SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC et al v. SANDOZ, INC.
Plaintiff: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-AVENTIS and DEBIOPHARM, S.A.
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02762
Filed: June 14, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: John J. Hughes
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 759 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 9/15/2011. (gxh)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 617 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 3/18/2010. (gxh)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 603 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 3/12/2010. (gxh)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 596 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 3/1/2010. (gxh)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 494 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 10/02/2009. (gxh)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 416 OPINION filed re 403 MOTION Under Fed. R. App. P. 8(a)(1)(A) for a Stay of the Court's Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) filed by SANOFI-AVENTIS, DEBIOPHARM, S.A., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 7/1/2009. (mmh)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 378 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 6/17/2009. (mmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC et al v. SANDOZ, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM J. O'SHAUGHNESSY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANOFI-AVENTIS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. O'SHAUGHNESSY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBIOPHARM, S.A.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. O'SHAUGHNESSY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?