CONLEY v. DISTEFANO et al

Plaintiff: KEVIN CONLEY
Defendant: J. DISTEFANO, SALVATORE D'AMICO, ANTONIO CAMPOS, KENNETH NELSON, GEORGE ROBINSON and D. SHAW
Case Number: 3:2015cv01512
Filed: February 27, 2015
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Referring Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Peter G. Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff's request for an extension of time is Granted; Plaintiff shall hand his opposition brief to prison officials for filing 11/10/2017; Moving Defendants may submit their reply brief within 7 days of their receipt of Plaintiff's opposition brief; Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Sanctions, Dismissal, or Extension is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/11/2017. (km)
May 30, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/30/2017. (km)
March 5, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Denying Application for In Forma Pauperis; ORDERED that the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this case, without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee; Plaintiff is informed that administrative termination is no t a dismissal for purposes of the statute of limitations, and that if the case is reopened, it is not subject to the statute of limitations time bar if it was originally filed timely; ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he s hall so notify the Court, in writing addressed to the Clarkson S. Fisher Building & U.S. Courthouse, 402 East State Street, Trenton, NJ 08608, within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/4/2015. (kas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONLEY v. DISTEFANO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN CONLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. DISTEFANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALVATORE D'AMICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO CAMPOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?