ALSTON v. THE ESTATE OF EDWARD BIVINS et al
Plaintiff: GERALD ALSTON
Defendant: THE ESTATE OF EDWARD BIVINS, MARK BIVINS, PAM BIVINS, CHARLES D. HARDY, AL PANZANT, HARSEY HEMPHILL, LEE WILLIAMS and MANHATTAN ENTERTAINMENT INC.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05558
Filed: July 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/4/2017. (km)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/11/2017. (mps)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 7 Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Default; Defendants may file a renewed motion to set aside default supported by a legal brief in conformance with Local Civil Rule 7.1(d) by 3/28/2016. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/1/2016. (eaj) Modified on 3/1/2016 (eaj, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALSTON v. THE ESTATE OF EDWARD BIVINS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD ALSTON
Represented By: FRANK ANTHONY REINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ESTATE OF EDWARD BIVINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK BIVINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM BIVINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES D. HARDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AL PANZANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARSEY HEMPHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANHATTAN ENTERTAINMENT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?