BAKER v. FISHMAN et al
Plaintiff: RALPH BAKER
Defendant: PAUL FISHMAN, SUSAN MARIE SCOTT, RONALD SIMPSON, N.J. ATTORNEY GENERAL, BREWIN JAMES, DENNIS NUGENT, STEFANO, ANTONIO CAMPOS, MELANIE FORD, ABU AHSAN, M.D. and CASSANDRA DE-CRISTIE
Case Number: 3:2014cv07583
Filed: December 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Joel A. Pisano
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 12/15/2018. (km)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/18/2018. (km)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis; the Third Amended Complaint shall be filed; Plaintiff is assessed a filing fee of $350.00 and shall pay the entire filing fee in the manner set forth in thi s Order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1) and (2), regardless ofthe outcome of the litigation; the Clerk shall DISMISS all defendants currently listed on the docket, but are not listed in Paragraph One above, from the case; the Clerk shall also ADD any defendants listed in Paragraph One that are not on currently listed on the docket; all claims that accrued before December 5. 2012, all § 1983 claims against NJDOC, and all claims regarding medical clemency, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PR EJUDICE; UMDNJ, Rutgers, Lanigan, and Johnson are hereby DISMISSED from the case; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 19 15(d), the Clerk shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve summons, the Third Amended Complaint and this Order upon the remaining defendants, with all costs of service advanced by the United States. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 6/30/2017. (seb)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that within 45 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that is consistent with the holdings above; the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this matter for docket management purposes; the Court will reopen the matter once an amended complaint that complies with the joinder rules has been filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/29/2017.(Copies Sent) (seb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAKER v. FISHMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALPH BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL FISHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD SIMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.J. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BREWIN JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS NUGENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEFANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO CAMPOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELANIE FORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABU AHSAN, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASSANDRA DE-CRISTIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?