GARCIA v. CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICE INC. et al
Plaintiff: AGUSTIN GARCIA
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICE, INC., RALPH WOODWARD, M.D., ABU AHSAN, M.D., NUGGEN, M.D., DESPINA TERRIS, M.D., SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLES WARREN, JR., N.J.S.P. ADMINISTRATOR'S, NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON, GARY LANIGAN, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONAL SERVICES and JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-30
Case Number: 3:2013cv01250
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Presiding Judge: Peter G. Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM ORDER that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 07/02/2019. (jmh)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 1/18/2019. (mmh)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 3/14/2018. (mmh)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 1/22/2018. (mmh)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/5/2017. (km)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 6/15/2017. (mmh)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 OPINION. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 5/9/2017. (seb)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 4/25/2017. (mmh)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 12/16/2016. (mmh)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 12/29/2015. (mmh)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiffs' 33 Motion for an extension of time to effect service of process is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; that Plaintiff's 34 Motion for the issuance of new Summonses is GRANTED in part and DEN IED in part; that the Clerk shall issue new Summonses for Correctional Medical Service, Inc., Charles Warren, Jr. and Dr. Nuggen, M.D.; that Plaintiff's 36 Motion to compel discovery from Defendants Despina Terris and Saint Francis Medical Center is DENIED; that Defendant Despina Terris shall respond to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories within thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/29/2015. (jjc)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/27/2014. (jjc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARCIA v. CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICE INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGUSTIN GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RALPH WOODWARD, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABU AHSAN, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUGGEN, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESPINA TERRIS, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES WARREN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.J.S.P. ADMINISTRATOR'S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY LANIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONAL SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?