GENEROATH CO. LTD. et al v. MADAN et al
Plaintiff: Generoath Co. Ltd. and Bestblue Inc.
Defendant: Jay Madan and Biotos Therapeutics Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv04520
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jamel K Semper
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion filed by GENEROATH CO. LTD. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(CHO, SUKJIN)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 6/17/2024 before Judge Jamel K. Semper. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by JAY MADAN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(mxw, )
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JAY MADAN; BIOTOS THERAPEUTICS INC. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mxw, )
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by GENEROATH CO. LTD. against Jay Madan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service to Jay Madan, #2 Certificate of Service Service to Biotos Therapeutics, Inc.)(CHO, SUKJIN)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GENEROATH CO. LTD.. BIOTOS THERAPEUTICS INC. served on 4/26/2024, answer due 5/17/2024. (CHO, SUKJIN)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GENEROATH CO. LTD.. JAY MADAN served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (CHO, SUKJIN)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BIOTOS THERAPEUTICS INC., JAY MADAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw, )
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (mxw, )
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (mxw, )
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Jamel K. Semper and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption and Party Information . Please use capital letters for both. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Biotos Therapeutics Inc., Jay Madan ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15248841), filed by Generoath Co. Ltd., Bestblue Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Jay Madan, #3 Summons Biotos Therapeutics Inc.)(CHO, SUKJIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENEROATH CO. LTD. et al v. MADAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Generoath Co. Ltd.
Represented By: SUKJIN HENRY CHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bestblue Inc.
Represented By: SUKJIN HENRY CHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Madan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biotos Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?