SEEMAN v. LOCANE et al

Plaintiff: FRED L. SEEMAN
Defendant: AMY LOCANE and MARK C. BOVENIZER
Case Number: 3:2010cv06597
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Anne E. Thompson
Referring Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2017 205 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/22/2017. (mps)
November 15, 2016 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 138 Defendant Bovenizer's Motion to Deposit Funds; Ordering that the sum of $1,498,000 be deposited by the Clerk of Court into the Registry of this Court; Ordering that a certified copy of this Order be personally served upon the Clerk of Court, the the Chief Deputy of Administration, the Chief Deputy of Operations or Finance Manager by Defendant Mark Bovenizer (Finance notified). Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/15/2016. (eaj)
October 1, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/1/2015. (eaj)
August 5, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 8/5/2014. (eaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEEMAN v. LOCANE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED L. SEEMAN
Represented By: HERBERT L. WAICHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY LOCANE
Represented By: LINTON W. TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK C. BOVENIZER
Represented By: KEVIN M. HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?