JACOBSEN et al v. HARTFORD INS. COMPANY FLOOD & HOME
Plaintiff: ROBERT JACOBSEN and CAROL JACOBSEN
Defendant: HARTFORD INS. COMPANY FLOOD & HOME
Case Number: 3:2013cv06910
Filed: November 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Ocean
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4072
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 LETTER OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/13/2017. (km)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/30/2017. (km)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/31/2017. (gxh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACOBSEN et al v. HARTFORD INS. COMPANY FLOOD & HOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT JACOBSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL JACOBSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD INS. COMPANY FLOOD & HOME
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. FINAZZO
Represented By: ERIN ELIZABETH NULTY
Represented By: BRANDON L. SIPPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?