UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SB BUILDING ASSOCIATES, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: SB BUILDING ASSOCIATES, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, SB BUILDING GP, L.L.C, UNITED STATES LAND RESOURCES L.P., UNITED STATES REALTY RESOURCES, INC. and 7.04 ACRES OF LAND
Case Number: 3:2008cv05298
Filed: October 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: John J. Hughes
Presiding Judge: Anne E. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9613 CERCLA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 6/16/2014. (eaj)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION and ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to File third amended complaint Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/31/2009. (ss, )
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 5/29/2009. (ss, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SB BUILDING ASSOCIATES, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: BRIAN G. DONOHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB BUILDING ASSOCIATES, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB BUILDING GP, L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES LAND RESOURCES L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES REALTY RESOURCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.04 ACRES OF LAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?