MYKOLAITIS et al v. THE HOME DEPOT et al

Plaintiff: RAYMOND MYKOLAITIS and MARIJA MYKOLAITIS
Defendant: THE HOME DEPOT, HUSKY, TRICAM INDUSTRIES and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-20
Case Number: 3:2013cv01868
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Presiding Judge: Mary L. Cooper
Referring Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 2/10/2016. (eaj)
July 6, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 7/6/2015. (eaj)
November 25, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 11/25/2014. (eaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MYKOLAITIS et al v. THE HOME DEPOT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND MYKOLAITIS
Represented By: JEFFREY SCOTT INTRAVATOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIJA MYKOLAITIS
Represented By: JEFFREY SCOTT INTRAVATOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HOME DEPOT
Represented By: SUZANNE M. MARASCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRICAM INDUSTRIES
Represented By: SUZANNE M. MARASCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?