AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND et al v. VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND and Detectives Endowment Association of New York City
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., PHILIDOR RX SERVICES, ANDREW DAVENPORT and ESTATE OF MATTHEW DAVENPORT
In Re: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC, THIRD-PARTY PAYOR LITIGATION
Special Master: HON. DENNIS M. CAVANAUGH, RET.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03087
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Letter from Michael A. Innes, Esq. re #204 Report and Recommendation of Special Master. (Attachments: #1 Approval Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 REPORT and RECOMMENDATION of Special Master (CAVANAUGH, DENNIS)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 RESPONSE in Support filed by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO re #200 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND LITIGATION EXPENSES , #199 MOTION FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Order from Special Master re #190 MOTION to Seal Related document: #190 MOTION to Seal filed by PHILIDOR RX SERVICES, ANDREW DAVENPORT (CAVANAUGH, DENNIS)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #200 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND LITIGATION EXPENSES , #199 MOTION FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION . Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 DECLARATION of James A. Harrod and James E. Cecchi re #200 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND LITIGATION EXPENSES , #199 MOTION FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(CECCHI, JAMES)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND LITIGATION EXPENSES by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(CECCHI, JAMES)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(CECCHI, JAMES)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE by NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Megan Kistler (EISENKRAFT, MICHAEL)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Order from Special Master re #194 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Valeant Pharmaceutical International, Inc., Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice of Settlement Related document: #194 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Valeant Pharmaceutical International, Inc., Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice of Settlement filed by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO (CAVANAUGH, DENNIS)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Order from Special Master re #195 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with the Philidor Defendants, Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice of Settlement Related document: #195 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with the Philidor Defendants, Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice of Settlement filed by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO (CAVANAUGH, DENNIS)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #194 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Valeant Pharmaceutical International, Inc., Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice of Settlement , #195 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with the Philidor Defendants, Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice of Settlement . Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with the Philidor Defendants, Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice of Settlement by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Stipulation with Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Valeant Pharmaceutical International, Inc., Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice of Settlement by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Stipulation with Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Order from Special Master (CAVANAUGH, DENNIS)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Order from Special Master (CAVANAUGH, DENNIS)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #190 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #190 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND re #190 MOTION to Seal (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James E. Cecchi, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION to Seal by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Peskin Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PESKIN, AARON)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 BRIEF Objection to Special Master Report and Recommendation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Certificate of Service)(FERRARA, RALPH)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 REPORT and RECOMMENDATION of Special Master (CAVANAUGH, DENNIS)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Order from Special Master (CAVANAUGH, DENNIS)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND re #185 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number ANJDC-12121302.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James E. Cecchi, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #185 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number ANJDC-12121302.). Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number ANJDC-12121302.) by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration ALP Dec and Ex A-B, #3 Exhibit Ex C-E, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(FERRARA, RALPH)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Douglas Bunch and Megan K. Kistler: $ 300, receipt number TRE116986 (abr, )
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to S. Douglas Bunch and Megan K. Kistler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/03/2020. (jem)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of S. Douglas Bunch and Megan K. Kistler for by NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael B. Eisenkraft, #2 Declaration of S. Douglas Bunch, #3 Declaration of Megan K. Kistler, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(EISENKRAFT, MICHAEL)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Order from Special Master (CAVANAUGH, DENNIS)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 BRIEF In Further Support of Defendant Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Inc.s Objection To The Special Masters Report & Recommendation On Its Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Letter from Ralph P. Ferrara re #179 Letter, #178 Letter. (FERRARA, RALPH)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Letter from James E. Cecchi, Esq. re #178 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Letter from Ralph P. Ferrara. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FERRARA, RALPH)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 BRIEF OF PLAINTIFFS IN RESPONSE TO VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.S OBJECTION TO THE SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT & RECOMMENDATION ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS (CECCHI, JAMES)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Kaplan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11409248.) (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Isaac M. Rethy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11409138.) (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, JONATHAN KAPLAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jmh)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, ISAAC M. RETHY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jmh)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 BRIEF In Support of Defendant Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Inc.s Objection To The Special Masters Report & Recommendation On Its Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON LOUIS PESKIN on behalf of ESTATE OF MATTHEW DAVENPORT (PESKIN, AARON)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney GAVIN P. LENTZ terminated. Attorney RALPH P. FERRARA for ESTATE OF MATTHEW DAVENPORT added.. (FERRARA, RALPH)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ALBERT M. BELMONT, III terminated. Attorney RALPH P. FERRARA for ESTATE OF MATTHEW DAVENPORT added.. (FERRARA, RALPH)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Letter from Special Master Cavanaugh. (CAVANAUGH, DENNIS)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Letter from Richard Hernandez to the Hon. Dennis M. Cavanaugh (Ret.), Special Master. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 REPORT and RECOMMENDATION of Special Master (CAVANAUGH, DENNIS)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Isaac M. Rethy and Jonathan S. Kaplan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/19/2020. (jem)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Isaac M. Rethy and Jonathan Kaplan for by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Hernandez, #2 Declaration of Issac Rethy, #3 Declaration of Jonathan Kaplan, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Letter from Richard Hernandez to the Hon. Dennis M. Cavanaugh (Ret.). (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 LETTER ORDER that the 5/27/2020, 10:00am Final Approval Hearing shall proceed telephonically, rather than in-person. Signed by Special Master Dennis M. Cavanaugh U.S.D.J. (Ret.) on 4/16/2020. (jem)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Special Master by DENNIS M. CAVANAUGH, RET. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jem)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Access to Computer. Signed by Special Master by DENNIS M. CAVANAUGH, RET. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jem)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Letter from Richard Hernandez. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Letter from Richard Hernandez. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Confidentiality Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Order and Opinion of the Special Master by DENNIS M. CAVANAUGH, RET. (Attachments: #1 Order & Opinion of the Special Master, #2 Envelope)(jdb)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER AND OPINION of the Special Master. Signed by Special Master Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jem)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 RESPONSE re #154 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Letter from Ralph P. Ferrara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10-31-19 Opinion)(FERRARA, RALPH)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 RESPONSE re #149 Response (NOT Motion), #151 Response (NOT Motion), Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Letter RE: Entry 151)(BELMONT, ALBERT)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 RESPONSE re #149 Response (NOT Motion). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Hernandez, #2 Certificate of Service)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 RESPONSE re #149 Response (NOT Motion), Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(BELMONT, ALBERT)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 RESPONSE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FERRARA, RALPH)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 RESPONSE re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (CECCHI, JAMES)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Letter from Richard Hernandez to the Hon. Dennis M. Cavanaugh, Ret. re #147 Order Referring Case to Special Master,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master; that JUDGE DENNIS M. CAVANAUGH, U.S.D.J. (ret.) is hereby appointed as a Special Master to address and resolve all pending and future discovery disputes, address all pending and future motions pursuant to Rules 12, 15, 23, 50, 56, and all other pre-trial motions, and, when appropriate, facilitate settlement discussions among the parties; that the Clerk shall administratively terminate this case and all associated cases that have been coordinated with the matter; that, by September 30, 2019, the parties shall submit joint correspondence to the Special Master identifying any pending disputes and issues and the priority of each; that, by September 30, 2019, the Special Master shall inform the parties of his and, if applicable, his Associate's rates; that the Special Master shall decide all discovery disputes and non-dispositive issues; that the Special Master shall issue proposed findings of fact and reports and recommendations on all dispositive issues. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/10/2019. (gxh)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (gxh)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #146 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Richard Hernandez, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Text of Proposed Order, #29 Certificate of Service)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by ESTATE OF MATTHEW DAVENPORT. Responses due by 9/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(BELMONT, ALBERT)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(FERRARA, RALPH)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #144 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #145 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City.(CECCHI, JAMES)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Plaintiffs must file the Amended Complaint within two business days of entry of this Order; the Estate is substituted for Matthew S. Davenport as a Defendant in this action; Defendants Valeant and the Estate must answer or move with respect to the Amended Complaint by 8/28/2019; if Defendants Valeant and the Estate move, Plaintiffs must file responsive papers by 10/07/2019, reply papers by 10/25/2019; Defendants Andrew Davenport and Philidor's opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to amend and cross-motion to dismiss the Complaint #139 is administratively terminated without prejudice. Defendants Andrew Davenport and Philidor may refile their motion to dismiss by 8/28/2019, and may file a reply brief in further support of motion to dismiss by 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/26/2019. (jem)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION re #130 MOTION to Amend/Correct , #139 Cross MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and to Substitute a Party by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #139 Cross MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and to Substitute a Party. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Letter from Richard Hernandez to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. re #130 MOTION to Amend/Correct . (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Cross MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and to Substitute a Party by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES. Responses due by 7/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(FERRARA, RALPH)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Letter from Richard Hernandez to the Hon. Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re 135 Order,,. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 DECLARATION of Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh, U.S.D.J. (ret.). (Attachments: #1 Correspondence from Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh, U.S.D.J. (ret.))(gxh)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the Court's February 15, 2019 Order, the Court is considering appointing Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh, U.S.D.J. (ret.) as Special Master in this matter. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53, Judge Cavanaugh submitted an affidavit and correspondence. (ECF No. #136 ). By July 16, 2019, any party may e-file correspondence regarding Judge Cavanaugh's potential appointment as special master in this matter and the potential conflicts identified in his correspondence. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/10/2019. (gxh)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 133 Order, #130 MOTION to Amend/Correct , Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, as to the Acceptance of Service on Behalf of the Estate of Matthew S. Davenport (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 TEXT ORDER: On June 24, 2019, Philidor and Andrew Davenport filed correspondence (ECF No. #132 ) requesting adjournment of the motion cycle for Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend (ECF No. #130 ). Plaintiffs have not opposed the request. Philidor and Andrew Davenport's request is granted. Opposition to Plaintiffs' motion is due July 22, 2019. Plaintiffs' reply is due by July 29, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/1/2019. (gxh)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Letter from Aaron Peskin (Revised Letter). (PESKIN, AARON)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Letter from Aaron Peskin. (PESKIN, AARON)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #130 MOTION to Amend/Correct . Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION to Amend/Correct by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Redline of Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Letter, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Counsel (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 LETTER ORDER regarding the Court's proposed appointment of a Special Master under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/31/2019. (mmh)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 TEXT ORDER granting letter request made by Mr. Peter Harvey to respond to certain request. The response must be filed by 5/28/19 at 5:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/24/19. (if, )
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 TEXT ORDER: Because the appointment of a special master has become a contested matter, the Court has referred this issue to the Honorable Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J., for resolution. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/16/2019. (gxh)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 TEXT ORDER that by no later than 05/22/2019, Peter Harvey, Esq., shall submit any response to the parties' letters regarding his potential appointment as special master (ECF Nos. [122,123]). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 05/16/2019. (Gonzalez, P)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice admission as to James M. Fee, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/13/2019. (jem)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Letter from Richard Hernandez to the Hon. Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re 121 Order,. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TEXT ORDER: On April 17, 2019, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53(b)(3), Peter C. Harvey, Esq. filed an Affidavit concerning his potential appointment as Special Master in this matter. (ECF No. #120 .) Any party may file correspondence regarding Mr. Harvey's Affidavit by April 25, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/18/2019. (gxh)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 AFFIDAVIT of Peter C. Harvey Pursuant to Rule 53 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in support of an appointment to serve as a Special Master by PETER C. HARVEY. (HARVEY, PETER)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 LETTER OPINION AND ORDER denying #91 Andrew Davenport and Philidor RX Services, LLC's Motion to Continue Stay; that no party shall notice or issue a subpoena for the deposition of Gary Tanner or Andrew Davenport without seeking and receiving leave. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/12/2019. (gxh) (Main Document 119 replaced on 4/17/2019 as page 8 was cut off in scanning) (gxh).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Letter from James E. Cecchi re 115 Order. (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Letter from Richard Hernandez to the Hon. Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re 115 Order. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Letter from Ralph P. Ferrara re 115 Order. (FERRARA, RALPH)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 TEXT ORDER: By March 29, 2019 at 6:00 p.m. the parties shall submit joint or individual correspondence regarding the appointment of Peter C. Harvey, Esq. as special master in this matter. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/27/2019. (gxh)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Telephone Conference held on 3/27/2019 re: Appointment of Special Master. The parties shall have until Friday, March 29, 2019 at 6:00 p.m. to file correspondence raising any issues regarding the appointment of the Peter C. Harvey, Esq. of Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP as special master in this matter. (Court Reporter: CATHY FORD.) (gxh)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Counsel for Valeant Pharmaceuticals shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/20/2019. (gxh)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by ALBERT M. BELMONT, III on behalf of MATTHEW DAVENPORT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BELMONT, ALBERT)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed and considered the parties' correspondence regarding the appointment of a special master. (ECF Nos. 107, 108; Docket No. 15-7658, ECF Nos. 422, 425.) The Court will resolve Defendants' motion to continue stay (ECF No. 91), and then appoint a special master. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 03/08/2019. (FH)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - ALLYSON POULOS does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (jml, )
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JAMES VINCENT NOBLETT terminated. Attorney GAVIN P. LENTZ for MATTHEW DAVENPORT added.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(LENTZ, GAVIN)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed and considered the parties' joint correspondence regarding the appointment of a special master. (15-7658, ECF No. 422.) The Court will ultimately make the relevant determinations, including the special master appointment(s). Nevertheless, to the extent that the parties seek to submit a proposal to the Court, the parties must propose a minimum of three special master candidates, which the Court will take into consideration in rendering a decision. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/25/2019. (gxh)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Special Master re #106 Order,. (CECCHI, JAMES)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Letter from Ralph Ferrara re #106 Order,. (FERRARA, RALPH)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER that, by February 22, 2019, each party shall e-file correspondence, no longer than 3 pages addressing the party's consent or opposition to the appointment of a special master; the party's position on the items identified in Rule 53(b)(2); and the party's position on any other issues the party would like the Court to consider in relation to the appointment of a special master. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/15/2019. (gxh)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re: Status Update. (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES re #102 Substitution of Attorney, #103 Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal by POLSINELLI PC and removal from notice of electronic filings (NAGI, JASON)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON LOUIS PESKIN on behalf of ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PESKIN, AARON)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JASON A. NAGI terminated. Attorney RALPH P. FERRARA for ANDREW DAVENPORT,RALPH P. FERRARA for PHILIDOR RX SERVICES added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PESKIN, AARON)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ROBERT N. WARD terminated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WARD, ROBERT)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO on behalf of VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (BAREENTTO, OMAR)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, DANIEL J. STUJENSKE and JONATHAN K. YOUNGWOOD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 TEXT ORDER that the telephonic status conference scheduled for 11:30 a.m. today, 11/14/2018, for the Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. Securities Litigation matters (Lead Docket 15-7658) and the Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. Third-Party Payor Litigation (16-3087) is hereby ADJOURNED pending the Court's decision as to the pending applications to stay. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/14/2018. (Gonzalez, P)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Letter from Richard Hernandez to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. re 97 Order on Oral Motion,,. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 TEXT ORDER that, given the briefing presently before the Court, counsel are to confer and advise as to whether there are any issues that need to be addressed during the telephonic status conference presently scheduled for 11:30 a.m. tomorrow, 11/14/2018, for the Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. Securities Litigation matters (Lead Docket 15-7658) and the Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. Third-Party Payor Litigation (16-3087). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/13/2018. (Gonzalez, P)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Letter from James E. Cecchi to Hon. Michael A. Shipp, USDJ. (CECCHI, JAMES)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES re #91 MOTION to Continue Stay (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAGI, JASON)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Letter from Richard Hernandez to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. re 90 Order on Oral Motion. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #91 MOTION to Continue Stay (CECCHI, JAMES)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Resetting Deadlines as to #91 MOTION to Continue Stay. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (if, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #91 MOTION to Continue Stay. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 90 Order on Oral Motion Notice of Response to Text Order Regarding Motions To Continue Stay (CECCHI, JAMES)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION to Continue Stay by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Brief Supporting Motion to Continue Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(NAGI, JASON)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TEXT ORDER that the parties are hereby instructed to file any motion seeking to continue the stay of this matter by no later than 10/12/2018, made returnable 11/05/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 09/28/2018. (Gonzalez, P)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Exhibits From Criminal Trial. (CECCHI, JAMES)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, PAUL C. CURNIN and CRAIG S. WALDMAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Craig S. Waldman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8890192.) (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Paul C. Curnin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8890173.) (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, DEAN MCGEE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Dean McGee to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8803453.) (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Dean McGee, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/8/2018. (mps)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dean McGee for by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Hernandez in support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Declaration of Dean McGee in support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J.. (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Matthew Davenport by MATTHEW DAVENPORT. (NOBLETT, JAMES)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. (NOBLETT, JAMES)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #74 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Set/Clear Flags,,. (CECCHI, JAMES)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #76 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance filed by Eric Vissichelli on 9/21/2017 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice(Other). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance USING Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case and terminate the appropriate attorney(s) when prompted. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. of Withdrawal of Appearance as to Eric T. Vissichelli (VISSICHELLI, ERIC)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT NICHOLAS WARD on behalf of VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (WARD, ROBERT)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER that Andrew Davenport and Philidor's #55 Motion to Stay is Granted. Matthew Davenport's #56 Motion to Stay is Granted. All proceedings in this case are stayed until the conclusion of United States v. Tanner, et al., No. 17-00061 (S.D.N.Y. filed 1/26/2017), or until the Court lifts the stay. All pending motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. #38 , #42 , and #43 are terminated. The parties shall e-file joint case status updates every three months beginning 11/1/2017. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/9/2017. (mps)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/9/2017. (mps)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon Defendant Matthew Davenport's (Defendant Davenport) May 26, 2017 correspondence. (ECF No. #71 .) The Court acknowledges the citation correction to Defendant Davenport's Reply Brief as set forth in the May 26, 2017 correspondence. The Court does not require Defendant Davenport to submit a corrected brief. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/31/2017. (gxh)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Letter from James V. Noblett re #69 Reply to Response to Motion. (NOBLETT, JAMES)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by MATTHEW DAVENPORT re #42 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NOBLETT, JAMES)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's RICO Claims (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAGI, JASON)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND re #42 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT, #43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's RICO Claims, #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL ANDREW INNES on behalf of AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND (INNES, MICHAEL)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Letter from James E. Cecchi requesting oral argument. (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES re #55 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAGI, JASON)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MATTHEW DAVENPORT re #56 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NOBLETT, JAMES)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER ORDER granting request for leave to file a combined opposition brief of no greater that sixty (60) pages to the three motions to dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/7/2017. (mps)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE F. BARTLETT on behalf of AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO (BARTLETT, CAROLINE)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO re #56 MOTION to Stay , #55 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Caroline F. Bartlett, #2 Exhibit A - Letter Dated March 9, 2017)(CECCHI, JAMES)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Letter from Richard Hernandez re #56 MOTION to Stay , #55 MOTION to Stay . (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Paul R. Wood by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES. (NAGI, JASON)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #56 MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 4/17/2017 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #57 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance filed by Jason Nagi on 3/29/2017 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerks office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing and will forward this request to chambers. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Stay by MATTHEW DAVENPORT. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(NOBLETT, JAMES)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Stay by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(NAGI, JASON)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #55 MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 4/17/2017 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Allyson Poulos to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7669455.) (NOBLETT, JAMES)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. King to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7669448.) (NOBLETT, JAMES)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Raja Gaddipati to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7669439.) (NOBLETT, JAMES)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Allyson Poulos, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/16/2017. (mps)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan D. King, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/16/2017. (mps)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Raja Gaddipati, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/16/2017. (mps)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul R. Wood, Esq., Thomas H. Wagner, Esq., and Dmitry Shifrin, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/15/2017. (mps)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven J. Toll to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7652542.) (EISENKRAFT, MICHAEL)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Julie Goldsmith Reiser to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7652480.) (EISENKRAFT, MICHAEL)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Steven J. Toll, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/15/2017. (mps)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Julie Goldsmith Reiser, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/15/2017. (mps)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #42 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT, #43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's RICO Claims. Motion set for 3/20/2017 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jonathan D. King), #41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Allyson Poulos), #39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Raja Gaddipati). Motion set for 3/20/2017 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's RICO Claims by ANDREW DAVENPORT, PHILIDOR RX SERVICES. Responses due by 3/20/2017 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(NAGI, JASON)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT by MATTHEW DAVENPORT. (Attachments: #1 Brief IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MATTHEW DAVENPORT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT, #2 Text of Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT MATTHEW DAVENPORT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT, #3 Certificate of Service)(NOBLETT, JAMES)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Allyson Poulos) by MATTHEW DAVENPORT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James V. Noblett in Support, #2 Declaration of Allyson Poulos in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(NOBLETT, JAMES)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jonathan D. King) by MATTHEW DAVENPORT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James V. Noblett in Support, #2 Declaration of Jonathan D. King in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(NOBLETT, JAMES)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Raja Gaddipati) by MATTHEW DAVENPORT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James V. Noblett in Support, #2 Declaration of Raja Gaddipati in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(NOBLETT, JAMES)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Motion set for 3/20/2017 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #2 Declaration of Craig S. Waldman in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Text of Proposed Order, #30 Certificate of Service)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel J. Stujenske to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7646186.) (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Craig S. Waldman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan K. Youngwood to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7646164.) (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Paul C. Curnin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul C. Curnin, Esq., Jonathan K. Youngwood, Esq., Craig S. Waldman, Esq. and Daniel J. Stujenske, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/10/2017. (mps)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Hannah Ross, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/10/2017. (mps)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jake Nachmani, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/10/2017. (mps)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 2/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 2/6/2017 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Declaration of Richard Hernandez, #3 Declaration of Paul C. Curnin, #4 Declaration of Jonathan K. Youngwood, #5 Declaration of Craig S. Waldman, #6 Declaration of Daniel J. Stujenske, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney BRIAN THOMAS FRAWLEY terminated. Attorney PAUL C. CURNIN for VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. added.. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES VINCENT NOBLETT on behalf of MATTHEW DAVENPORT (NOBLETT, JAMES)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PHILIDOR RX SERVICES, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., ANDREW DAVENPORT, MATTHEW DAVENPORT, filed by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO, NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City.(CECCHI, JAMES)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsey H. Taylor, #2 Declaration of Hannah Ross, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 1/3/2017 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (eaj)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 1/3/2017 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (eaj)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsey H. Taylor, #2 Declaration of Jake Nachmani, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendant acknowledges that they have either been served or accept service; Consolidating Civil Actions 16-3807, 16-3885 and 16-5663 under Civil Action 16-3807 and shall bear the caption: In Re: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., THIRD-PARTY PAYOR LITIGATION; Ordering Plaintiff to file a Consolidated Complaint within 14 days of the Order resolving the Motion for Appointment of Interim Counsel; Defendants shall respond within 60 days of the filing of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/30/2016. (eaj)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Appointing Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, P.C. and Bernstein, Litowitz, Berger & Grossman LLP as Lead Counsel and Interim Counsel; Approving the creation of an Executive Committee of Plaintiffs' counsel on behalf of the proposed class consisting of Carella Byrne and Bernstein Litowitz and the law firms Barrack Rodos & Bacine and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/30/2016. (eaj)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Certification of Dmitry Shifrin, Esq. on behalf of PHILIDOR RX SERVICES Re #19 Motion for Leave to Appear,,. (NAGI, JASON)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certification of Thomas H. Wagner, Esq. on behalf of PHILIDOR RX SERVICES Re #19 Motion for Leave to Appear,,. (NAGI, JASON)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Certification of Paul R. Wood, Esq. on behalf of PHILIDOR RX SERVICES Re #19 Motion for Leave to Appear,,. (NAGI, JASON)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/21/2016 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (eaj)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PHILIDOR RX SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Application and Certification of Jason A. Nagi in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Paul R. Wood in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certification of Thomas H. Wagner in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certification of Dmitry Shifrin in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #5 Text of Proposed Order admitting Paul R. Wood, Esq., Thomas H. Wagner, Esq. and Dmitry Shifrin, Esq. Pro Hac Vice)(NAGI, JASON)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certifications of Paul R. Wood, Esq., Thomas H. Wagner, Esq. and Dmitry Shifrin, Esq. attached to the Motion for Pro Hac #19 by Jason Nagi on 11/24/2016 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT ONLY THE CERTIFICATIONS WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (eaj)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Letter from James E. Cecchi Enclosing Proposed Orders Regarding Consolidation, Scheduling, and Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Consolidation and Scheduling, #4 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Interim Class Counsel)(CECCHI, JAMES)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Letter from Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft re #15 Application/Petition, #16 Application/Petition. (EISENKRAFT, MICHAEL)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 APPLICATION/PETITION for Julie Goldsmith Reiser for by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(EISENKRAFT, MICHAEL)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION/PETITION for Steven J. Toll for by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(EISENKRAFT, MICHAEL)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON A. NAGI on behalf of PHILIDOR RX SERVICES (NAGI, JASON)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter. (NAGI, JASON)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Applications To Consolidate and Appoint Interim Class Counsel re #9 Letter, #10 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James A. Harrod, Esq., Avi Josefson, Esq., Jai Chandrasekhar, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/17/2016. (mps)
August 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 9/6/2016 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (eaj)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsey H. Taylor, #2 Declaration James A. Harrod, #3 Declaration of Jai Chandrasekhar, #4 Declaration of Avi Josefson, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC T. VISSICHELLI on behalf of VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (VISSICHELLI, ERIC)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD HERNANDEZ on behalf of VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (HERNANDEZ, RICHARD)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN THOMAS FRAWLEY on behalf of VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter from Jason A. Nagi to Judge Shipp re #1 Complaint,. (NAGI, JASON)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHILIDOR RX SERVICES, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jem)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILIDOR RX SERVICES, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $400 receipt number 7130930) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND et al v. VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIRCONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: LINDSEY H. TAYLOR
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: MICHAEL ANDREW INNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRE AND POLICE HEALTH CARE FUND, SAN ANTONIO
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: LINDSEY H. TAYLOR
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: MICHAEL ANDREW INNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW YORK HOTEL TRADES COUNCIL & HOTEL ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK CITY, INC. HEALTH BENEFITS FUND
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: MICHAEL BENJAMIN EISENKRAFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detectives Endowment Association of New York City
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT N. WARD
Represented By: PAUL C. CURNIN
Represented By: RICHARD HERNANDEZ
Represented By: OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Represented By: BRIAN THOMAS FRAWLEY
Represented By: ERIC T. VISSICHELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIDOR RX SERVICES
Represented By: AARON LOUIS PESKIN
Represented By: JASON A. NAGI
Represented By: RALPH P. FERRARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW DAVENPORT
Represented By: JASON A. NAGI
Represented By: RALPH P. FERRARA
Represented By: AARON LOUIS PESKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTATE OF MATTHEW DAVENPORT
Represented By: JAMES VINCENT NOBLETT
Represented By: AARON LOUIS PESKIN
Represented By: GAVIN P. LENTZ
Represented By: RALPH P. FERRARA
Represented By: ALBERT M. BELMONT, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC, THIRD-PARTY PAYOR LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: HON. DENNIS M. CAVANAUGH, RET.
Represented By: DENNIS MICHAEL CAVANAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?