TOWNSHIP OF LAKEWOOD, NEW JERSEY et al v. CASTRO
Plaintiff: TOWNSHIP OF LAKEWOOD, NEW JERSEY, LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC., MEIR N. HERTZ, HENYA RICHTER, RACHEL FREUNDLICH, RUTH BERL, BROCHA JACOBS, SARA LEWIN and SIMCHA HOFFMAN
Defendant: JULIAN CASTRO
Not Classified By Court: HON. JOEL ROSEN
Case Number: 3:2015cv06325
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Ocean
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 TEXT ORDER that pending the next status conference before the Magistrate Judge and resolution of the parties' outstanding discovery disputes (see letters #184 and #185 ), the Clerk's Office is hereby instructed to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this matter. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 9/19/2023. (kas)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (kas, )
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Letter from Plaintiffs in Reply to Defendant's June 8, 2023 Status Report. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Letter from Defendant HUD Responding to Plaintiff's Final Report on Outstanding Discovery Issues re #180 Status Report,,. (VIZCARRONDO, PETER)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 183 LETTER ORDER that Plaintiff's may reply to Defendant's 6/8/2023 report on outstanding discovery issues by 6/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/8/2023. (kht)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STATUS REPORT by TOWNSHIP OF LAKEWOOD, NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 181 LETTER ORDER extending Defendant's time to submit a response to Plaintiff's Final Report on Outstanding Discovery Issues until 6/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/30/2023. (jdg)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STATUS REPORT (REVISED) by TOWNSHIP OF LAKEWOOD, NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PASQUALE, MICHAEL)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 179 TEXT ORDER: The deadline for submission of Plaintiffs' revised Final Report on Outstanding Discovery Issues is 5/4/23. Defendant's response must be filed by 5/25/23. Plaintiffs' response to any outstanding issues raised by Defendant is 6/8/23. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/21/2023. (eh, )
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/20/2023. (eh, )
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 178 TEXT ORDER: The parties are to submit a joint status report by 4/14/2023, and the Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 4/20/2023 at 12:00 PM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/22/2023. (eh, )
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/16/2023. (eh, )
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 3/16/2023 at 3:00 PM. The parties will be provided dial-in information via email. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/23/2023. (eh, )
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 176 TEXT ORDER granting #175 Letter request and adjourning the telephone status conference w/o date. A new scheduling order will follow. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/20/2023. (eh, )
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Letter from AUSA J. Andrew Ruymann transmitting a request, consented to by plaintiffs, for a three-week adjournment of the January 20, 2023, telephone conference and the filing of the parties' final report of unresolved discovery issues. (RUYMANN, JOHN)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 LETTER ORDER granting extension to submit final report on unresolved disputes to 1/27/2023. Telephone Status Conference set for 1/20/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/21/2022. (mg, )
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 LETTER ORDER extedning the due date for the parties to submit their written statement of any unresolved discovery disputed until 12/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/6/2022. (jdg)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 TEXT ORDER: Any unresolved discovery disputes must be submitted to the Court in writing by 12/2/2022, and the deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to 1/27/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/9/2022. (eh, )
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/9/2022. (eh, )
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 11/9/2022 at 1:00 PM. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to initiate the call to (609) 989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/8/2022. (eh, )
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/14/2022. (eh, )
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 LETTER ORDER granting request to have the deadline for the filing for any motion for summary judgment be set for 11/15/2022; The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 9/14/2022 at 11:30 AM; Plaintiff's counsel must initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/30/2022. (jal, )
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/29/2022. (eh, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 6/29/2022 at 1:00 PM. Counsel for Defendant is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. The parties are to submit a joint status report 48 hours in advance. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/16/2022. (eh, )
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/11/2022. (eh, )
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Zahid N. Quraishi for all further proceedings. Judge Georgette Castner no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/26/2022. (jjc, )
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Georgette Castner for all further proceedings. Judge Zahid N. Quraishi no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/12/2022. (gxh)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 LETTER ORDER scheduling a Telephone Status Conference for 5/11/2022 at 11:30 AM. Defense counsel must initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/11/2022. (mg) Modified on 3/14/2022 (jmh).
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 TEXT ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer in order to submit a joint report to the Court by 1/14/22 setting forth in detail all remaining discovery to be completed, all unresolved disputes, and a proposed schedule. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/4/2022. (eh, )
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/4/2022. (eh, )
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant HUD's request for an extension, until 12/21/2021, to submit its premeditation proposal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/14/2021. (jdb)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 1/4/2022 at 11:00 AM. The parties are to use dial-in information previously provided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/29/2021. (eh, )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/29/2021. (eh, )
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 11/29/2021 at 1:30 PM. The parties have been provided dial-in information via email. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/22/2021. (eh, )
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request for an extension of time, until 09/30/2021, to submit the parties' report of all outstanding discovery and unresolved discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 09/15/2021. (jdb)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 LETTER ORDER granting request for a 30-day extension to submit the parties' report of all outstanding discovery and unresolved discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/12/2021. (jdb)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER terminating #133 MOTION to hold Defendant, Ben Carson, Secretary of the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development IN CONTEMPT and #132 MOTION Clarification of the Stipulation and Consent Order or Alternatively, to Vacate the Consent Order under Rule 60(b)(6) re #10 Stipulation and Order. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 07/13/2021. (jdb, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Zahid N. Quraishi for all further proceedings. Judge Brian R. Martinotti no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/28/2021. (mg)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Letter from counsel for Plaintiffs Requesting a Status Conference on Submission of proposed Order memorializing the Court's Ruling re #150 Motion Hearing,,. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 TEXT ORDER: The Court administratively terminated the pending motions [Doc. 132] and [Doc. 133] for the reasons set forth on the record on April 27, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 6/15/2021. (DS, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 LETTER ORDER granting a 60-day extension on the deadline to submit the parties' report of outstanding discovery and all unresolved discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 06/15/2021. (jdb)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Transcript of TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/26/2021, before Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Transcriber TRANSCRIPTS PLUS, INC. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 6/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (km)
May 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Transcript of ORAL ARGUMENT held on 4/27/2021, before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Court Reporter Cathy Ford (609-367-2777). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 5/24/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2021. (km)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 TEXT ORDER: The deadline for submission of the report of all outstanding discovery and all unresolved discovery disputes dkt. no. #147 is extended to June 15, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/28/2021. (eh, )
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Motion Hearing via Zoom held on 4/27/2021 re #133 MOTION to hold Defendant, Ben Carson, Secretary of the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development IN CONTEMPT, #132 MOTION Clarification of the Stipulation and Consent Order - The Court will administratively terminate pending motions for the reasons set forth on the record. Further directed the parties to meet and confer and submit proposed order outlining today's court ruling. (Court Reporter: Cathy Ford.) (DS, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/26/2021. (DIGITALLY RECORDED - AT&T) (eh, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Transcript of TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/16/2021, before Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Transcriber TRANSCRIPTS PLUS, INC. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 4/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2021. (km)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 LETTER ORDER granting HUD's request for an additional 5 days for the parties to file their submissions as to the proper designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) witness. The new due date is 03/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 03/26/2021. (jdb)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Hearing: Zoom oral argument re #133 MOTION to hold Defendant, Ben Carson, Secretary of the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development IN CONTEMPT and #132 MOTION Clarification of the Stipulation and Consent Order or Alternatively, to Vacate the Consent Order under Rule 60(b)(6) re #10 Stipulation and Order set for 4/27/2021 @10:00 AM before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Please confirm receipt of court notice by emailing, Dana_Sledge-Courtney@njd.uscourts.gov not later than 3/26/2021. (DS, )
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status/Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Defendant must complete its current production of documents by April 15, 2021. The parties must submit a report of all outstanding discovery and all unresolved discovery disputes to the Court by May 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 03/22/2021. (jdb)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/16/2021. (DIGITALLY RECORDED - AT&T) (eh, )
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 DISCOVERY CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/18/2021. (jdb)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Transcript of TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/27/2021, before Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Transcriber TRANSCRIPTS PLUS, INC. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 3/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2021. (km)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 3/16/2021 at 3:00 PM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/27/2021. (eh, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/27/2021. (DIGITALLY RECORDED - AT&T) (eh, )
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Transcript of TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/4/2020, before Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Transcriber TRANSCRIPTS PLUS, INC. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 1/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2021. (km)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #133 MOTION to hold Defendant, Ben Carson, Secretary of the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development IN CONTEMPT (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 TEXT ORDER: The deadline to complete fact discovery is extended to April 15, 2021. The Court will conduct a telephone status conference on 1/27/21 at 11:00AM Plaintiffs counsel must initiate the call. Counsel must submit a joint status report to the Court 48 hours in advance of the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/14/2020. (JB)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JULIAN CASTRO re #132 MOTION Clarification of the Stipulation and Consent Order or Alternatively, to Vacate the Consent Order under Rule 60(b)(6) re #10 Stipulation and Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Second) of Elizabeth Pascal with Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #132 MOTION Clarification of the Stipulation and Consent Order or Alternatively, to Vacate the Consent Order under Rule 60(b)(6) re #10 Stipulation and Order (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JULIAN CASTRO re #133 MOTION to hold Defendant, Ben Carson, Secretary of the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development IN CONTEMPT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Pascal, #2 Exhibit to Pascal Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/4/2020. (Recorded via AT&T) (eh, )
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 TEXT ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the Telephone Status Conference previously set for 12/2/2020 has been adjourned to 12/4/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The parties have been provided dial-in information via email. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/1/2020. (eh, )
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #133 MOTION to hold Defendant, Ben Carson, Secretary of the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development IN CONTEMPT , #132 MOTION Clarification of the Stipulation and Consent Order or Alternatively, to Vacate the Consent Order under Rule 60(b)(6) re #10 Stipulation and Order . Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION to hold Defendant, Ben Carson, Secretary of the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development IN CONTEMPT by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibits A through W to the November 25, 2020 Declaration of Counsel, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION Clarification of the Stipulation and Consent Order or Alternatively, to Vacate the Consent Order under Rule 60(b)(6) re #10 Stipulation and Order by JULIAN CASTRO. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Alexandra N. Iorio, #3 Exhibit s 1-13 to Iorio Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 TEXT ORDER granting #127 Letter request for a 5 day extension. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/19/2020. (eh, )
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel regarding Motions and Discovery. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Letter from Elizabeth Pascal on behalf of Defendant re #128 Letter. (PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiffs. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Letter from Elizabeth Pascal re: Extension Request. (PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Transcript of TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/29/2020, before Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Transcriber TRANSCRIPTS PLUS, INC. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 11/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2021. (km)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/29/2020. (DIGITALLY RECORDED) (eh, )
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 10/29/2020 11:30 AM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to 609-989-2144. Defense is directed to forward a copy of the Complaint filed in the Administrative action to the Court in advance of the conference. Please email to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/26/2020. (eh, )
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Letter from counsel for Plaintiff. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL) (Main Document 123 replaced on 10/23/2020) (les).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Letter from Elizabeth A. Pascal. (PASCAL, ELIZABETH) (Main Document 122 replaced on 10/23/2020) (les).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 LETTER ORDER directing Defendant to produce the last known addresses of Directors John Phillips, Milan Ozdinec, Lourdes Castro Ramirez, and John Cahill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/21/2020. (jmh)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Letter from counsel for Plaintiffs regarding Defendant's production of certain last known addresses of former HUD Directors. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/2/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Plaintiffs' counsel must initiate the call. Any unresolved disputes must be presented in a joint report to the Court no later than 11/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/20/2020. (jdb)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 CORRECTED TEXT ORDER: The time for the telephone status conference set for today is 11:00am. The parties have been provided dial-in information via email. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/19/2020. (eh, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/19/2020. (Recorded by AT&T) (eh, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 TEXT ORDER granting #116 Letter request. Telephone Status Conference adjourned to August 19, 2020 at 10:00AM. Plaintiffs counsel is to initiate the call to 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/5/2020. (eh, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Letter from Elizabeth Pascal re: Extension Request. (PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER GREGORY VIZCARRONDO on behalf of JULIAN CASTRO (VIZCARRONDO, PETER)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying Defendant's #108 Motion for Protective Order and granting in part and denying in part #109 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs are to complete the depositions of Edmonson, Thumar, and Golden no later than 07/31/2020. It is further Ordered that should Plaintiffs wish to subpoena the remaining individuals, these depositions are to be completed by 08/15/2020 and the Court will conduct a telephone status conference on 08/06/2020 at 2:00 PM. Counsel for Plaintiffs is to set up and initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 06/29/2020. (jmh)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #109 MOTION to Compel Depositions and For Sanctions against Defendant (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JULIAN CASTRO re #108 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #108 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel)(PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JULIAN CASTRO re #109 MOTION to Compel Depositions and For Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony LaBruna, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Alexandra Iorio, #4 Certificate of Service)(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #108 MOTION for Protective Order , #109 MOTION to Compel Depositions and For Sanctions. Motion set for 12/2/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Compel Depositions and For Sanctions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel & for Sanctions, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Protective Order by JULIAN CASTRO. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth Pascal, #3 Exhibit to Pascal Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Transcript of STATUS REPORT Proceedings held on 09/11/2019, before Judge DOUGLAS E. ARPERT. Transcriber TRANSCRIPT PLUS, INC. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 10/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2019. (jmh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER that (1) Plaintiffs' motion to compel the depositions on the individuals identified in Plaintiffs' letter to the court dated 07/31/2019 must be filed by 11/01/2019. (2) Defendant's motion for a Protective Order must be filed by 11/01/2018. (3) Opposition papers to these motions must be filed by 11/22/2019. and (4) Reply papers must be filed by 12/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 09/12/2019. (jmh)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Status Conference held on 9/11/2019. Ordered setting motion schedule to be filed. (DIGITALLY RECORDED) (eh, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 8/26/2019. In Person Status Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 1:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Counsel to submit position papers to the Court by 9/4/2019. (digitally recorded.) (ce3) (ce3).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Letter from Plaintiffs regarding Unresolved Discovery Disputes. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 LETTER ORDER granting request that Alexandra Iorio and Batina Washington be permitted to participate in the 08/26/2019 Conference by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/23/2019. (jmh)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Letter from Anthony LaBruna and Elizabeth Pascal re #95 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel, per Court's Order, in response to Document 96 (Defendant's July 31, 2019 letter). (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Letter from Anthony LaBruna and Elizabeth Pascal re #95 Order. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel re #95 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' July 3, 2019 deficiency letter to Defendant, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' July 31, 2019 response to paragraphs 5 - 8 of Defendant's deficiency letter)(PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Letter from Anthony LaBruna and Elizabeth Pascal re #95 Order. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER regarding ongoing discovery dispute deadlines. The Court will conduct an in-person Status Conference on 08/26/2019 at 10:00 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 06/25/2019. (jmh)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on the record on 6/24/2019. (digitally recorded.) (ce)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Letter from Anthony LaBruna and Elizabeth Pascal re #91 Order, #92 Letter. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Letter from counsel for Plaintiffs. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 LETTER ORDER that Plaintiffs must respond to Defendant's May 2, 2019 "deficiency letter" by 5/20/2019. The Township's response must be certified by a representative of the Township and Counsel, as required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/16/2019. (mmh)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE HELD ON THE RECORD re: DISCOVERY ON 4/12/2019. (digitally recorded) (ce3)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Letter from Michael P. Pasquale re #88 Letter. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Letter from Anthony LaBruna re #86 Letter, #85 Scheduling Order, #87 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/12/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Ms. Pascal is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Letter from Elizabeth Pascal re: Discovery Issues. (PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SCHEDULING ORDER: The stay of this action is vacated and it is restored to the Courts active docket. Telephone Status Conference set for 6/24/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Motions to amend/join new parties due by 6/28/2019. Telephone Status Conference set for 8/26/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/1/2019. (mmh)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 2/28/2019. (ce3)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Letter from Plaintiffs in Response to HUD Filing of Even Date. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Letter from Anthony LaBruna re Set/Reset Hearings. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/28/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Ms. Pascal is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL ADAM COHN on behalf of LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC. (COHN, MICHAEL)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE HELD ON THE RECORD re: DISCOVERY ON 12/12/2018.Counsel to submit Proposed Joint Case Management Order to the Court by 12/31/2018. (digitally recorded.) (ce3, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: In Person Status Conference set for 12/12/2018 03:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly.(ce3)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STATUS REPORT by TOWNSHIP OF LAKEWOOD, NEW JERSEY. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #77 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys WILLIAM P. HIGGINS, JR; DANIEL R. SEAMAN; STEVEN A. BECKELMAN and CLEMENT J. FARLEY terminated. This action is stayed for 60 days (until 11/5/2018). Plaintiffs' counsel must submit a status report to the Court by 10/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/5/2018. (mmh)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (mmh)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 9/5/2018. (ce3)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Letter from Anthony LaBruna re #76 Order Reopening Case, Scheduling Order, Set/Clear Flags. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #77 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by McCarter & English, LLP, counsel to Lakewood Tenants Org., Inc.. Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by McCarter & English, LLP, counsel to Lakewood Tenants Org., Inc. by nefmedtre. (Attachments: #1 Brief ISO Motion to Withdraw ("MTW"), #2 Certification of Daniel R. Seaman ISO MTW, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FARLEY, CLEMENT)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: The stay of this action is vacated. Telephone Conference set for 9/5/2018 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/16/2018. (mmh)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney DAVID VINCENT BOBER terminated. Attorney ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL for JULIAN CASTRO added.. (PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 5/15/2018. (ce3)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order that the stay of this action is continued; that mediation of this matter shall commence with HON. JOEL ROSEN, USMJ (ret.) on 5/3/2018. Telephone status conference set for 5/15/2018 at 3:00 PM before Judge Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/16/2018. (mmh)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID VINCENT BOBER on behalf of JULIAN CASTRO (BOBER, DAVID)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RUYMANN, JOHN)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JOINT STATUS REPORT. (mmh)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Administratively Terminated & Stayed. (mmh)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: This Courts stay of discovery [dkt. no. #64 ] is vacated. The matter is stayed until 2/1/2018. Joint status report due to the Court by 1/26/2018. Telephone Status Conference set for 2/15/2018 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/29/2017. (mmh)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Chambers Conference held on 11/29/2017. Case Status Conference held on the record on 11/29/2017. New Case Management Order to follow.(digitally recorded.) (ce3)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: In Person Status Conference set for 11/29/2017 12:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly.(ce3)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LETTER ORDER that the parties will each submit a confidential letter of no more than 6 pages outlining their respective positions re: settlement by 7/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/26/2017. (mmh)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TEXT ORDER : Counsel must submit a joint status report to the Court by June 23, 2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/12/2017. (ce3)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Status Conference held on 5/11/2017. (ce3)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: In Person Status Conference set for 5/11/2017 02:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. (ce3)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying #43 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/3/2017. (mmh)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/3/2017. (mmh)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order is DENIED without prejudice and Motion to Stay is GRANTED [ECF No. #48 ]; Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement and Compel [ECF No. #49 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/17/2017. (mmh)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Letter from all Plaintiffs re #62 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion. (SEAMAN, DANIEL)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JULIAN CASTRO re #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION to Stay re #30 Amended Complaint (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JULIAN CASTRO re #48 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Discovery MOTION to Stay Discovery (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE in Support filed by LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC. re #49 First MOTION to Compel Defendant to Supplement the Administrative Record and Produce Discovery Joint Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs (FARLEY, CLEMENT)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 BRIEF in Opposition filed by LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC. re #48 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Discovery MOTION to Stay Discovery Joint Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs (FARLEY, CLEMENT)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JULIAN CASTRO re #49 First MOTION to Compel Defendant to Supplement the Administrative Record and Produce Discovery (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Certification of Daniel R. Seaman to Furnish Exhibits to Amended Complaint on behalf of LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC. Re #30 Amended Complaint. (SEAMAN, DANIEL)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC. re #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION to Stay re #30 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jack T. Blosky)(FARLEY, CLEMENT)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 BRIEF in Opposition filed by RUTH BERL, RACHEL FREUNDLICH, MEIR N. HERTZ, SIMCHA HOFFMAN, BROCHA JACOBS, SARA LEWIN, HENYA RICHTER re #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION to Stay re #30 Amended Complaint (ZEMEL, FRED)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION to Stay re #30 Amended Complaint , #48 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Discovery MOTION to Stay Discovery, #49 First MOTION to Compel Defendant to Supplement the Administrative Record and Produce Discovery. Motions reset for 12/12/2016 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER for Unified Briefing Schedule for All Pending Motions. All pending Motions shall be returnable 12/12/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/4/2016. (mmh)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request for an extension of time, until 11/11/2016, to submit his response to Plaintiffs' brief; Plaintiffs' reply must be filed by 11/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/2/2016. (mmh)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Letter from Plaintiff Lakewood Tenants Organization, Inc. WIth the Consent of All Parties (Plaintiffs & Defendant) re #51 Letter. (SEAMAN, DANIEL)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Letter from Anthony LaBruna re #47 Order, #49 First MOTION to Compel Defendant to Supplement the Administrative Record and Produce Discovery. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #49 First MOTION to Compel Defendant to Supplement the Administrative Record and Produce Discovery. Motion set for 11/21/2016 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #48 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Discovery, MOTION to Stay Discovery. Motion set for 11/21/2016 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
October 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Certification of Daniel R. Seaman on behalf of LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC. Re #49 Motion to Compel. (SEAMAN, DANIEL)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 First MOTION to Compel Defendant to Supplement the Administrative Record and Produce Discovery by LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(FARLEY, CLEMENT)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Discovery, MOTION to Stay Discovery by JULIAN CASTRO. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's request that all motions provided for in the Scheduling Orders be filed by 10/28/2016 and returnable, along with Defendant's Motion, on 11/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/13/2016. (mmh)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Letter from Plaintiff Lakewood Twp. re #45 Letter. (PASQUALE, MICHAEL)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Letter from Anthony LaBruna re #44 Letter. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Letter from Plaintiff LTO re: Defendant's Motion [DI 43], and briefing and return date related to same re #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION to Stay re #30 Amended Complaint . (SEAMAN, DANIEL)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION to Stay re #30 Amended Complaint. Motion set for 10/3/2016 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ( Responses due by 9/19/2016), MOTION to Stay re #30 Amended Complaint by JULIAN CASTRO. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order Staying Discovery, #5 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Claims)(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 8/29/2016. (ce3)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/29/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/22/2016. (mps)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/15/2016 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. It shall be Mr. Seaman's responsibility to set up and initiate the call. (ce3)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 8/15/2016. (ce3)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Letter from Plaintiffs regarding administrative record dispute submitted to the Court pursuant to the Scheduling Order dated May 26, 2016 [D.I. 39], paragraph 2 re #39 Scheduling Order,. (SEAMAN, DANIEL)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 8/9/2016. (km)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs must serve written discovery requests by 8/15/2016. Telephone Conference set for 8/29/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Plaintiffs' counsel must initiate the call. Parties' respective motions for a Protective Order and to compel discovery must be filed by 10/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/26/2016. (km)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Status Conference held on 5/25/2016. (ce3)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Letter from Fred M. Zemel, Esq. re #30 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page)(ZEMEL, FRED)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: The In-Person Status Conference set for 5/25/2016 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert will now be held on 5/25/2016 at 11:00 AM. (ce3)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by JULIAN CASTRO.(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney EDWARD J. DAUBER terminated. (DAUBER, EDWARD)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Certification of Milan Ozdinec on behalf of Julian Castro on behalf of JULIAN CASTRO. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record - Pt. 2 of 20, #2 Administrative Record - Pt. 3 of 20, #3 Administrative Record - Pt. 4 of 20, #4 Administrative Record - Pt. 5 of 20, #5 Administrative Record - Pt. 6 of 20, #6 Administrative Record - Pt. 7 of 20, #7 Administrative Record - Pt. 8 of 20, #8 Administrative Record - Pt. 9 of 20, #9 Administrative Record - Pt. 10 of 20, #10 Administrative Record - Pt. 11 of 20, #11 Administrative Record - Pt. 12 of 20, #12 Administrative Record - Pt.13 of 20, #13 Administrative Record - Pt. 14 of 20, #14 Administrative Record - Pt. 15 of 20, #15 Administrative Record - Pt. 16 of 20, #16 Administrative Record - Pt. 17 of 20, #17 Administrative Record - Pt. 18 of 20, #18 Administrative Record - Pt. 19 of 20, #19 Administrative REcord - Pt. 20 of 20)(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by FRED M. ZEMEL on behalf of RUTH BERL, RACHEL FREUNDLICH, MEIR N. HERTZ, SIMCHA HOFFMAN, BROCHA JACOBS, SARA LEWIN, HENYA RICHTER (ZEMEL, FRED)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Letter from Anthony LaBruna re #28 Scheduling Order,. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Letter from Anthony LaBruna re #28 Scheduling Order,. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's request to not be required to file a motion to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/14/2016. (mmh)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC..(FARLEY, CLEMENT)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Letter from Plaintiff Lakewood Tenants Organization Confirming Leave of Court to File First Amended Complaint with Consent of Defendant re #28 Scheduling Order,. (FARLEY, CLEMENT)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant must produce the subject "administrative record" by April 15, 2016. In-Person Status Conference set for 5/25/2016 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/18/2016. (mmh)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held via telephone on 3/17/2016. (ce3)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER administratively terminating #18 Motion to Preclude Discovery. Defendant may renew the motion at any time by filing a Notice of Motion referencing the supporting papers previously filed at ECF No. #18 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/18/2016. (mmh)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Letter from Plaintiff Lakewood Tenants Organization. (FARLEY, CLEMENT)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER ORDER granting request that the pending Motion to Preclude Discovery (d.e. #18 ) be adjourned to 3/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/22/2016. (mmh)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Conference set for 1/28/2016 02:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been adjourned and rescheduled for 3/17/2016 at 10:00 A.M. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov (ce3)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Discovery. Motion reset for 3/7/2016 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Letter. (FARLEY, CLEMENT)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Letter. (FARLEY, CLEMENT)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER ORDER granting request that the pending Motion to Preclude Discovery (d.e. #18 ) be adjourned one motion cycle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/7/2016. (mmh)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Discovery. Motion set for 2/16/2016 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mmh)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Letter re #18 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Discovery. (FARLEY, CLEMENT)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER ORDER granting request that the pending Motion to Preclude Discovery be adjourned for two cycles to 2/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/21/2015. (mmh)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Discovery. Motion reset for 2/1/2016 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mmh)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Letter re #18 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Discovery. (FARLEY, CLEMENT)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Discovery. Motion set for 1/4/2016 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mmh)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Discovery by JULIAN CASTRO. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Letter from Clement J. Farley. (FARLEY, CLEMENT)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by CLEMENT J. FARLEY on behalf of LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC. (FARLEY, CLEMENT)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 1/28/2016 02:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov (ce3)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter from Anthony LaBruna. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by JULIAN CASTRO.(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JULIAN CASTRO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/9/2015. (mmh)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Julian Castro.. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. BECKELMAN on behalf of LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC. (BECKELMAN, STEVEN)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER in re Motions for Summary Judgment.. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/28/2015. (km)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY J. LABRUNA, JR on behalf of JULIAN CASTRO (LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter from Anthony J. LaBruna re #4 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause , #5 Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LABRUNA, ANTHONY)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC. re #5 Order Service of Court Order [D.I. 5] on Defendant via means provided for in Court Order (SEAMAN, DANIEL)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL R. SEAMAN on behalf of LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC. (SEAMAN, DANIEL)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Defendant shall file opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for an order to show cause by 8/28/2015. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/26/2015. (mmh)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause by LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC., TOWNSHIP OF LAKEWOOD, NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Albert Akerman w/ Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Mier Hertz w/ Exhibits, #3 Declaration of Henya Richter w/ Exhibits, #4 Declaration of Henya Michael Pasquale w/ Exhibits, #5 Supplement Westlaw cases cited in Brief, #6 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause, #7 Certificate of Service by D. Seaman)(HIGGINS, WILLIAM)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JULIAN CASTRO Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *JAWEIA CAMPBELL* (jjc)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (jjc)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JULIAN CASTRO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6596217), filed by TOWNSHIP OF LAKEWOOD, NEW JERSEY, LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjc)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The COMPLAINT #1 submitted by Michael P. Pasquale on 8/21/2015 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jjc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOWNSHIP OF LAKEWOOD, NEW JERSEY et al v. CASTRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HON. JOEL ROSEN
Represented By: JOEL B ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOWNSHIP OF LAKEWOOD, NEW JERSEY
Represented By: MICHAEL P. PASQUALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKEWOOD TENANTS ORGANIZATION, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL ADAM COHN
Represented By: CLEMENT J. FARLEY
Represented By: STEVEN A. BECKELMAN
Represented By: WILLIAM P. HIGGINS, JR.
Represented By: EDWARD J. DAUBER
Represented By: MICHAEL P. PASQUALE
Represented By: DANIEL R. SEAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEIR N. HERTZ
Represented By: MICHAEL P. PASQUALE
Represented By: FRED M. ZEMEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENYA RICHTER
Represented By: MICHAEL P. PASQUALE
Represented By: FRED M. ZEMEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL FREUNDLICH
Represented By: FRED M. ZEMEL
Represented By: MICHAEL P. PASQUALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH BERL
Represented By: FRED M. ZEMEL
Represented By: MICHAEL P. PASQUALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROCHA JACOBS
Represented By: MICHAEL P. PASQUALE
Represented By: FRED M. ZEMEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA LEWIN
Represented By: FRED M. ZEMEL
Represented By: MICHAEL P. PASQUALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMCHA HOFFMAN
Represented By: FRED M. ZEMEL
Represented By: MICHAEL P. PASQUALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIAN CASTRO
Represented By: DAVID VINCENT BOBER
Represented By: ELIZABETH PASCAL
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ANTHONY J. LABRUNA, JR.
Represented By: PETER GREGORY VIZCARRONDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?