INTERVET, INC. v. MILEUTIS LTD.
Plaintiff: INTERVET, INC.
Defendant: MILEUTIS LTD.
Case Number: 3:2015cv01371
Filed: February 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Morris
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/12/2018. (km)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/27/2017. (km)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/24/2016. (kas, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERVET, INC. v. MILEUTIS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERVET, INC.
Represented By: MARY ELIZABETH BARTKUS
Represented By: ERIC K. BLUMENFELD
Represented By: CHARLES WILLIAM COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILEUTIS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?