KAMBO v. MAYORKAS et al
Plaintiff: NASIR L. KAMBO
Defendant: ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UR M. JADDOU and ATTORNEY GENERAL MERRICK B. GARLAND
Case Number: 2:2024cv02896
Filed: March 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose R Almonte
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
2 Judge: Jamel K Semper
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 4/29/2024. (qa, )
April 25, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NASIR L. KAMBO (FENNY, TAMUNOTONTE)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER ORDER granting the #16 Government's Request for a 60-day extension of time, until June 17, 2024, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 4/11/2024. (qa, )
April 11, 2024 Filing 17 Letter from Parties Joint re Status Update re 15 Order,,. (KAISER, SOPHIE)
April 10, 2024 Filing 16 Letter from Defendants seeking Extension. (KAISER, SOPHIE)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: This matter was recently reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. By April 12, 2024, the parties shall file a joint letter: (1) providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims and defenses; (2) advising the Court of the status of discovery, including any status conferences that are presently scheduled; (3) identifying any pending motions; and (4) informing the Court whether the parties seek a settlement conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 4/2/2024. (akw, )
April 1, 2024 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Magistrate Judge E. S. Kiel no longer assigned to the case. (adc, )
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting the #12 Application for a Clerk's Extension. The due date for the Federal Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to April 18, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/18/2024. (qa, )
March 18, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by NASIR L. KAMBO. (FENNY, TAMUNOTONTE) Modified on 3/18/2024 (qa, ).
March 18, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/18/2024. (qa, )
March 15, 2024 Filing 12 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants. Attorney SOPHIE KAISER for MERRICK B. GARLAND,SOPHIE KAISER for UR M. JADDOU,SOPHIE KAISER for ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS added. (KAISER, SOPHIE)
March 15, 2024 Filing 11 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (qa, )
March 14, 2024 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:23-cv-03793. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 14, 2024 Judge Jamel K. Semper and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Defendants' #8 Consent Motion to Transfer and Extend. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/4/24. (lcapm2)
March 4, 2024 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 3/5/2024 (mg).
March 4, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian)
February 28, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 1/12/2024; ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS served on 1/12/2024 (Ahmed, Sadaf)
February 28, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/12/2024. (Ahmed, Sadaf)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/3/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/3/2024. (Ahmed, Sadaf)
February 11, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sadaf F. Ahmed on behalf of NASIR L. KAMBO Substituting for attorney Brian J. Kholodovsky (Ahmed, Sadaf)
December 21, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw)
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10577000) filed by NASIR L KAMBO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kholodovsky, Brian)
December 21, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zrtw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAMBO v. MAYORKAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NASIR L. KAMBO
Represented By: TAMUNOTONTE FENNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS
Represented By: SIAN JONES
Represented By: SOPHIE KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UR M. JADDOU
Represented By: SIAN JONES
Represented By: SOPHIE KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL MERRICK B. GARLAND
Represented By: SIAN JONES
Represented By: SOPHIE KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?