YOO v. NAVIENT et al
Plaintiff: TAE YOO
Defendant: NAVIENT SOLUTIONS, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORP., 1-10 and NAVIENT
Case Number: 2:2024cv02726
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
2 Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 6/3/24 at 10:30am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/25/24. (tjg, )
April 25, 2024 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
April 19, 2024 Filing 12 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(IAMURRI, FERNANDO)
April 9, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against TAE YOO by NAVIENT.(REESE, CHRISTOPHER)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the time within which Defendant must answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including April 10, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/4/2024. (qa, )
April 3, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint by NAVIENT. (REESE, CHRISTOPHER)
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER ALBERT REESE on behalf of NAVIENT (REESE, CHRISTOPHER)
April 1, 2024 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Magistrate Judge E. S. Kiel no longer assigned to the case. (wh)
March 20, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NAVIENT has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/3/2024. (qa, )
March 19, 2024 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (HURWITZ, ERIC)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on May 16, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 973-437-5535 and the phone conference ID is 938 061 291#. The parties shall file a proposed joint discovery plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form joint discovery plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/19/2024. (nic, )
March 15, 2024 Filing 5 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by NAVIENT. (HURWITZ, ERIC)
March 15, 2024 Filing 4 Diversity Disclosure Statement by NAVIENT. (HURWITZ, ERIC)
March 15, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NAVIENT identifying Navient Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (HURWITZ, ERIC)
March 15, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC MATTHEW HURWITZ on behalf of NAVIENT (HURWITZ, ERIC)
March 15, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (qa, )
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NAVIENT SOLUTIONS, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Passaic County, case number PAS-L-000183-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15170883), filed by NAVIENT SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Action Filed Documents, #4 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (State Court))(BUZZETTA, WALTER)
March 13, 2024 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOO v. NAVIENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAE YOO
Represented By: FERNANDO IAMURRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVIENT SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: WALTER JOHN BUZZETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP., 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVIENT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER ALBERT REESE
Represented By: ERIC MATTHEW HURWITZ
Represented By: WALTER JOHN BUZZETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?