BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. v. SUNRISE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.
Defendant: SUNRISE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC, STAR HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, CHATUR CHHABHAYA and RAMESH SUHAGIA
Case Number: 2:2024cv05730
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. CHATUR CHHABHAYA served on 6/11/2024, answer due 7/2/2024; STAR HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC served on 6/11/2024, answer due 7/2/2024. (COUCH, BRYAN)
May 24, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. RAMESH SUHAGIA served on 5/20/2024, answer due 6/10/2024; SUNRISE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC served on 5/20/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (COUCH, BRYAN)
April 30, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHATUR CHHABHAYA, STAR HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, RAMESH SUHAGIA, SUNRISE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. GATTONI, JR on behalf of BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, (GATTONI, WILLIAM)
April 29, 2024 Filing 3 Diversity Disclosure Statement by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. (COUCH, BRYAN)
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. (COUCH, BRYAN)
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHATUR CHHABHAYA, STAR HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, RAMESH SUHAGIA, SUNRISE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15326497), filed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)
April 29, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
April 29, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. v. SUNRISE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM C. GATTONI, JR.
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAR HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHATUR CHHABHAYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMESH SUHAGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?