JOAQUIN v. DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ANGELA JOAQUIN
Defendant: INSTALLATION COMPANY 1-10, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, STEVEN LEVINE, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., JOHN DOE 1-10, DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C., SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. and JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN
Case Number: 3:2015cv08194
Filed: November 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 215 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney DAVID J DISABATO terminated. (DISABATO, DAVID)
October 9, 2020 Filing 214 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney LISA R. CONSIDINE terminated. (CONSIDINE, LISA)
September 29, 2020 Filing 213 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN re #211 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 10, 2020 Filing 212 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion to Withdraw served on Julie Cohen Lonstein, Wayne Lonstein and Lonstein Law Offices, P.C. on September 4, 2020, filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Motion to Withdraw by Federal Express, #2 Proof of Service of Motion to Withdraw by Email)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 4, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #211 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 4, 2020 Filing 211 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
July 13, 2020 Filing 210 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #204 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Statement Objections to plaintiff's response to statement of undisputed facts, #2 Declaration Objections to plaintiff's declaration, #3 Declaration Objections to Wolfe's declaration, #4 Statement Response to plaintiff's supplemental statement of undisputed facts)(MODICA, ROBERT)
July 13, 2020 Filing 209 RESPONSE re #207 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
July 13, 2020 Filing 208 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
July 6, 2020 Filing 207 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #204 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Bharati O. Sharma, Esq., #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Sharma Declaration - Part One, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Sharma Declaration - Part Two, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Sharma Declaration - Part Three, #5 Statement Responsive Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion of Defendants Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Julie Cohen Lonstein, and Wayne Lonstein, #6 Statement Responsive Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion of Defendants Signal Auditing, Inc. and Steven Levine, #7 Statement Supplemental Statement of Disputed Material Facts, #8 Certificate of Service)(SHARMA, BHARATI)
June 10, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #204 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's request for a one-cycle adjournment of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment to 07/20/2020. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 06/10/2020. (jmh)
June 9, 2020 Filing 205 Letter from Bharati O. Sharma. (SHARMA, BHARATI)
June 5, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #204 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
June 4, 2020 Filing 204 MOTION for Summary Judgment by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Tina C. Ma, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 part 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 part 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 part 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #14 Statement Statement of Material Undisputed Facts, #15 Brief Memorandum of Law, #16 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #17 Certification Certificate of Service)(MODICA, ROBERT)
June 4, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
June 4, 2020 Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by BHARATI O. SHARMA on behalf of ANGELA JOAQUIN (SHARMA, BHARATI)
June 4, 2020 Filing 202 STATEMENT of Material Fact in Support filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
June 4, 2020 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW R. WOLF on behalf of ANGELA JOAQUIN (WOLF, ANDREW) (Main Document 201 replaced on 6/4/2020) (jmh).
June 4, 2020 Filing 200 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
June 4, 2020 Filing 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Spiegel in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Declaration of Julie Cohen Lonstein in Support)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
May 6, 2020 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by TINA MA on behalf of STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. (MA, TINA)
May 6, 2020 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT MODICA on behalf of STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. (MODICA, ROBERT)
May 6, 2020 Filing 196 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOANNA REBECCA COHEN terminated. Attorney ROBERT MODICA for STEVEN LEVINE,ROBERT MODICA for SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. added.. (MODICA, ROBERT)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER denying without prejudice 193 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class; terminating Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. #168 , #175 ); that, by 5/21/2020, Plaintiff may file a new motion for class certification; that, by 6/4/2020, Defendants may file new summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/30/2020. (gxh)
April 30, 2020 Filing 194 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/30/2020. (gxh)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon review of its docket. On July 17, 2018, Plaintiff Angela Joaquin ("Plaintiff") filed a motion for class certification. (ECF No. #101 .) On August 21, 2018, Defendants Lonstein Law Office, Wayne Lonstein, and Julie Lonstein (collectively, the "Lonstein Defendants") and defendants Signal Auditing, Inc. and Steve Levine (collectively, the "Signal Defendants") (with the Lonstein Defendants, "Defendants") filed motions for summary judgment. (ECF Nos. #105 , #109 .) On January 31, 2019, the Court entered a Letter Opinion and Order terminating the motions pending the resolution of certain discovery disputes. (ECF No. #142 .) On July 22, 2019, the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J., entered an order closing discovery and permitting Plaintiff to file a new motion for class certification and for Defendants to file new dispositive motions. (ECF No. #161 .) On August 5, 2019, Plaintiff filed a motion for class certification. (ECF No. #165 .). On September 6, 2019, Defendants filed motions for summary judgment. (ECF No. #168 , #175 .) Based on the Court's inherent authority to control its docket and in the interest of judicial economy, the Court finds good cause to consider Plaintiff's motion for class certification and Defendants' motions for summary judgment on the same schedule because considerable issues of law and fact are common to the motions. The Court, accordingly, deems all motions (ECF Nos. #165 , #168 , #175 ) filed on September 6, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/6/2020. (gxh)
November 1, 2019 Filing 191 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #185 Reply to Response to Motion, #186 Reply to Response to Motion, #188 Reply to Response to Motion, #189 Reply to Response to Motion, #187 Reply to Response to Motion, #190 Declaration, (LEE, FAWN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 190 DECLARATION re #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint Declaration Of Fawn M. Lee In Further Support Of Signal Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(LEE, FAWN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 189 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint Signal Defendants Objections To Paragraphs 12, 13, 15, 16, 17, And 20 Of Plaintiffs Declaration In Opposition To Summary Judgment, Dkt. No. 120-4 (LEE, FAWN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 188 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint Signal Defendants Objections To The Declaration Of Henry Wolfe And Exhibits G, I, J, K, L, And M Thereto, Dkt. No. 120-5 (LEE, FAWN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint Signal Defendants' Objections To Certain Of Plaintiffs Responses To The Signal Defendants Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts, Dkt. No. 180-2 (LEE, FAWN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint, Signal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Disputed Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1, Dkt. No. 120-2 (LEE, FAWN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 185 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment (LEE, FAWN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #182 Reply to Response to Motion, #183 Response (NOT Motion) (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
November 1, 2019 Filing 183 RESPONSE re #180 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
November 1, 2019 Filing 182 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #168 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
October 4, 2019 Filing 181 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #165 MOTION to Certify Class (DISABATO, DAVID)
October 4, 2019 Filing 180 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #168 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint, #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Statement Responsive Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Lonstein Summary Judgment, #2 Statement Responsive Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Signal Summary Judgment, #3 Statement Supplemental Statement of Disputed Material Facts in Opposition to Both Pending Summary Judgment Motions)(DISABATO, DAVID)
September 9, 2019 Filing 179 Letter from Jeffrey Spiegel to Judge Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J.. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 193 MOTION to Certify Class by ANGELA JOAQUIN. (Pursuant to Text Order (ECF No. 192), motion deemed refiled 9/6/2019. Refer to Docket Entry No. #165 for the motion papers.) (gxh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LEE, FAWN)
September 6, 2019 Filing 177 STATEMENT of Material Fact in Support filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment (LEE, FAWN)
September 6, 2019 Filing 176 BRIEF in Support filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment (LEE, FAWN)
September 6, 2019 Filing 175 MOTION for Summary Judgment by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.. Responses due by 10/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Fawn M. Lee, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1-Joaquin Deposition, #3 Exhibit 2-Defendants DepositionExhibits, #4 Exhibit 3-W. Lonstein Deposition, #5 Exhibit 4-Levine Deposition, #6 Exhibit 5-Osterhoudt Deposition, #7 Exhibit 6-Plaintiff Production, #8 Exhibit 7-11.29.17 Interrogatory Responses, #9 Exhibit 8-J. Lonstein Declaration 8.21.18, #10 Exhibit 9-J. Lonstein Deposition, #11 Exhibit 10-5.23.19 Interrogatory Responses)(LEE, FAWN)
September 6, 2019 Filing 174 BRIEF in Opposition filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #165 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Fawn M. Lee, Esq.)(LEE, FAWN)
September 6, 2019 Filing 173 DECLARATION of Julie Cohen Lonstein (Corrected) re #168 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2019 Filing 172 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #168 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint, #170 Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion, #171 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #169 Brief in Support of Motion (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2019 Filing 171 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #165 MOTION to Certify Class (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2019 Filing 170 STATEMENT of Material Fact in Support filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #168 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #168 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 169 BRIEF in Support filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #168 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2019 Filing 168 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Spiegel in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1 to Spiegel Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Spiegel Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Spiegel Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Spiegel Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Spiegel Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Spiegel Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Spiegel Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Spiegel Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Spiegel Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Spiegel Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Spiegel Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Spiegel Declaration, #14 Declaration of Julie Lonstein in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #163 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Brilling Horgan, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/21/2019. (jmh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 166 DECLARATION of David J. DiSabato, Esq. re #165 MOTION to Certify Class (Corrected) by ANGELA JOAQUIN. (DISABATO, DAVID)
August 6, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #165 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 165 MOTION to Certify Class by ANGELA JOAQUIN. Responses due by 9/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of David J. DiSabato, Esq., #3 Declaration of Henry P. Wolfe, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(DISABATO, DAVID)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 LETTER ORDER setting Briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/01/2019. (jmh)
July 31, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #163 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John Brilling Horgan. Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 163 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John Brilling Horgan by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John Brilling Horgan, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LEE, FAWN)
July 30, 2019 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by FAWN MEI LEE on behalf of STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. (LEE, FAWN)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER that the objections of the Lonstein Defendants are sustained, and the discovery period is now closed. It is further ordered that Defendants may file new Motions to Dismiss and that Plaintiff may file a new Motion to Certify the Class, and that the parties shall meet and confer to propose to the Court by 07/31/2019 a briefing schedule for those Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/22/2019. (jmh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 160 RESPONSE re #159 Order,. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER that Plaintiff has leave to reformulate interrogatories nos. 4 and 5 and file those reformulated interrogatories to the Court by way of the docket by 07/08/2019. It is further ordered that the Lonstein Defendants shall have until 07/15/2019 to file with the Court any objections to those interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/01/2019. (jmh)
June 27, 2019 Filing 158 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE HELD ON THE RECORD re: DISCOVERY ON 6/27/2019. (digitally recorded.) (ce3)
June 24, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: The In Person Status Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 9:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been adjourned and rescheduled for 6/27/2019 at 12:00 P.M. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly (ce3)
June 17, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: In Person Status Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 9:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. (ce3)
June 10, 2019 Filing 157 Letter from All Parties to Judge Arpert regarding Discovery Issues. (DISABATO, DAVID)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Granting #150 Motion to Reopen Discovery. It is Ordered that within 7 days after the issuance of this Order Plaintiff may serve 5 interrogatories on Defendants closely related to the contours of Interrogatory No. 2 and the response to that Interrogatory by the Lonstein Defendants. It is Further Ordered that the Lonstein Defendants shall have 14 days from service of those interrogatories to respond to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/24/2019. (km)
March 15, 2019 Filing 155 Letter from David J. DiSabato, Esq. in Reply to Defendants' March 8 Oppositions re #154 Letter, #153 Letter. (DISABATO, DAVID)
March 8, 2019 Filing 154 Letter from Signal Auditing, Inc. and Steven Levine in Opposition to Plaintiff's Request to Reopen Discovery re #152 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(COHEN, JOANNA)
March 8, 2019 Filing 153 Letter from Jeffrey Spiegel in Opposition to Plaintiff's Request to Reopen Discovery re #152 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Julie Cohen Lonstein)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
March 6, 2019 Filing 152 Letter from David J. DiSabato re #142 Order on Motion to Certify Class,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DISABATO, DAVID)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 LETTER ORDER approving briefing schedule with respect to Plaintiff's application pursuant to Judge Shipp's 1/31/2019 Letter Opinion and Order (d.e. #142 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/27/2019. (mmh)
February 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #150 Letter Application filed by David DiSabato on 2/22/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, this Letter Application should have been filed using the event Application/Petition found under Civil - Other Filings - Other Documents. If Counsel wishes to file a Motion to the Court please file a proper Notice of Motion and necessary supporting documents as required by the rules of Motion Practice. The deadlines created by this filing have been terminated. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
February 22, 2019 Filing 150 MOTION for Discovery per Judge Shipp's Jan. 31 Order by ANGELA JOAQUIN. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(DISABATO, DAVID)
February 22, 2019 Filing 149 Letter from Lisa R. Bouckenooghe, Esq. re #147 Order,. (BOUCKENOOGHE, LISA)
February 11, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Order attached to docket entry #148 filed by the Clerk's office on 2/11/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (mmh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting the parties request for a 60-day extension of the deadline to complete fact discovery, deadline extended to 4/15/2019; the deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to 5/24/2019; that the telephone conference set for 4/1/2019 will proceed as scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/11/2019. (mmh)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER that Counsel shall promptly meet and confer in a good faith effort to resolve the "concerns raised by the current record" as set forth in Judge Shipp's Letter Opinion and Order (d.e. #142 ), including any proposed additional discovery. Absent agreement of the Parties, the deadline for submission of Plaintiff's application for "appropriate relief" is extended to 2/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/11/2019. (mmh)
February 8, 2019 Filing 146 Letter from Joanna R. Cohen re #142 Order on Motion to Certify Class,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #143 Letter. (COHEN, JOANNA)
February 7, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA R. BOUCKENOOGHE on behalf of ANGELA JOAQUIN (BOUCKENOOGHE, LISA)
February 7, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J DISABATO on behalf of ANGELA JOAQUIN (DISABATO, DAVID)
February 6, 2019 Filing 143 Letter from David J. DiSabato, Esq.. (DISABATO, DAVID)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 LETTER OPINION AND ORDER terminating #101 Motion to Certify Class; terminating #105 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating #109 Motion for Summary Judgment; directing that Plaintiff may move before Judge Arpert for appropriate relieve by 2/14/2019. The Parties shall advised the Court within 7 days of Judge Arpert's decision at which time the Court will enter an appropriate Order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/31/2019. (mmh)
November 7, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 11/7/2018. (ce3)
November 2, 2018 Filing 141 Letter from Joanna Cohen. (COHEN, JOANNA)
October 24, 2018 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #132 Brief in Support of Motion, #131 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #130 Response (NOT Motion) (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
October 22, 2018 Filing 139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #137 Reply to Response to Motion, #135 Reply to Response to Motion, #133 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #138 Declaration, #136 Reply to Response to Motion, #134 Reply to Response to Motion, (COHEN, JOANNA)
October 22, 2018 Filing 138 DECLARATION re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint Certification Of Joanna R. Cohen In Further Support Of Signal Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to J. Cohen Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 to J. Cohen Decl.)(COHEN, JOANNA)
October 22, 2018 Filing 137 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint Signal Defendants Objections To Paragraphs 12, 13, 15, 16, 17, And 20 Of Plaintiffs Declaration In Opposition To Summary Judgment, Dkt. No. 120-4 (COHEN, JOANNA)
October 22, 2018 Filing 136 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint Signal Defendants Objections To The Declaration Of Henry Wolfe And Exhibits G, I, J, K, L, And M Thereto, Dkt. No. 120-5 (COHEN, JOANNA)
October 22, 2018 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint Signal Defendants' Objections To Certain Of Plaintiffs Responses To The Signal Defendants Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts, Dkt. No. 120-2 (COHEN, JOANNA)
October 22, 2018 Filing 134 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint Signal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Disputed Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1, Dkt. No. 120-1 (COHEN, JOANNA)
October 22, 2018 Filing 133 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (COHEN, JOANNA)
October 22, 2018 Filing 132 BRIEF in Support filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint /Lonstein Defendants' Objections to Certain Filings by Plaintiff in Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motions (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
October 22, 2018 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint - Defendants Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Wayne Lonstein and July Cohen Lonstein's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
October 22, 2018 Filing 130 RESPONSE re #120 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
October 9, 2018 Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #101 MOTION to Certify Class Signal Defendants Sur-Reply in Response to Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Further Support of Her Motion for Class Certification (COHEN, JOANNA)
October 9, 2018 Filing 128 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #101 MOTION to Certify Class - Lonstein Defendants Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law in Response to Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Further Support of Her Motion for Class Certification (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 TEXT ORDER: On October 2, 2018, the Court Granted Defendants' request for leave to file sur-replies. (ECF Nos. #125 , #126 .) Defendants must file the sur-replies by October 9, 2018. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/3/2018. (gxh)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 LETTER ORDER granting the request of the Lonstein Defendants for leave to file a sur-reply. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/2/2018. (mmh)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 LETTER ORDER granting the request of the Signal Defendants for leave to file a sur-reply. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/2/2018. (mmh)
October 2, 2018 Filing 124 Letter from Jeffrey Spiegel to Judge Michael A. Shipp re: Request to File Sur-Reply. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
October 2, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #123 Letter Request for leave to file sur-reply filed by Jeffrey Spiegel on 10/1/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Letter Request USING the event Letter found under Civil - Other Filings - Other Documents. The deadlines created by this filing have been terminated. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
October 1, 2018 Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
October 1, 2018 Filing 122 Letter from Joanna R. Cohen. (COHEN, JOANNA)
September 21, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: The Telephone Status Conference set for 9/24/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been adjourned and rescheduled for 11/7/2018 at 12:00 P.M. (ce3)
September 21, 2018 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #101 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(WOLFE, HENRY)
September 21, 2018 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint, #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Statement Supplemental Statement of Disputed Facts, #2 Statement Responsive Statement to Signal Auditing, Inc., #3 Statement Responsive Statement to Lonstein Law Office, #4 Declaration of Plaintiff Joaquin, #5 Declaration of H. Wolfe, #6 Exhibit A to Wolfe Decl., #7 Exhibit B to Wolfe Decl., #8 Exhibit C to Wolfe Decl., #9 Exhibit D to Wolfe Decl., #10 Exhibit E to Wolfe Decl., #11 Exhibit F to Wolfe Decl., #12 Exhibit G to Wolfe Decl., #13 Exhibit H to Wolfe Decl., #14 Exhibit I to Wolfe Decl., #15 Exhibit J to Wolfe Decl., #16 Exhibit K to Wolfe Decl., #17 Exhibit L to Wolfe Decl., #18 Exhibit M to Wolfe Decl., #19 Exhibit N to Wolfe Decl.)(WOLFE, HENRY)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's request for an extension of time, until 9/20/2018, to file opposition to the Defendants' pending motions for summary judgment and in reply to her pending motion for class certification. Defendants' time for reply to the summary judgment motions is extended to 10/22/2018. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/20/2018. (mmh)
September 19, 2018 Filing 118 Letter from Wolfe to Judge Arpert re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint, #101 MOTION to Certify Class , #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint. (WOLFE, HENRY)
September 17, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by JOANNA REBECCA COHEN on behalf of STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. (COHEN, JOANNA)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting request of Plaintiff for a five-day extension of the due date for the Plaintiffs' briefing in respond to two motions for summary judgment and in reply to the two briefs filed in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/12/2018. (mmh)
September 7, 2018 Filing 115 Letter from H. Wolfe re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint, #101 MOTION to Certify Class , #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint. (WOLFE, HENRY)
August 22, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KATHERINE RHODES JANOFSKY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mmh)
August 22, 2018 Filing 114 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Katherine Rhodes Janofsky to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8971567.) (SULLIVAN, MICHAEL)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to Katherine Rhodes Janofsky, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/22/2018. (mmh)
August 22, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint, #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint. Motions set for 10/15/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
August 22, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #104 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Katherine Rhodes Janofsky. Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
August 21, 2018 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #101 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Sullivan with Exhibit)(SULLIVAN, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2018 Filing 111 STATEMENT of Material Fact in Support filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service for Motion for Summary Judgment)(SULLIVAN, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2018 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (SULLIVAN, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2018 Filing 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.. Responses due by 10/15/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Sullivan in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Sullivan Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Sullivan Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Sullivan Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Sullivan Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Sullivan Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Sullivan Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Sullivan Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Sullivan Declaration)(SULLIVAN, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2018 Filing 108 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #101 MOTION to Certify Class (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
August 21, 2018 Filing 107 STATEMENT of Material Fact in Support filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service for Motion for Summary Judgment, Declaration of Jeffrey Spiegel, Declaration of Julie Cohen Lonstein, Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Material Undisputed Facts Pursuant to Rule 56.1)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
August 21, 2018 Filing 106 BRIEF in Support filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
August 21, 2018 Filing 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Second Amended Complaint by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. Responses due by 9/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Spiegel in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Spiegel Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Spiegel Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Spiegel Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Spiegel Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Spiegel Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Spiegel Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Spiegel Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Spiegel Declaration, #10 Declaration Declaration of Julie Cohen Lonstein in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
August 21, 2018 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Katherine Rhodes Janofsky by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Katherine Rhodes Janofsky, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SULLIVAN, MICHAEL)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines as to Plaintiff's motion for class certification and Defendants' motions for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/2/2018. (mmh)
August 1, 2018 Filing 102 Letter from Jeffrey Spiegel to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert re: Proposed Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
July 17, 2018 Filing 101 MOTION to Certify Class by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/13/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration with Exhibits A - C, #3 Certificate of Service)(WOLFE, HENRY)
June 14, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 6/14/2018. (ce3)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TEXT ORDER: For the reasons set forth during the status conference with counsel on 6/14/2018, Plaintiff's Informal Application to Compel the deposition of a representative of Defendant Signal is GRANTED and must be completed by 6/29/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/14/2018. (ce3)
June 7, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/14/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. It shall be Mr. Wolfe's responsibility to set up and initiate the call. (ce3)
May 31, 2018 Filing 99 Letter from Wolfe to Judge Arpert Requesting Status Conf. re #98 Scheduling Order. (WOLFE, HENRY)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/24/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/1/2018. (mps)
April 30, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2018. (ce3)
March 6, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/30/2018 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3)
March 2, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 3/2/2018. (ce3)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 LETTER ORDER setting schedule for the joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/22/2018. (mmh)
January 17, 2018 Filing 96 Letter from Wolfe to Judge Arpert re Joint Status Report. (WOLFE, HENRY)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 TEXT ORDER: Counsel must submit a joint status report to the Court by 1/8/18 including a detailed description of any discovery dispute(s). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/8/17. (eh, )
December 5, 2017 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/5/2017. (eh, )
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/13/2017. (km)
October 12, 2017 Filing 93 Letter from Wolfe to Judge Arpert. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Confidentiality Order)(WOLFE, HENRY)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/5/2017 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Fact Discovery due by 4/13/2018. Motions to amend/join new parties due by 2/14/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/8/2017. Telephone Status Conference set for 3/2/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/4/2017. (mmh)
September 29, 2017 Filing 91 Letter from Wolfe to Judge Arpert re #88 Scheduling Order,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WOLFE, HENRY)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying #84 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/7/2017. (mmh)
September 7, 2017 Filing 89 LETTER OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/7/2017. (mmh)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/5/2017 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Fact Discovery due by 3/30/2018. Motions to amend/join new parties due by 1/31/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/8/2017. Telephone Status Conference set for 3/2/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/23/2017. (mmh)
August 15, 2017 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Status Conference held on 8/15/2017. (ce3)
August 15, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #87 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan submitted by Henry Wolfe on 8/14/2017 must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. Please forward to the appropriate Judicial Officer in accordance with his/her preferred practice as found on our website. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
August 14, 2017 Filing 87 Joint Discovery Plan by ANGELA JOAQUIN.(WOLFE, HENRY)
July 14, 2017 Filing 86 Letter from Henry Wolfe re #84 MOTION for Reconsideration re #80 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #79 Opinion . (WOLFE, HENRY)
July 11, 2017 Filing 85 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC..(SPROVIERO, GLEN)
July 11, 2017 Filing 84 MOTION for Reconsideration re #80 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #79 Opinion by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.. (SPROVIERO, GLEN)
July 11, 2017 Filing 83 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C..(SHAPIRO, PETER)
July 10, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: In Person Status Conference set for 8/15/2017 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Counsel must submit a joint status report to the Court at least 24 hours in advance of the conference.(ce3)
June 27, 2017 Filing 82 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ERIC DAVID WONG terminated. (WONG, ERIC)
June 27, 2017 Filing 81 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney PHILIP R. SELLINGER terminated. (SELLINGER, PHILIP)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 62, 68) are GRANTED without prejudice with respect to Count One of the Second Amended Complaint. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are DENIED with respect to Count Two of the Second Amended Complaint. Defendants' Motion to Strike are DENIED. Defendants' Motions to Stay Discovery are DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/27/2017. (seb)
June 27, 2017 Filing 79 LETTER OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/27/2017. (seb)
June 9, 2017 Filing 78 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #62 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint SURREPLY (WOLFE, HENRY)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff Angela Joaquin's ("Plaintiff") February 8, 2017 correspondence (ECF No. #73 ), objecting to new arguments in Defendants Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Julie Cohen Lonstein, and Wayne Lonstein's (collectively, the "Lonstein Defendants") Reply Brief (ECF No. #70 ) with respect to the First Amendment and the Noerr-Pennington Doctrine. Upon review of the parties' submissions, the Court permits Plaintiff to file a supplemental brief limited to the applicability of the First Amendment and the Noerr-Pennington Doctrine by June 9, 2017. The Court will not grant any extensions and Defendants will not be permitted to respond. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/2/2017. (gxh)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying Lonstein Defendants' #48 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/5/2017. (seb)
April 5, 2017 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/5/2017. (seb)
February 13, 2017 Filing 74 Letter from Jeffrey Spiegel to Hon. Michael A. Shipp re #73 Letter. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
February 8, 2017 Filing 73 Letter re #70 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (WOLFE, HENRY)
February 6, 2017 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.. (SPROVIERO, GLEN)
February 6, 2017 Filing 71 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. re #68 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (SPROVIERO, GLEN)
February 6, 2017 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #62 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (SHAPIRO, PETER)
January 23, 2017 Filing 69 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #62 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, #68 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WOLFE, HENRY)
December 28, 2016 Reset Deadlines as to #68 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Motion reset for 2/21/2017 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
December 22, 2016 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, when entering a first appearance in a case, counsel should add their name when prompted. The Clerks office has added MICHAEL J. SULLIVAN as representing SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. and STEVEN LEVINE in this case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (km)
December 22, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #68 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 1/17/2017 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
December 22, 2016 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(SPROVIERO, GLEN)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 LETTER ORDER approving the parties' proposed unified briefing schedule re: Motion(s) to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/19/2016. (mmh)
December 14, 2016 Filing 66 Letter from H. Wolfe re proposed briefing schedule on motions to dismiss re #62 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, #65 Waiver of Service Executed. (WOLFE, HENRY)
December 14, 2016 Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANGELA JOAQUIN. STEVEN LEVINE waiver sent on 11/9/2016, answer due 1/9/2017; SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. waiver sent on 11/9/2016, answer due 1/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WOLFE, HENRY)
December 1, 2016 Reset Deadlines as to #62 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 1/3/2017 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (eaj)
November 30, 2016 Filing 64 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #62 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . (WOLFE, HENRY)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 TEXT ORDER: In light of Plaintiff filing a Second Amended Complaint, ECF No. #59 , the Second Amended Complaint is now the operative pleading, and Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's earlier filed complaint, ECF No. #51 is terminated as moot. Motions terminated: #51 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C., JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN.. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/30/2016. (gxh)
November 18, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #62 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 12/19/2016 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
November 18, 2016 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. Responses due by 1/3/2017 (Attachments: #1 Certification in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Wayne Lonstein and Julie Cohen Lonstein's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(SHAPIRO, PETER)
November 3, 2016 Filing 61 SUMMONS ISSUED on Amended Complaint as to STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Melissa M. Haneke* (mmh)
November 2, 2016 Filing 60 Request for Summons to be Issued by ANGELA JOAQUIN as to STEVEN LEVINE, SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Steven Levine (unsigned), #2 Summons to Signal Auditing, Inc. (unsigned))(WOLFE, HENRY)
October 31, 2016 Filing 59 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against STEVEN LEVINE, JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C., SIGNAL AUDITING, INC., filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN.(WOLFE, HENRY)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 LETTER ORDER approving the briefing schedule for the Defendants' intended Motion to Dismiss. The Second Amended Complaint must be filed by 11/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/26/2016. (mmh)
October 24, 2016 Filing 57 Letter from H. Wolfe re Pretrial Conference - Initial, #56 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint)(WOLFE, HENRY)
October 14, 2016 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Signal Auditing, Inc., WAYNE D. LONSTEIN, STEVEN LEVINE, filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN.(WOLFE, HENRY)
October 13, 2016 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/13/2016. (ce3)
October 12, 2016 ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Initial conference set for 10/13/2016, will proceed in person in courtroom 6W at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. (ce3)
September 30, 2016 Filing 55 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #48 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #43 Order Reopening Case Notice of Motion (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Henry P. Wolfe, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFE, HENRY)
September 27, 2016 Reset Deadlines as to #51 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 11/7/2016 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
September 26, 2016 Filing 54 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #51 MOTION to Dismiss . (WOLFE, HENRY)
September 26, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #51 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/17/2016 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
September 23, 2016 Filing 53 Letter from Jeffrey Spiegel re #52 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #51 MOTION to Dismiss . (SHAPIRO, PETER)
September 23, 2016 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #51 MOTION to Dismiss (SHAPIRO, PETER)
September 23, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service)(SHAPIRO, PETER)
September 13, 2016 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #48 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #43 Order Reopening Case Notice of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 13, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #48 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #43 Order Reopening Case Notice of Motion. Motion set for 10/17/2016 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
September 13, 2016 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #49 Memorandum of Law filed by Jeffrey Spiegel on 9/12/2016 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Memorandum USING Memorandum in Support found under Civil - Motions and Related Filings - Responses and Replies. The deadlines created by this incorrect filing have been terminated. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
September 12, 2016 Filing 49 First MOTION for Reconsideration Memorandum of Law by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 12, 2016 Filing 48 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #43 Order Reopening Case Notice of Motion by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ORDER : To the extent that Defendants Lonstein Law Offices, P.C. and Julie Cohen Lonstein's September 2, 2016 letter, ECF No. #44 is effectively seeking reconsideration of this Court's September 2, 2016 Order, ECF No. #43 , the Defendants must file a Motion for Reconsideration pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(i). So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/9/16. (NR)
September 7, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER THOMAS SHAPIRO on behalf of JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. (SHAPIRO, PETER)
September 6, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/13/2016 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due 48 hours prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov (ce3)
September 2, 2016 Filing 44 Letter from Lonstein Law Offices, P.C. and Julie Cohen Lonstein regarding ECF No. 42. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Lifting the Stay and Administrative termination of this case; Ordering Defendants Lonstein Law and Ms. Lonstein shall serve a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by 9/23/2016. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/2/2016. (eaj)
September 1, 2016 Filing 42 Letter from Henry P. Wolfe re #41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #40 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Stay,,,. (WOLFE, HENRY)
September 1, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ANGELA JOAQUIN (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WOLFE, HENRY)
August 30, 2016 ***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (mmh)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that Defendants DIRECTV and Verizon's motions to stay and compel arbitration (docket entries #16 and #17 ) are GRANTED; that Defendants Lonstein Law and Ms. Lonstein's motion to compel arbitration (d.e. #15 ) is DENIED; the case is stayed and administratively terminated pending arbitration. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/30/2016. (mmh) Modified on 8/31/2016 (eaj, ).
August 30, 2016 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/30/2016. (mmh)
February 29, 2016 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. re #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 1, et seq. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
February 29, 2016 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Support filed by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. re #16 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SELLINGER, PHILIP)
February 29, 2016 Filing 36 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC. re #17 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitraton (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Marc E. Wolin, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLIN, MARC)
February 12, 2016 Filing 35 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #16 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WOLFE, HENRY)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 LETTER ORDER Granting Plaintiff's request for an extension. The brief in opposition to Verizon's motion to compel arbitration #16 is rescheduled for 2/12/2016. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/11/2016. (km)
February 10, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY PAUL WOLFE on behalf of ANGELA JOAQUIN (WOLFE, HENRY)
February 10, 2016 Filing 32 Letter re #31 Brief in Opposition to Motion,. (WOLFE, HENRY)
February 10, 2016 Filing 31 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #17 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitraton, #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 1, et seq. CORRECTED VERSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WOLFE, HENRY)
February 9, 2016 Filing 30 Letter from Henry P. Wolfe re #16 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitration. (WOLFE, HENRY)
February 9, 2016 Filing 29 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #17 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitraton, #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 1, et seq. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WOLFE, HENRY)
February 9, 2016 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 2/9/2016. (ce3)
February 2, 2016 Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitraton. Motion reset for 3/7/2016 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the time within which Plaintiff shall oppose the pending Motions to Compel is extended through and including 2/9/2016; Defendants Reply due by 2/29/2016 and the return date of DIRECTV's Motion to Compel Arbitration is adjourned to 3/7/2016. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/2/2016. (mmh)
February 1, 2016 Filing 27 Letter from Marc E. Wolin re #23 Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consented to by all parties)(WOLIN, MARC)
January 26, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY SPIEGEL on behalf of JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
January 26, 2016 Filing 25 Substitution of Attorney -. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
January 14, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Conference set for 2/9/2016 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been converted to a telephone status conference. Counsel for Defendant is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3)
January 14, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ARCHIS A. PARASHARAMI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mmh)
January 13, 2016 Filing 24 Letter from Defendant Verizon Communications Inc.. (SELLINGER, PHILIP)
January 13, 2016 Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitraton, #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 1, et seq., #16 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitration. Motions reset for 2/16/2016 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER ORDER granting request that the pending motions (docket entries #15 , #16 and #17 ) be adjourned one cycle. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/13/2016. (mmh)
January 13, 2016 Filing 22 Letter re #17 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitraton, #16 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitration, #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 1, et seq.. (WOLFE, HENRY)
January 13, 2016 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Archis A. Parasharami to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WOLIN, MARC)
January 12, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee as to ARCHIS A. PARASHARAMI, ESQ: $ 150, receipt number NEW028286 (DD, )
January 12, 2016 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - This message is pursuant to the #18 , #19 and #20 Rule 7.1 Letters filed by Henry Wolfe on 1/11/2016. Please be advised that Rule 7.1 applies to dispositive motions and the Clerk cannot automatically reset these motions. These requests have been forwarded to Chambers. (mmh)
January 11, 2016 Filing 20 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #17 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitraton (WOLFE, HENRY)
January 11, 2016 Filing 19 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #16 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitration (WOLFE, HENRY)
January 11, 2016 Filing 18 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ANGELA JOAQUIN re #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 1, et seq. (WOLFE, HENRY)
January 11, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitraton, #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 1, et seq., #16 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitration. Motions set for 2/1/2016 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mmh)
January 8, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitraton by DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Ivy S. Rankin, #3 Declaration of Daniel Jones, #4 Declaration of Marc E. Wolin, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(WOLIN, MARC)
January 8, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay and to Compel Arbitration by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Rambabu Chennupati, #3 Certification of Veronica C. Glennon, #4 Certification of Debra Opie, #5 Certification of Michael Lamison, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(SELLINGER, PHILIP)
January 8, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 1, et seq. by JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Law Office, P.C. and Julie Cohen Lonstein's Motion to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 1, et seq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Admission pro hac vice as to Archis A. Parasharami, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/4/2016. (mmh)
December 31, 2015 Filing 13 APPLICATION/PETITION for and Certification of Marc E. Wolin in support of the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Archis A. Parasharami, Esq. for by DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Archis A. Parasharami, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(WOLIN, MARC)
December 2, 2015 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
November 30, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC DAVID WONG on behalf of VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (WONG, ERIC)
November 30, 2015 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (SELLINGER, PHILIP)
November 30, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP R. SELLINGER on behalf of VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (SELLINGER, PHILIP)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the time within which Defendants may respond to Plaintiff's Putative Class Action Complaint is extended to and including 1/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/30/2015. (mmh)
November 24, 2015 Filing 7 Letter from Marc E. Wolin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WOLIN, MARC)
November 24, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY SPIEGEL on behalf of JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN, LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
November 23, 2015 Filing 5 Certification of Marc E. Wolin pursuant to Local Civil Rule 201.1(d)(1) and 201.1(d)(3) on behalf of DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.. (WOLIN, MARC)
November 23, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 2/9/2016 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov (ce3)
November 23, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN on behalf of DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC. (HALPERN, JAKOB)
November 20, 2015 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.. (mps)
November 20, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (mps)
November 20, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number MID-L-15-6149. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6771313), filed by DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(mps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOAQUIN v. DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA JOAQUIN
Represented By: ANDREW R. WOLF
Represented By: ANDREW WEI LI
Represented By: HENRY PAUL WOLFE
Represented By: BHARATI O. SHARMA
Represented By: LISA R. CONSIDINE
Represented By: DAVID J DISABATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSTALLATION COMPANY 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE D. LONSTEIN
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: PETER THOMAS SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN LEVINE
Represented By: TINA MA
Represented By: ROBERT MODICA
Represented By: FAWN MEI LEE
Represented By: MICHAEL J. SULLIVAN
Represented By: GLEN AUSTIN SPROVIERO
Represented By: JOANNA REBECCA COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: ERIC DAVID WONG
Represented By: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: MARC E. WOLIN
Represented By: JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONSTEIN LAW OFFICES, P.C.
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: PETER THOMAS SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIGNAL AUDITING, INC.
Represented By: TINA MA
Represented By: ROBERT MODICA
Represented By: FAWN MEI LEE
Represented By: MICHAEL J. SULLIVAN
Represented By: GLEN AUSTIN SPROVIERO
Represented By: JOANNA REBECCA COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: PETER THOMAS SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?