PIDTERGERYA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: OLEG PIDTERGERYA
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2016cv00704
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Peter G. Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/22/2019. (mmh)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/21/2017. (mmh) Modified on 9/28/2017 (mmh).
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate this case and send Petitioner certain forms; that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall notify the Court, in writing, within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 2/19/2016. (mmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PIDTERGERYA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOSHUA GARY HAFETZ
Represented By: ERIC W. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OLEG PIDTERGERYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?