UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PECHINEY PLASTICS PACKAGING, INC.,
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: PECHINEY PLASTICS PACKAGING, INC.,
Case Number: 3:2009cv05692
Filed: November 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Garrett E. Brown, Jr.
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9613 CERCLA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/27/2013. (jjc)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/2/2013. (gxh)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/19/2013. (gxh)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/14/2012. (gxh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PECHINEY PLASTICS PACKAGING, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DEANNA CHANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PECHINEY PLASTICS PACKAGING, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?