BHATT v. FUENTES et al
Plaintiff: BHATT and MS. CHAULA S. BHATT
Defendant: FUENTES, COLONEL JOSEPH FUENTES, ROBERT LOUGY, JOHN JAY HOFFMAN, MR. JOHN A. TONELLI, MS. JANET MIHALOPOULOS, MAXIMATION LLC, VG LABS, INC, MR. SUNDER GOVINDRAJAN, MR. DALLAS, MR. SRINIVAS GUNTUKA and "INVISIBLE" PARTICIPANTS
Case Number: 3:2016cv02081
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER ORDER denying #59 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/10/2018. (km)
November 20, 2017 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by CHAULA S. BHATT re #59 MOTION to Reopen Case. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(mmh)
November 6, 2017 Filing 60 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JANET MIHALOPOULOS re #59 MOTION to Reopen Case (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WIESELTHIER, SARAH)
October 24, 2017 Filing 59 MOTION to Reopen Case by CHAULA S. BHATT. (km)
October 24, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #59 MOTION to Reopen Case. Motion set for 11/20/2017 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
January 27, 2017 Filing 58 Letter from Chaula Bhatt. (km)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/21/2016. (km)
December 20, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #54 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 1/17/2017 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 LETTER ORDER granting #37 Motion to Set Aside Default; Defendant is directed to file answer no later than 1/6/2017. The #24 Motion for Default Judgment is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/19/2016. (km)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER ORDER granting #36 Motion to Set Aside Default; Defendants are directed to file answers no later than 1/6/2017. The #23 Motion for Default Judgment is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/19/2016. (km)
December 19, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss by JOSEPH FUENTES, JOHN JAY HOFFMAN, ROBERT LOUGY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(FREEMAN, MARVIN)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time. Defendant shall file responsive pleading within 10 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/14/2016. (km)
December 14, 2016 Filing 52 Declaration in Support of #44 Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Responsive Pleading Out of Time Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.6(b) by Marvin L. Freeman. (km)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Freda L. Wolfson for all further proceedings. Judge Brian R. Martinotti no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 12/5/2016. (jjc)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: In-Person Status Conference held on 12/5/2016. Judge Martinotti recused himself from case. Ordered case be reassigned to another district judge. Further ordered procedural motions to be handled by magistrate judge. (Court Reporter: Regina Tell.) (DS)
November 30, 2016 Filing 49 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney RENATO HIPOLITO RONQUILLO, II terminated. Attorney ASHLEY LAURA COSTELLO for JOHN A. TONELLI added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COSTELLO, ASHLEY)
November 22, 2016 Filing 48 Letter from Defendant John Tonelli confirming Dec. 5, 2016 oral argument. (RONQUILLO, RENATO)
November 21, 2016 Filing 47 Letter from H. Benjamin Sharlin, Esq. to Judge Martinotti. (SHARLIN, H.)
November 21, 2016 Filing 46 Letter from Defendants Hoffman, Lougy and Colonel Fuentes. (FREEMAN, MARVIN)
November 21, 2016 Filing 45 Letter from Sarah Wieselthier re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,. (WIESELTHIER, SARAH)
November 21, 2016 ATTENTION PARTIES: Oral argument re #37 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Allow Filing of Responsive Pleading out of Rule, #23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, #44 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time, #35 MOTION to Dismiss , #36 Cross MOTION to Set Aside Default , and #24 MOTION for Default Judgment has been set for 12/5/2016 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Counsel to confirm receipt of court notice by letter (e-file) not later than 11/22/2016 and plaintiff to confirm by letter (via postal service) mailed to the Clerk's office not later than 11/28/2016. (DS)
October 17, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #44 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time. Motion set for 11/7/2016 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
October 14, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time by JOSEPH FUENTES, JOHN JAY HOFFMAN, ROBERT LOUGY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Statement, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FREEMAN, MARVIN)
September 16, 2016 Filing 43 Letter regarding to d.e. #42 the "reply" filed by defense counsel on 9/14/2016 from Chaula Bhatt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order A, #2 Text of Proposed Order B, #3 Text of Proposed Order C)(km)
September 14, 2016 Filing 42 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JANET MIHALOPOULOS re #37 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Allow Filing of Responsive Pleading out of Rule (WIESELTHIER, SARAH)
September 12, 2016 Filing 41 BRIEF in Opposition to Defendant Tonelli filed by CHAULA S. BHATT re #35 MOTION to Dismiss (km)
September 12, 2016 Filing 40 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHAULA S. BHATT re #37 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Permit Delayed Reply and Allow Filing of Responsive Pleading out of Rule (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(km)
September 7, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH WIESELTHIER on behalf of JANET MIHALOPOULOS (WIESELTHIER, SARAH)
September 1, 2016 Filing 38 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHAULA S. BHATT re #36 Cross MOTION to Set Aside Default (km)
August 25, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Allow Filing of Responsive Pleading out of Rule by JANET MIHALOPOULOS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VOIGT, STEVEN)
August 25, 2016 Filing 36 Cross MOTION to Set Aside Default by SRINIVAS GUNTUKA, VG LABS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Letter Brief, #2 Certification of Srinivas Guntuka, #3 Certification of Counsel, #4 Exhibit to Certification of Counsel, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SHARLIN, H.)
August 25, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #36 Cross MOTION to Set Aside Default . Motion set for 9/19/2016 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
August 25, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #37 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Allow Filing of Responsive Pleading out of Rule. Motion set for 9/19/2016 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
August 18, 2016 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN A. TONELLI. Responses due by 9/6/2016 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(RONQUILLO, RENATO)
August 18, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 9/19/2016 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
August 17, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN T. VOIGT on behalf of JANET MIHALOPOULOS (VOIGT, STEVEN)
August 10, 2016 Filing 33 Letter in response to on line filings made by opposition's new counsel H.Benjamin Sharlin, on July 25, 2016 from Chaula Bhatt. (km)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 8/8/2016. (gxh)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER ORDER Granting Defense Counsel's request, Opposition/Cross-Motion to be filed by 8/25/2016, Replies due 9/1/2016, Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION for Default Judgment. Motion reset for 9/6/2016 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/26/2016. (km)
July 25, 2016 Filing 30 Letter from H. Benjamin Sharlin, Esquire to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson, U.S.D.J.. (SHARLIN, H.)
July 25, 2016 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VG LABS, INC. (SHARLIN, H.)
July 25, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by H. BENJAMIN SHARLIN on behalf of SRINIVAS GUNTUKA, VG LABS, INC (SHARLIN, H.)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Defendant John Tonelli to answer, move or otherwise reply to Plaintiff's complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/19/2016. (km)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Defendants, John Jay Hoffman, Robert Lougy and Colonel Joseph Fuentes are to answer, move or otherwise plead to the complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/19/2016. (km)
July 19, 2016 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS. RONALD BROWN, owner of MAXIMATION LLC served on 7/11/2016, answer due 8/1/2016. (km)
July 8, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to JANET MIHALOPOLOUS by CHAULA S. BHATT. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(km)
July 8, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to VG Labs and Mr. Srinivas Guntuka by CHAULA S. BHATT. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(km)
July 8, 2016 Filing 22 Request for Default by CHAULA S. BHATT against JANET MIHALOPOLOUS. (km)
July 8, 2016 Filing 21 Request for Default by CHAULA S. BHATT against SRINIVAS GUNTUKA, SUNDER GOVINDRAJAN AND VG LABS, INC. (km) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2016: #1 Certificate of Service) (km, ).
July 8, 2016 Filing 20 RESPONSE/MOTION in Opposition filed by CHAULA S. BHATT re #19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, # 2 Certificate of Service)(km)
July 8, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint. Motion set for 8/1/2016 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
July 8, 2016 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SRINIVAS GUNTUKA, SUNDER GOVINDRAJAN, VG LABS, INC, AND JANET MIHALOPOULOS for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (km)
July 8, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, #24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to. Motion set for 8/1/2016 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
July 7, 2016 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by JOHN A. TONELLI. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Statement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(RONQUILLO, RENATO)
July 7, 2016 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to VG LABS, INC and SRINIVAS GUNTUKA filed by Anna Bates. (km)
July 7, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JOSEPH FUENTES, JOHN JAY HOFFMAN, ROBERT LOUGY. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FREEMAN, MARVIN)
July 7, 2016 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The application for an automatic extension #18 to extend the time for defendants to Answer Complaint has expired. Therefor the request for the clerks extension extension is denied. (km)
July 6, 2016 Filing 16 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney RENATO HIPOLITO RONQUILLO, II terminated. Attorney MARVIN L. FREEMAN for JOSEPH FUENTES,MARVIN L. FREEMAN for JOHN JAY HOFFMAN,MARVIN L. FREEMAN for ROBERT LOUGY added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FREEMAN, MARVIN)
July 5, 2016 Filing 15 Letter regarding 6/30/2016 Letter Order and service from Chaula Bhatt. (km)
July 5, 2016 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS. COLONEL J. RICK FUENTES (NJ state Police Superintendent) served on 6/29/2016, answer due 7/20/2016. (km)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER Advising Plaintiff that the United States Marshals Service attempted to serve Mr. Ronald Brown, CEO, Maximation LLC at the address listed on the USM-285 Form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/30/2016. (km)
June 27, 2016 Filing 12 Letter regarding service from Chaula Bhatt. (km) (No summons attached to letter.)
June 27, 2016 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USMS as to RONALD BROWN. (km)
June 27, 2016 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USMS as to DALLAS. (km)
June 23, 2016 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney RENATO HIPOLITO RONQUILLO, II for JOSEPH FUENTES,RENATO HIPOLITO RONQUILLO, II for JOHN JAY HOFFMAN,RENATO HIPOLITO RONQUILLO, II for ROBERT LOUGY,RENATO HIPOLITO RONQUILLO, II for JOHN A. TONELLI added. (RONQUILLO, RENATO)
June 23, 2016 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by ROBERT LOUGY, JOHN JAY HOFFMAN, JOHN A. TONELLI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/7/2016. (km)
June 22, 2016 Filing 8 Letter regarding summons from Chaula Bhatt. (km)
June 17, 2016 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHAULA S. BHATT. "INVISIBLE" PARTICIPANTS served on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016; SUNDER GOVINDRAJAN served on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016; SRINIVAS GUNTUKA served on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016; JANET MIHALOPOULOS served on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016; VG LABS, INC served on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016. (km)
June 3, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS. JOHN JAY HOFFMAN served on 6/2/2016, answer due 6/23/2016; ROBERT LOUGY served on 6/2/2016, answer due 6/23/2016; JOHN A. TONELLI served on 6/2/2016, answer due 6/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SUMMONS, #2 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SUMMONS)(km)
April 29, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by CHAULA S. BHATT (km)
April 18, 2016 Filing 4 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (km)
April 18, 2016 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to "INVISIBLE" PARTICIPANTS, DALLAS, JOSEPH FUENTES, SUNDER GOVINDRAJAN, SRINIVAS GUNTUKA, JOHN JAY HOFFMAN, ROBERT LOUGY, MAXIMATION LLC, JANET MIHALOPOULOS, JOHN A. TONELLI, VG LABS, INC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Karen McGonigle* (km)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/18/2016. (km)
April 18, 2016 COMPLAINT Filed, IFP Application Granted. Review #1 docket entry for complaint, filed by CHAULA S. BHATT.(km)
April 14, 2016 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Fee Waiver Request, #3 Application IFP)(mps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2016: #4 Text of Proposed Order) (mps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BHATT v. FUENTES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUENTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONEL JOSEPH FUENTES
Represented By: MARVIN L. FREEMAN
Represented By: RENATO HIPOLITO RONQUILLO, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT LOUGY
Represented By: MARVIN L. FREEMAN
Represented By: RENATO HIPOLITO RONQUILLO, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN JAY HOFFMAN
Represented By: MARVIN L. FREEMAN
Represented By: RENATO HIPOLITO RONQUILLO, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. JOHN A. TONELLI
Represented By: ASHLEY LAURA COSTELLO
Represented By: RENATO HIPOLITO RONQUILLO, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. JANET MIHALOPOULOS
Represented By: SARAH WIESELTHIER
Represented By: STEVEN T. VOIGT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXIMATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VG LABS, INC
Represented By: H. BENJAMIN SHARLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. SUNDER GOVINDRAJAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. DALLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. SRINIVAS GUNTUKA
Represented By: H. BENJAMIN SHARLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "INVISIBLE" PARTICIPANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BHATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MS. CHAULA S. BHATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?