AKINSANMI v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE et al
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE A. AKINSANMI
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. and U.S. BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2016cv07732
Filed: October 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER terminating 38 Motion for Reconsideration and terminating 39 Motion for TRO. Plaintiff's Counsel to serve on Plaintiff a copy of the Court's 7/10/2017 Letter Opinion and a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/12/2017. (km)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER OPINION Filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/10/2017. (km)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: By 5/15/2017, Plaintiff must show cause in writing as to why the Complaint should not be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) for failure to comply with the Court's orders; that Defts may file a response by 5/25/2017. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/4/2017. (gxh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AKINSANMI v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE A. AKINSANMI
Represented By: JOSHUA LOUIS THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?