BRAUN et al v. RED OAK ACQUISITION CORP., et al
Plaintiff: RAYMOND J. BRAUN, JAYNE K. BRAUN and JANEL BRAUN
Defendant: GEORGE T. HORNYAK, JR., RICHARD U. NIEDT, MERCER INSURANCE GROUP, INC., UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY, ROLAND D. BOEHM, ANDREW R. SPEAKER, RED OAK ACQUISITION CORP., H. THOMAS DAVIS, JR., WILLIAM C. HART, WILLIAM V.R. FOGLER and SAMUEL J. MALIZIA
Case Number: 3:2011cv00166
Filed: January 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Mary L Cooper
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2011 Filing 22 Transmittal Letter to Deputy Clerk of the Superior Court of New Jersey, Mercer County re #21 ORDER & JUDGMENT. (gxh)
February 15, 2011 ***Civil Case Terminated. (gxh)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER & JUDGMENT that the action be remanded to New Jersey Superior Court, Mercer County, sua sponte; denying without prejudice #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying without prejudice motions to dismiss (Docket Entry Nos. #18 and #19 ; closing case. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 2/15/2011. (gxh)
February 14, 2011 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by RED OAK ACQUISITION CORP., UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY. (BROWN, RICHARD)
February 14, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss, #19 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 3/7/2011 before Judge Mary L. Cooper. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (lk)
February 14, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 3/7/2011 before Judge Mary L. Cooper. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (lk)
February 11, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by ROLAND D. BOEHM, H. THOMAS DAVIS, JR, WILLIAM V.R. FOGLER, WILLIAM C. HART, GEORGE T. HORNYAK, JR, SAMUEL J. MALIZIA, MERCER INSURANCE GROUP, INC., RICHARD U. NIEDT, ANDREW R. SPEAKER. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of the Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Brief, #3 Exhibit B to Brief, #4 Exhibit C to Brief, #5 Exhibit D to Brief, #6 Exhibit E to Brief, #7 Proposed Order)(RAVIS, JULIE)
February 10, 2011 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by RED OAK ACQUISITION CORP., UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, RICHARD)
February 3, 2011 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Charles J. Bloom to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RAVIS, JULIE)
February 3, 2011 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Charles J. Bloom, Esq.: $150, receipt number TRE008510 (mmh)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT ORDER granting Charles J. Bloom, Esq. admission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/1/11. (lk)
February 1, 2011 Filing 15 Certification of Charles J. Bloom, Esq. on behalf of ROLAND D. BOEHM, H. THOMAS DAVIS, JR, WILLIAM V.R. FOGLER, WILLIAM C. HART, GEORGE T. HORNYAK, JR, SAMUEL J. MALIZIA, MERCER INSURANCE GROUP, INC., RICHARD U. NIEDT, ANDREW R. SPEAKER for admission pro hac vice. (lk)
February 1, 2011 Filing 14 Certification on behalf of ROLAND D. BOEHM, H. THOMAS DAVIS, JR, WILLIAM V.R. FOGLER, WILLIAM C. HART, GEORGE T. HORNYAK, JR, SAMUEL J. MALIZIA, MERCER INSURANCE GROUP, INC., RICHARD U. NIEDT, ANDREW R. SPEAKER for addmission of Charles J. Bloom, Esq. pro hac vice. (lk)
January 26, 2011 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel B. Huyett to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RAVIS, JULIE)
January 24, 2011 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Daniel B. Huyett, Esq.: $150, receipt number TRE008293 (mmh)
January 21, 2011 Filing 12 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #11 submitted by Julie Ravis on 1/20/2011 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/11/2011. (mmh) (mmh).
January 20, 2011 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(RAVIS, JULIE)
January 20, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Motion set for 2/22/2011 before Judge Mary L. Cooper. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mmh)
January 20, 2011 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #7 Application for a Clerk's Extension filed by Julie Ravis on 1/19/2011 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Application USING Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order found under Civil - Other Filings - Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
January 19, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by RED OAK ACQUISITION CORP., UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BROWN, RICHARD)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to Daniel B. Huyett, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/19/2011. (mmh)
January 19, 2011 Filing 8 Certification of Julie E. Ravis, Esq. in support of pro hac vice admission of Daniel B. Huyett, Esq. on behalf of ROLAND D. BOEHM, H. THOMAS DAVIS, JR, WILLIAM V.R. FOGLER, WILLIAM C. HART, GEORGE T. HORNYAK, JR, SAMUEL J. MALIZIA, MERCER INSURANCE GROUP, INC., RICHARD U. NIEDT, ANDREW R. SPEAKER. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Daniel B. Huyett in Support of Motion for Admission pro hac vice)(mmh)
January 19, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by ROLAND D. BOEHM, H. THOMAS DAVIS, JR, WILLIAM V.R. FOGLER, WILLIAM C. HART, GEORGE T. HORNYAK, JR, SAMUEL J. MALIZIA, MERCER INSURANCE GROUP, INC., RICHARD U. NIEDT, ANDREW R. SPEAKER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(RAVIS, JULIE)
January 19, 2011 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #6 submitted by Richard Brown on 1/18/2011 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/10/2011. (mmh)
January 18, 2011 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants United Fire & Casualty Company and Red Oak Acquisition Corp... (BROWN, RICHARD)
January 12, 2011 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCER INSURANCE GROUP, INC.. (RAVIS, JULIE)
January 12, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE E. RAVIS on behalf of ROLAND D. BOEHM, H. THOMAS DAVIS, JR, WILLIAM V.R. FOGLER, WILLIAM C. HART, GEORGE T. HORNYAK, JR, SAMUEL J. MALIZIA, MERCER INSURANCE GROUP, INC., RICHARD U. NIEDT, ANDREW R. SPEAKER (RAVIS, JULIE)
January 11, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 3/8/2011 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due seven days prior to the initial conference (Please do not e-file). Kindly mark your calendars accordingly.(ce3)
January 10, 2011 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RED OAK ACQUISITION CORP., UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (eaj)
January 10, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RED OAK ACQUISITION CORP., UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MERCER COUNTY, case number MER C 1 11. ( Filing fee $ 350, RECEIPT NO. 3505930) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(eaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRAUN et al v. RED OAK ACQUISITION CORP., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE T. HORNYAK, JR.
Represented By: JULIE E. RAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD U. NIEDT
Represented By: JULIE E. RAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCER INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: JULIE E. RAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD H. BROWN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLAND D. BOEHM
Represented By: JULIE E. RAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW R. SPEAKER
Represented By: JULIE E. RAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED OAK ACQUISITION CORP.
Represented By: RICHARD H. BROWN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. THOMAS DAVIS, JR.
Represented By: JULIE E. RAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM C. HART
Represented By: JULIE E. RAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM V.R. FOGLER
Represented By: JULIE E. RAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL J. MALIZIA
Represented By: JULIE E. RAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND J. BRAUN
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAYNE K. BRAUN
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANEL BRAUN
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?