PICCINETTI v. CLAYTON, MYRICK, MCCLANAHAN & COULTER, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: BRIAN A. PICCINETTI
Defendant: CLAYTON, MYRICK, MCCLANAHAN & COULTER, PLLC, INTERNAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC., ROBERT J. NAUSEEF and JOHN DOES 1-25
Case Number: 3:2016cv04032
Filed: July 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION Filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/30/2022. (jal, )
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 03/27/2020. (jdb)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/26/2018. (km)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/5/2017. (km)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PICCINETTI v. CLAYTON, MYRICK, MCCLANAHAN & COULTER, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN A. PICCINETTI
Represented By: ARI HILLEL MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAYTON, MYRICK, MCCLANAHAN & COULTER, PLLC
Represented By: CINDY D. SALVO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: CINDY D. SALVO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT J. NAUSEEF
Represented By: CINDY D. SALVO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?