MONTAGANO et al v. SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: CAROL MONTAGANO
Defendant: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2016cv09375
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Ocean
Presiding Judge: Mary L. Cooper
Presiding Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 LETTER OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Safeco's 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. By 07/08/2020, parties are to e-file correspondence to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, jointly proposing dates for a final pre-trial conference to take place no later than 07/30/2020 Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 06/29/2020. (jmh)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the 3 documents being withheld by Defendant on the basis of attorney-client privilege are to be submitted to the Court for in camera review by 8/17/2018. The remaining Withheld Documents are to be produced to Plaintiff by 8/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/14/2018. (mps)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 7/7/2017. (km)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 3/31/2017. (mmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTAGANO et al v. SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL MONTAGANO
Represented By: CRAIG A STYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?