AXACT (PVT.), LTD. v. STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Axact (Pvt.) Ltd. alleged that Defendants Student Network Resources, inc., Student Network Resources, LLC, Ross Cohen and John Derit have falsely and maliciously accused Plaintiff of perpetrating numerous frauds upon consumers, and engaging illegal activities

Plaintiff: AXACT (PVT.), LTD.
Defendant: STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC, ROSS COHEN and JOHN DERIT
Case Number: 3:2007cv05491
Filed: November 14, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REVISED ORDER re 32 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of defts. STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC., AND ROSS COHEN against pltf. AXACT (PVT), LTD., in the amount of $353,373.00 and attorney fees and cost in the amount of $36,720.40; adding additional websites/domains. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/5/2009. (mmh)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER that non-party Google, Inc. shall remove specified websites from its search index pending further Court order. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/12/2008. (mmh)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order CLERKS QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The 35 Stipulation and Proposed Order submitted by Peter Skolnik, Esq. on 12/11/2008 must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. In the future, please forward to the appropriate Judicial Officer in accordance with his/her preferred practice as found on our website. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. Document forwarded to chambers. (mmh)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and Order by STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC.. (SKOLNIK, PETER)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION REVISED ORDER EXHIBITS A-G by STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-B, C-G TO 12-10-08 LETTER TO JUDGE WOLFSON)(SKOLNIK, PETER)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION REVISED ORDER by STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC.. (SKOLNIK, PETER)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/20/08. (lk)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of defts. STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC., AND ROSS COHEN against pltf. AXACT (PVT), LTD., in the amount of $353,373.00 and attorney fees and cost in the amount of $36,720.40; and that this case is closed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/20/08. (lk)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Setting Deadlines as to 30 MOTION for Default Judgment as to AXACT (PVT), LTD. MOTION for Default Judgment as to AXACT (PVT), LTD.. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2008 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. (PLEASE NOTE THAT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 78 AND LOCAL RULE 7.1(B)(4), NO ORAL ARGUMENT WILL BE HELD IN THIS MATTER AND PARTIES SHOULD NOT APPEAR UNLESS SPECIFICALLY DIRECTED TO DO SO BY THE COURT.) (mmh)
July 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Default Judgment as to AXACT (PVT), LTD. by STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Peter L. Skolnik, Esq., # 2 Exhibit Skolnik Declaration Exhibits A-E, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Ross Cohen, # 4 Exhibit Cohen Declaration Exhibit 1, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(SKOLNIK, PETER)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Letter from Peter L. Skolnik. (SKOLNIK, PETER)
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER recommending pltf. AXACT to proceed expeditiously in locating licensed NJ counsel, or else risk being subject to default judgment on certain claims Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/2/2008. (ss, )
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave of Ira S. Sacks, Esq., and Melanie J. Sacks, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of pltf. (Signed by Judge Tonianne Bongiovanni on 4/29/2008)(ss, )
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LETTER ORDER advising that initial confernece set for 5/1/08 is adjourned sine die. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/23/2008. (tp )
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to AXACT(PVT)LTD. for failure to plea, failure to answer counterclaim. (mmh)
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Request for Default by STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC, ROSS COHEN against Axact (PVT.) LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael A. Norwick, Esq.)(NORWICK, MICHAEL)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ANDREW P. NAPOLITANO terminated and action voluntarily terminated except as to counterclaims Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/4/2008. (ss, )
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Letter from Ira S. Sacks. (NAPOLITANO, ANDREW)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Letter from Peter L. Skolnik. (SKOLNIK, PETER)
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 3/25/2008. (jg, )
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion set for 4/21/2008 in Trenton before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (PLEASE NOTE THAT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 78 AND LOCAL RULE 7.1(B)(4), NO ORAL ARGUMENT WILL BE HELD IN THIS MATTER AND PARTIES SHOULD NOT APPEAR UNLESS SPECIFICALLY DIRECTED TO DO SO BY THE COURT.) (tp )
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Ira S. Sacks re 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record to Axact (Pvt.), Ltd. MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record to Axact (Pvt.), Ltd. by AXACT (PVT.), LTD.. (NAPOLITANO, ANDREW)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record to Axact (Pvt.), Ltd. by AXACT (PVT.), LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and to Voluntarily Dismiss the Complaint)(NAPOLITANO, ANDREW)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER ORDER rescheduling initial conference to May 1, 2008 and setting other discovery deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/27/08. (ij, )
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Amended ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC, ROSS COHEN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A thru I, # 2 Exhibit J thru V, # 3 Exhibit W thru HH)(SKOLNIK, PETER)
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/11/08. (ij, )
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 3/17/2008 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (PLEASE NOTE THAT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 78 AND LOCAL RULE 7.1(B)(4), NO ORAL ARGUMENT WILL BE HELD IN THIS MATTER AND PARTIES SHOULD NOT APPEAR UNLESS SPECIFICALLY DIRECTED TO DO SO BY THE COURT.)(ms)
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: Counsel is reminded to not submit stand alone proposed Orders, i.e. Document 15 should have been submitted as an attachment to document 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and Document 12 should have been sent directly to the Court. For future reference, please review this District's CM/ECF Policies & Procedures specifically with regard to submitting Proposed Orders. (ms) Modified on 2/13/2008 to correct spelling. (ms).
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER ORDER rescheduling initial conference to March 19, 2008 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/6/08. (ij, )
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Proposed Pretrial Order Granting Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by AXACT (PVT.), LTD.. (NAPOLITANO, ANDREW)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Andrew P. Napolitano re 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AXACT (PVT.), LTD.. (NAPOLITANO, ANDREW)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AXACT (PVT.), LTD.. (NAPOLITANO, ANDREW)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Move by AXACT (PVT.), LTD.. (NAPOLITANO, ANDREW)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling a rule 16 Conference set for 3/18/2008 3:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/5/08. (Attachments: # 1 ADR MEMO)(mm)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC, ROSS COHEN. (SKOLNIK, PETER)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against AXACT (PVT.), LTD. by STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC, ROSS COHEN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(SKOLNIK, PETER)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer 2/4/2008 for all dfts. except DERIT Signed by Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/7/2008. (ss, )
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Melanie J. Sacks by AXACT (PVT.), LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(ANAND, SAFIA)
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Granting 5 Application and Clerk's text only Order to extend time to answer as to STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC, AND ROSS COHEN, ans. due 1/10/08. (lk)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. NORWICK on behalf of STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC, ROSS COHEN (NORWICK, MICHAEL)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Student Network Resources, Inc., Student Network Resources, LLC, and Ross Cohen.. (SKOLNIK, PETER)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER L. SKOLNIK on behalf of STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC, ROSS COHEN (SKOLNIK, PETER)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order CLERKS QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The document 3 Declaration submitted by S. Anand, Esq. on 11/28/07 did not contain a proper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE or a handwritten signature of Melanie J. Sacks. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court.. (lk)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION of Melanie J. Sacks re 1 Complaint, by AXACT (PVT.), LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(ANAND, SAFIA)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC, ROSS COHEN, JOHN DERIT. ( Mailed to Counsel) Days Due - 20. (ce3)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC., STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC, ROSS COHEN, JOHN DERIT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 200 348223.), filed by AXACT (PVT.), LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 7.1 Statement# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ce3)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order ATTENTION COUNSEL - As of May 1, 2006, Civil initial pleadings such as complaints and notices of removal must be filed electronically. Payment of the filing fee is made via the internet (pay.gov). Visit our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for additional information. In the future, to expedite the processing of the initial pleadings, counsel is requested to file complaints and notices of removal electronically. (ce3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AXACT (PVT.), LTD. v. STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXACT (PVT.), LTD.
Represented By: ANDREW P. NAPOLITANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUDENT NETWORK RESOURCES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSS COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DERIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?