PRITCHETT v. ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL
Plaintiff: ANTOINETTE PRITCHETT
Defendant: ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL, JOHN DOES 1-10 and XYZ CORP. 1-10
Case Number: 2:2024cv01234
Filed: March 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER ORDER granting #14 Defendant's request for extension of time to file a reply brief, due by 5/13/2024. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 4/25/2024. (jd, )
April 24, 2024 Filing 14 Letter from Anastasia Stylianou re MTC Arbitration Reply Brief Extension Request re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitraton and Stay the Action. (STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA)
April 19, 2024 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ANTOINETTE PRITCHETT re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitraton and Stay the Action (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certification of Ty Hyderally, Esq., #2 Declaration Certification of Antoinette Pritchett, #3 Certificate of Service COS)(HYDERALLY, TY)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER terminating as moot #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 4/1/2024. (lag, )
March 29, 2024 Filing 11 Letter from Ty Hyderally, Esq. re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Letter . (HYDERALLY, TY)
March 28, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Letter by ANTOINETTE PRITCHETT. (HYDERALLY, TY)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff request for an extension of time of one motion cycle to submit opposition papers. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 3/28/2024. (jd, )
March 28, 2024 Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitraton and Stay the Action. Motion reset for 5/6/2024 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
March 27, 2024 Filing 8 Letter from Ty Hyderally, Esq.. (HYDERALLY, TY)
March 25, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitraton and Stay the Action. Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
March 22, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitraton and Stay the Action by ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Certification Keisha Peters Certification ISO MTCA (With Exhibit), #3 Certification Certification of A. Stylianou ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration (With Exhibits), #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, #5 Certificate of Service Certification of Service ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration)(STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA)
March 11, 2024 Filing 6 Diversity Disclosure Statement by ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL. (STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA) Modified on 3/11/2024 (ams, ).
March 5, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jd, )
March 5, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/22/2024. (jd, )
March 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW HANK on behalf of ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL (HANK, MATTHEW)
March 1, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL identifying Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA)
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ANASTASIA ANNE STYLIANOU on behalf of ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL (STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(b). Attorney ANASTASIA ANNE STYLIANOU for ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL added. (STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA)
March 1, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, BERGEN COUNTY, case number BER-L-0228-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15135089), filed by ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint with Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA)
March 1, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRITCHETT v. ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTOINETTE PRITCHETT
Represented By: TY HYDERALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. MARY'S GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: MATTHEW HANK
Represented By: ANASTASIA ANNE STYLIANOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORP. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?