DEPOMED, INC. v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Plaintiff: DEPOMED, INC.
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS, L.P. and RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Case Number: 3:2013cv00571
Filed: January 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Joel A. Pisano
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 OPINION AND ORDER granting 297 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/29/2017. (km)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 6/28/2017. (km)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 6/5/2017. (km)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 4/6/2017. (mmh)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/31/2017. (km)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 OPINION and ORDER Granting 252 Joint MOTION to Seal the Parties' Submissions on Defendants' Motion to Amend Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/3/2017. (km)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 10/14/2016. (km)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 1/4/2016. (kas, )
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/25/2014. (eaj)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Purdue's Motion to Bifurcate the Trial and Stay all Damages filed. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 11/26/2013. (kas, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEPOMED, INC. v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEPOMED, INC.
Represented By: LEDA DUNN WETTRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Represented By: RUKHSANAH L. SINGH
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: RUKHSANAH L. SINGH
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS, L.P.
Represented By: RUKHSANAH L. SINGH
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Represented By: RUKHSANAH L. SINGH
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?