRIAN)
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lauren Clement, Esq. by SECTIGO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian M. Block, #2 Declaration of Lauren Clement, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BLOCK, BRIAN)
February 27, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory L. Demers, Esq. by SECTIGO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian M. Block, #2 Declaration of Gregory L. Demers, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BLOCK, BRIAN)
February 27, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lauren Clement, Esq., #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory L. Demers, Esq.. Motion set for 4/1/2024 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
February 26, 2024 Filing 7 Diversity Disclosure Statement by MICHAEL FOWLER. (LIMBACH, JARED)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on April 25, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 973-437-5535 and the phone conference ID is 892 275 330#. The parties shall file a proposed joint discovery plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form joint discovery plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/22/2024. (nic, )
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JARED JAMES LIMBACH on behalf of MICHAEL FOWLER (LIMBACH, JARED)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. GALLIGAN on behalf of MICHAEL FOWLER (GALLIGAN, PATRICK)
February 20, 2024 Filing 3 Diversity Disclosure Statement by SECTIGO, INC.. (BLOCK, BRIAN)
February 20, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SECTIGO, INC. identifying GI Partners L.P. as Corporate Parent.. (BLOCK, BRIAN)
February 20, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SECTIGO, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Essex County, case number ESX-L-487-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15098981), filed by SECTIGO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(BLOCK, BRIAN)
February 20, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (qa, )
February 20, 2024 Judge Jamel K. Semper and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOWLER v. SECTIGO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FOWLER
Represented By: JACK A. GORDON
Represented By: JARED JAMES LIMBACH
Represented By: PATRICK J. GALLIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECTIGO, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN MATTHEW BLOCK
Represented By: JAMES V MAZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?