Meeks et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Plaintiff: CHIEF ROBERT MOORE, John Nunan, Patricia Shadoan, Gregory Dobbins, Iris Meeks, Ada Moore, Richard Cuzick, Frederick Williams, CAROL ROTH, Pauline Boudreaux, Wanda Duke, Rose May Roy, Susie Gonzalez, Edward Phillips, Mary Conrad, Sylvia Packer, BRUCE MILLER, Bridget Dinvaut, Mary McMahan, Barbara Elliott, Darrell Penennell, Kenneth Evans, Oakley Joseph, Teresa Henson, Amy Ballard, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, Lucinda Henson, Henry Baker, Steven Messer, Henry Levi West, Richard Faulkner, Glenn Pardon, Alexander Bowman, June Wigglesworth, Joananne Terwilliger, Margie Melcher, Juanita Kilgore, Betty Tucker, Sammy Retton, Verl Sowder, Sr., JAMES PETERS, WILLIAM THOMPSON, BETTY MARSHALL, DONNA DANIELS, John Hope, Altheria Griffin, Glenn Wrestler, Sr., Delores Waggoner, John Wilkerson, Donald Ray Begley, Phyllis Kintz, PAUL ABRAMS, Calvin Schra, Robin Kay Adkins, Kathaleen Jones, Nannie May McCoy, Ralph Giglio, Charles Gass, Harold Bentley, Fern David, Shirley Treaudo, ELIZABETH PALMER, Melinda Cantrall, Herbert Gordon, Regina Short, Julida Helton, Gloria Newton, Marcella Buck, Mary Alice Bowles, Paula Van Slyke, Fred Tate, Jr., James Wilkes, RICHARD MANN, Karen Ogden and Virginia Crouch
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. and MCKESSON CORPORATION
In Re: PLAVIX PRODUCT LIABILITY AND MARKETING LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2013cv03652
Filed: June 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED MDL ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's motion for remand; Denying as to Civil Action No's. 14-1262, 14-1264 and 13-5414. The remainder of the above-captioned cases are remanded to the California Superior Court located in San Francisco, California. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/2/2014. (mmh)
October 1, 2014 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jjc)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MDL ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's motion for remand; Denying as to Civil Action No's. 13-1262, 13-1264 and 13-5414. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/1/2014. (eaj)
October 1, 2014 Filing 50 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/1/2014. (eaj)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Vacating the Remand Order and Opinion filed 9/12/2014. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/12/2014. (eaj)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting the Motion to Remand in Civil Action 13-2418; Ordering that the above listed cases are remanded to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for the purpose of remanding the cases to the California State Superior Court, San Francisco Division. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/12/2014. (eaj)
September 12, 2014 Filing 47 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/12/2014. (eaj)
July 29, 2013 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion to Remand #46 filed by Joshua Ezrin on 7/26/2013 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice Other. The Court will construe this filing as a Motion for Remand, PLEASE DO NOT REFILE THIS DOCUMENT. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jjc)
July 26, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE by PAUL ABRAMS, Robin Kay Adkins, Henry Baker, Amy Ballard, Donald Ray Begley, Harold Bentley, Pauline Boudreaux, Mary Alice Bowles, Alexander Bowman, Marcella Buck, Melinda Cantrall, Mary Conrad, Virginia Crouch, Richard Cuzick, DONNA DANIELS, Fern David, Bridget Dinvaut, Gregory Dobbins, Wanda Duke, Barbara Elliott, Kenneth Evans, Richard Faulkner, Charles Gass, Ralph Giglio, Susie Gonzalez, Herbert Gordon, Altheria Griffin, Julida Helton, Teresa Henson, Lucinda Henson, John Hope, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, Kathaleen Jones, Oakley Joseph, Juanita Kilgore, Phyllis Kintz, RICHARD MANN, BETTY MARSHALL, BRUCE MILLER, ROBERT MOORE, Nannie May McCoy, Mary McMahan, Iris Meeks, Margie Melcher, Steven Messer, Ada Moore, Gloria Newton, John Nunan, Karen Ogden, ELIZABETH PALMER, JAMES PETERS, Sylvia Packer, Glenn Pardon, Darrell Penennell, Edward Phillips, CAROL ROTH, Sammy Retton, Rose May Roy, Calvin Schra, Patricia Shadoan, Regina Short, Verl Sowder, Sr., WILLIAM THOMPSON, Fred Tate, Jr., Joananne Terwilliger, Shirley Treaudo, Betty Tucker, Paula Van Slyke, Delores Waggoner, Henry Levi West, June Wigglesworth, John Wilkerson, James Wilkes, Frederick Williams, Glenn Wrestler, Sr. (EZRIN, JOSHUA)
July 9, 2013 Filing 45 STATUS REPORT by PAUL ABRAMS, Robin Kay Adkins, Henry Baker, Amy Ballard, Donald Ray Begley, Harold Bentley, Pauline Boudreaux, Mary Alice Bowles, Alexander Bowman, Marcella Buck, Melinda Cantrall, Mary Conrad, Virginia Crouch, Richard Cuzick, DONNA DANIELS, Fern David, Bridget Dinvaut, Gregory Dobbins, Wanda Duke, Barbara Elliott, Kenneth Evans, Richard Faulkner, Charles Gass, Ralph Giglio, Susie Gonzalez, Herbert Gordon, Altheria Griffin, Julida Helton, Teresa Henson, Lucinda Henson, John Hope, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, Kathaleen Jones, Oakley Joseph, Juanita Kilgore, Phyllis Kintz, RICHARD MANN, BETTY MARSHALL, BRUCE MILLER, ROBERT MOORE, Nannie May McCoy, Mary McMahan, Iris Meeks, Margie Melcher, Steven Messer, Ada Moore, Gloria Newton, John Nunan, Karen Ogden, ELIZABETH PALMER, JAMES PETERS, Sylvia Packer, Glenn Pardon, Darrell Penennell, Edward Phillips, CAROL ROTH, Sammy Retton, Rose May Roy, Calvin Schra, Patricia Shadoan, Regina Short, Verl Sowder, Sr., WILLIAM THOMPSON, Fred Tate, Jr., Joananne Terwilliger, Shirley Treaudo, Betty Tucker, Paula Van Slyke, Delores Waggoner, Henry Levi West, June Wigglesworth, John Wilkerson, James Wilkes, Frederick Williams, Glenn Wrestler, Sr.. (EZRIN, JOSHUA)
July 9, 2013 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Status Report #44 submitted by Jonas Mann, Esq. on 7/8/2013 contains an improper signature (s/Joshua C. Ezrin). Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (gxh)
July 8, 2013 Filing 44 STATUS REPORT by PAUL ABRAMS, Robin Kay Adkins, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, Henry Baker, Amy Ballard, Donald Ray Begley, Harold Bentley, Pauline Boudreaux, Mary Alice Bowles, Alexander Bowman, Marcella Buck, Melinda Cantrall, Mary Conrad, Virginia Crouch, Richard Cuzick, DONNA DANIELS, Fern David, Bridget Dinvaut, Gregory Dobbins, Wanda Duke, Barbara Elliott, Kenneth Evans, Richard Faulkner, Charles Gass, Ralph Giglio, Susie Gonzalez, Herbert Gordon, Altheria Griffin, Julida Helton, Teresa Henson, Lucinda Henson, John Hope, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, Kathaleen Jones, Oakley Joseph, Juanita Kilgore, Phyllis Kintz, RICHARD MANN, BETTY MARSHALL, MCKESSON CORPORATION, BRUCE MILLER, ROBERT MOORE, Nannie May McCoy, Mary McMahan, Iris Meeks, Margie Melcher, Steven Messer, Ada Moore, Gloria Newton, John Nunan, Karen Ogden, ELIZABETH PALMER, JAMES PETERS, PLAVIX PRODUCT LIABILITY AND MARKETING LITIGATION, Sylvia Packer, Glenn Pardon, Darrell Penennell, Edward Phillips, CAROL ROTH, Sammy Retton, Rose May Roy, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC., Calvin Schra, Patricia Shadoan, Regina Short, Verl Sowder, Sr., WILLIAM THOMPSON, Fred Tate, Jr., Joananne Terwilliger, Shirley Treaudo, Betty Tucker, Paula Van Slyke, Delores Waggoner, Henry Levi West, June Wigglesworth, John Wilkerson, James Wilkes, Frederick Williams, Glenn Wrestler, Sr.. (MANN, JONAS)
June 13, 2013 Filing 43 Clerk's Notification Letter. (dm )
June 12, 2013 Filing 42 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:12-cv-04617. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 10, 2013 Filing 41 TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of New Jersey for inclusion in MDL 2418. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc. of Transfer of Actions to the Plavix MDL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (34) Defendants' Motion to Stay in case 3:12-cv-04477-EMC; and granting (31) Defendants' Motion to Stay in case 3:12-cv-04478-EMC; staying litigation pending decision by MDL Judicial Panel re Conditional Transfer Order (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 38 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #36 ) (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
March 28, 2013 Filing 37 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Motion to Stay filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 18, 2013 Filing 36 Reply in Support of Motion to Stay the Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Plavix MDL by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Statement of Recent Decision in Support of Its Motion to Remand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 7, 2013 Filing 34 RESPONSE to re #31 Supplemental Brief,,,,, in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand Case to State Court and in Response to Court's February 19, 2013 Order by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Response. Supplemental Brief due by 3/7/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Supplemental Response filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 3/15/2013. Replies due by 3/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 26, 2013 Filing 31 Supplemental Brief re #14 Amended MOTION to Remand filed byPaul Abrams, Robin Kay Adkins, Henry Baker, Amy Ballard, Donald Ray Begley, Harold Bentley, Pauline Boudreaux, Mary Alice Bowles, Alexander Bowman, Marcella Buck, Melinda Cantrall, Mary Conrad, Virginia Crouch, Richard Cuzick, Donna Daniels, Fern David, Bridget Dinvaut, Gregory Dobbins, Wanda Duke, Barbara Elliott, Kenneth Evans, Richard Faulkner, Charles Gass, Ralph Giglio, Susie Gonzalez, Herbert Gordon, Altheria Griffin, Julida Helton, Teresa Henson, Lucinda Henson, John Hope, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, Kathaleen Jones, Oakley Joseph, Juanita Kilgore, Phyllis Kintz, Richard Mann, Betty Marshall, Nannie May McCoy, Mary McMahan, Iris Meeks, Margie Melcher, Steven Messer, Bruce Miller, Ada Moore, Robert Moore, Gloria Newton, John Nunan, Karen Ogden, Sylvia Packer, Elizabeth Palmer, Glenn Pardon, Darrell Penennell, James Peters, Edward Phillips, Sammy Retton, Carol Roth, Rose May Roy, Calvin Schra, Patricia Shadoan, Regina Short, Verl Sowder, Sr., Fred Tate, Jr., Joananne Terwilliger, William Thompson, Shirley Treaudo, Betty Tucker, Paula Van Slyke, Delores Waggoner, Henry Levi West, June Wigglesworth, John Wilkerson, James Wilkes, Frederick Williams, Glenn Wrestler, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Burton, Mark) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 20, 2013 Filing 30 RESPONSE to re #26 Notice (Other), #29 Objection,,,,, #27 Notice (Other), in Opposition to Plaintiffs Objection to Notice of Withdrawal of CAFA Ground of Removal by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 19, 2013 Filing 29 OBJECTIONS to re #26 Notice (Other), #27 Notice (Other), by Paul Abrams, Robin Kay Adkins, Henry Baker, Amy Ballard, Donald Ray Begley, Harold Bentley, Pauline Boudreaux, Mary Alice Bowles, Alexander Bowman, Marcella Buck, Melinda Cantrall, Mary Conrad, Virginia Crouch, Richard Cuzick, Donna Daniels, Fern David, Bridget Dinvaut, Gregory Dobbins, Wanda Duke, Barbara Elliott, Kenneth Evans, Richard Faulkner, Charles Gass, Ralph Giglio, Susie Gonzalez, Herbert Gordon, Altheria Griffin, Julida Helton, Teresa Henson, Lucinda Henson, John Hope, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, Kathaleen Jones, Oakley Joseph, Juanita Kilgore, Phyllis Kintz, Richard Mann, Betty Marshall, Nannie May McCoy, Mary McMahan, Iris Meeks, Margie Melcher, Steven Messer, Bruce Miller, Ada Moore, Robert Moore, Gloria Newton, John Nunan, Karen Ogden, Sylvia Packer, Elizabeth Palmer, Glenn Pardon, Darrell Penennell, James Peters, Edward Phillips, Sammy Retton, Carol Roth, Rose May Roy, Calvin Schra, Patricia Shadoan, Regina Short, Verl Sowder, Sr., Fred Tate, Jr., Joananne Terwilliger, William Thompson, Shirley Treaudo, Betty Tucker, Paula Van Slyke, Delores Waggoner, Henry Levi West, June Wigglesworth, John Wilkerson, James Wilkes, Frederick Williams, Glenn Wrestler, Sr.. (Burton, Mark) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 13, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc. re #26 Notice (Other), Amended Notice of Withdrawal of CAFA Ground of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 13, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc. of partial withdrawal of CAFA ground of removal (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by MDL Panel denying MDL transfer. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
December 13, 2012 Case Stayed (per 12/3/12 order) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Staying Litigation Pending Decision by MDL Judicial Panel. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 30, 2012 Filing 23 Minute Entry: Motion to Remand and Motion to Stay held on 11/30/2012 before Edward M. Chen. Court took matter under submission and will issue order.(Date Filed: 11/30/2012). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc. re #21 Reply to Opposition/Response, Motion to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 21 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette ) filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Meeks Reply in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit B to Meeks Reply in Support of Motion to Stay)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 23, 2012 Filing 20 RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette ) filed byPaul Abrams, Robin Kay Adkins, Henry Baker, Amy Ballard, Donald Ray Begley, Harold Bentley, Pauline Boudreaux, Mary Alice Bowles, Alexander Bowman, Marcella Buck, Melinda Cantrall, Mary Conrad, Virginia Crouch, Richard Cuzick, Donna Daniels, Fern David, Bridget Dinvaut, Gregory Dobbins, Wanda Duke, Barbara Elliott, Kenneth Evans, Richard Faulkner, Charles Gass, Ralph Giglio, Susie Gonzalez, Herbert Gordon, Altheria Griffin, Julida Helton, Teresa Henson, Lucinda Henson, John Hope, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, Kathaleen Jones, Oakley Joseph, Juanita Kilgore, Phyllis Kintz, Richard Mann, Betty Marshall, Nannie May McCoy, Mary McMahan, Iris Meeks, Margie Melcher, Steven Messer, Bruce Miller, Ada Moore, Robert Moore, Gloria Newton, John Nunan, Karen Ogden, Sylvia Packer, Elizabeth Palmer, Glenn Pardon, Darrell Penennell, James Peters, Edward Phillips, Sammy Retton, Carol Roth, Rose May Roy, Calvin Schra, Patricia Shadoan, Regina Short, Verl Sowder, Sr., Fred Tate, Jr., Joananne Terwilliger, William Thompson, Shirley Treaudo, Betty Tucker, Paula Van Slyke, Delores Waggoner, Henry Levi West, June Wigglesworth, John Wilkerson, James Wilkes, Frederick Williams, Glenn Wrestler, Sr.. (Burton, Mark) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 18, 2012 All motions to remand, motions to stay, and CMC are reset for 11/30/12 at 1:30 p.m. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (8 in 3:12-cv-04477-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (11 in 3:12-cv-04477-EMC) MOTION to Stay the Proceedings Pending Appeal in Caouette, (10 in 3:12-cv-04478-EMC) MOTION to Stay the Proceedings Pending Appeal in Caouette, (7 in 3:12-cv-04478-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (16 in 3:12-cv-04615-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand , (14 in 3:12-cv-04615-EMC) MOTION to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette, (15 in 3:12-cv-04616-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand , (13 in 3:12-cv-04616-EMC) MOTION to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette, (12 in 3:12-cv-04617-EMC) MOTION to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette, (14 in 3:12-cv-04617-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand , (12 in 3:12-cv-04619-EMC) MOTION to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette, (14 in 3:12-cv-04619-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand , (13 in 3:12-cv-04633-EMC) MOTION to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette, (15 in 3:12-cv-04633-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand , (14 in 3:12-cv-04641-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand , (12 in 3:12-cv-04641-EMC) MOTION to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette, (12 in 3:12-cv-04642-EMC) MOTION to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette, (14 in 3:12-cv-04642-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand , (17 in 3:12-cv-04803-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand , (15 in 3:12-cv-04803-EMC) MOTION to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette., Set/Reset Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2012 01:31 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2012 01:31 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2012. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 18, 2012 ***Deadlines terminated. Motions and CMC reset for 11/30/12 at 1:30 p.m. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 18, 2012 Filing 19 RESPONSE (re #14 Amended MOTION to Remand ) filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Baker, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Rescheduling Hearing and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/16/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc. of Filing Renewed Motion for Transfer and Consolidation Pursuant to 28 USC Sec.1407 (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 12, 2012 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO REMAND AND MOTIONS TO STAY, as to (14 in 3:12-cv-04615-EMC) MOTION to Stay, (16 in 3:12-cv-04615-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand, (15 in 3:12-cv-04616-JSC) Amended MOTION to Remand, (13 in 3:12-cv-04616-JSC) MOTION to Stay, (14 in 3:12-cv-04617-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand, (12 in 3:12-cv-04617-EMC) MOTION to Stay, (12 in 3:12-cv-04619-EMC) MOTION to Stay, (14 in 3:12-cv-04619-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand, (15 in 3:12-cv-04633-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand, (13 in 3:12-cv-04633-EMC) MOTION to Stay, (14 in 3:12-cv-04641-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand, (12 in 3:12-cv-04641-EMC) MOTION to Stay, (14 in 3:12-cv-04642-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand, (12 in 3:12-cv-04642-EMC) MOTION to Stay, (17 in 3:12-cv-04803-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand, (15 in 3:12-cv-04803-EMC) MOTION to Stay. Motion Hearings set for 11/30/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 11, 2012 Case Reassigned #15 to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Edward M. Chen on 10/11/12. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RELATING CASES: C 12-01814 EMC, C 12-04615 MEJ, C 12-04616 JSC, C 12-04617 EDL, C 12-04619 MEJ, C 12-04633 NC, C 12-04641 NC, C 12-04642 KAW, C 12-04803 JCS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 11, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 11, 2012 Filing 14 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Paul Abrams, Robin Kay Adkins, Henry Baker, Amy Ballard, Donald Ray Begley, Harold Bentley, Pauline Boudreaux, Mary Alice Bowles, Alexander Bowman, Marcella Buck, Melinda Cantrall, Mary Conrad, Virginia Crouch, Richard Cuzick, Donna Daniels, Fern David, Bridget Dinvaut, Gregory Dobbins, Wanda Duke, Barbara Elliott, Kenneth Evans, Richard Faulkner, Charles Gass, Ralph Giglio, Susie Gonzalez, Herbert Gordon, Altheria Griffin, Julida Helton, Teresa Henson, Lucinda Henson, John Hope, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, Kathaleen Jones, Oakley Joseph, Juanita Kilgore, Phyllis Kintz, Richard Mann, Betty Marshall, Nannie May McCoy, Mary McMahan, Iris Meeks, Margie Melcher, Steven Messer, Bruce Miller, Ada Moore, Robert Moore, Gloria Newton, John Nunan, Karen Ogden, Sylvia Packer, Elizabeth Palmer, Glenn Pardon, Darrell Penennell, James Peters, Edward Phillips, Sammy Retton, Carol Roth, Rose May Roy, Calvin Schra, Patricia Shadoan, Regina Short, Verl Sowder, Sr., Fred Tate, Jr., Joananne Terwilliger, William Thompson, Shirley Treaudo, Betty Tucker, Paula Van Slyke, Delores Waggoner, Henry Levi West, June Wigglesworth, John Wilkerson, James Wilkes, Frederick Williams, Glenn Wrestler, Sr.. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/25/2012. Replies due by 11/1/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burton, Mark) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #15 *** ORDER RELATING CASES C 12-01814 EMC, C 12-04615 MEJ, C 12-04617 EDL, C 12-04619 MEJ, C 12-04633 NC, C 12-04641 NC, C 12-04642 KAW, C 12-04803 JCS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/11/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012) Modified on 10/11/2012 (cl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/11/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2012 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Decision on Motion to Remand Pending Appeal in Caouette filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 10/23/2012. Replies due by 10/30/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 4, 2012 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE REQUESTING DEFENDANTS FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION. Admissions due by 10/18/2012. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 4, 2012 Filing 10 Proposed Order re #8 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities with Proposed Order by Paul Abrams, Robin Kay Adkins, Henry Baker, Amy Ballard, Donald Ray Begley, Harold Bentley, Pauline Boudreaux, Mary Alice Bowles, Alexander Bowman, Marcella Buck, Melinda Cantrall, Mary Conrad, Virginia Crouch, Richard Cuzick, Donna Daniels, Fern David, Bridget Dinvaut, Gregory Dobbins, Wanda Duke, Barbara Elliott, Kenneth Evans, Richard Faulkner, Charles Gass, Ralph Giglio, Susie Gonzalez, Herbert Gordon, Altheria Griffin, Julida Helton, Teresa Henson, Lucinda Henson, John Hope, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, Kathaleen Jones, Oakley Joseph, Juanita Kilgore, Phyllis Kintz, Richard Mann, Betty Marshall, Nannie May McCoy, Mary McMahan, Iris Meeks, Margie Melcher, Steven Messer, Bruce Miller, Ada Moore, Robert Moore, Gloria Newton, John Nunan, Karen Ogden, Sylvia Packer, Elizabeth Palmer, Glenn Pardon, Darrell Penennell, James Peters, Edward Phillips, Sammy Retton, Carol Roth, Rose May Roy, Calvin Schra, Patricia Shadoan, Regina Short, Verl Sowder, Sr., Fred Tate, Jr., Joananne Terwilliger, William Thompson, Shirley Treaudo, Betty Tucker, Paula Van Slyke, Delores Waggoner, Henry Levi West, June Wigglesworth, John Wilkerson, James Wilkes, Frederick Williams, Glenn Wrestler, Sr.. (Burton, Mark) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 4, 2012 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paul Abrams, Robin Kay Adkins, Henry Baker, Amy Ballard, Donald Ray Begley, Harold Bentley, Pauline Boudreaux, Mary Alice Bowles, Alexander Bowman, Marcella Buck, Melinda Cantrall, Mary Conrad, Virginia Crouch, Richard Cuzick, Donna Daniels, Fern David, Bridget Dinvaut, Gregory Dobbins, Wanda Duke, Barbara Elliott, Kenneth Evans, Richard Faulkner, Charles Gass, Ralph Giglio, Susie Gonzalez, Herbert Gordon, Altheria Griffin, Julida Helton, Teresa Henson, Lucinda Henson, John Hope, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, Kathaleen Jones, Oakley Joseph, Juanita Kilgore, Phyllis Kintz, Richard Mann, Betty Marshall, Nannie May McCoy, Mary McMahan, Iris Meeks, Margie Melcher, Steven Messer, Bruce Miller, Ada Moore, Robert Moore, Gloria Newton, John Nunan, Karen Ogden, Sylvia Packer, Elizabeth Palmer, Glenn Pardon, Darrell Penennell, James Peters, Edward Phillips, Sammy Retton, Carol Roth, Rose May Roy, Calvin Schra, Patricia Shadoan, Regina Short, Verl Sowder, Sr., Fred Tate, Jr., Joananne Terwilliger, William Thompson, Shirley Treaudo, Betty Tucker, Paula Van Slyke, Delores Waggoner, Henry Levi West, June Wigglesworth, John Wilkerson, James Wilkes, Frederick Williams, Glenn Wrestler, Sr... (Burton, Mark) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 4, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities with Proposed Order filed by Paul Abrams, Robin Kay Adkins, Henry Baker, Amy Ballard, Donald Ray Begley, Harold Bentley, Pauline Boudreaux, Mary Alice Bowles, Alexander Bowman, Marcella Buck, Melinda Cantrall, Mary Conrad, Virginia Crouch, Richard Cuzick, Donna Daniels, Fern David, Bridget Dinvaut, Gregory Dobbins, Wanda Duke, Barbara Elliott, Kenneth Evans, Richard Faulkner, Charles Gass, Ralph Giglio, Susie Gonzalez, Herbert Gordon, Altheria Griffin, Julida Helton, Teresa Henson, Lucinda Henson, John Hope, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, Kathaleen Jones, Oakley Joseph, Juanita Kilgore, Phyllis Kintz, Richard Mann, Betty Marshall, Nannie May McCoy, Mary McMahan, Iris Meeks, Margie Melcher, Steven Messer, Bruce Miller, Ada Moore, Robert Moore, Gloria Newton, John Nunan, Karen Ogden, Sylvia Packer, Elizabeth Palmer, Glenn Pardon, Darrell Penennell, James Peters, Edward Phillips, Sammy Retton, Carol Roth, Rose May Roy, Calvin Schra, Patricia Shadoan, Regina Short, Verl Sowder, Sr., Fred Tate, Jr., Joananne Terwilliger, William Thompson, Shirley Treaudo, Betty Tucker, Paula Van Slyke, Delores Waggoner, Henry Levi West, June Wigglesworth, John Wilkerson, James Wilkes, Frederick Williams, Glenn Wrestler, Sr.. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 10/18/2012. Replies due by 10/25/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Burton, Mark) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
September 5, 2012 Filing 7 Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. & Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
September 5, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
September 4, 2012 Filing 6 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Filing 5 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Filing 4 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Defendant Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Filing 3 Certification f Interested Entities or Persons filed by Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 11/27/2012 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 12/4/2012 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - [No Process] from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-12-523899. [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611078186] Filed by Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc. & Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2012: #1 Exhibit "A") (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2012: #2 Exhibit "B") (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2012: #3 Exhibit "C") (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2012: #4 Exhibit "D") (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2012: #5 Exhibit "E") (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2012: #6 Exhibit "F") (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2012: #7 Exhibit "G") (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2012: #8 Exhibit "H") (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2012: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (slh, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeks et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIEF ROBERT MOORE
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nunan
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Shadoan
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Dobbins
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Meeks
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Moore
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cuzick
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Williams
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL ROTH
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Boudreaux
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Duke
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose May Roy
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Phillips
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Conrad
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Packer
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE MILLER
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Dinvaut
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McMahan
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Elliott
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Penennell
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Evans
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakley Joseph
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Henson
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Ballard
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavette Sherod Jacobs
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Henson
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Baker
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Messer
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Levi West
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Faulkner
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Pardon
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Bowman
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Wigglesworth
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joananne Terwilliger
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Melcher
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Kilgore
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Tucker
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammy Retton
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verl Sowder, Sr.
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES PETERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM THOMPSON
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY MARSHALL
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA DANIELS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hope
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altheria Griffin
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Wrestler, Sr.
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Waggoner
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wilkerson
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Begley
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Kintz
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL ABRAMS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Schra
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Kay Adkins
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathaleen Jones
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nannie May McCoy
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Giglio
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Gass
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Bentley
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fern David
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Treaudo
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH PALMER
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Cantrall
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Gordon
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Short
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julida Helton
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Newton
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Buck
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Alice Bowles
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Van Slyke
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Tate, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilkes
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MANN
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ogden
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Crouch
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. INC.
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PLAVIX PRODUCT LIABILITY AND MARKETING LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?