PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. et al v. QUVA PHARMA, INC. et al

Plaintiff: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. and PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC
Defendant: QUVA PHARMA, INC., PETER JENKINS, STUART HINCHEN, MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DONNA KOHUT, DAVID HARTLEY, TRAVIS MCGRADY, DAVID SHORT and STEPHEN RHOADES
Interested Party: BAIN CAPITAL
Case Number: 3:2017cv06115
Filed: August 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Hunterdon
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
2 Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 422 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg, Esq. to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti re #415 Brief,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Reply Brief in Response to Defendants' Remand Opposition Brief)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Notice of Hearing: Oral argument re USCA Mandate [doc. #397] has been set for 7/1/2019 @9:30 AM in NEWARK - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. The parties will have 30 minutes for their arguments and 15 minutes for rebuttals. Please confirm receipt of court notice and the new location by e-filing letter not later than 6/10/2019. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 6/7/2019. (DS)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to Benjamin D. Witte, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/5/2019. (mmh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 419 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky, #2 Declaration of Benjamin D. Witte, Esquire, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 4, 2019 Filing 418 REDACTION to #387 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, [PUBLIC VERSION] by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin D. With Exhibit A [PUBLIC VERSION])(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
May 31, 2019 Filing 417 BRIEF in Opposition on Remand from Third Circuit (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg with Exhibits)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 31, 2019 Filing 416 DECLARATION re #415 Brief,,,, in Opposition on Remand by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 48 Part One to Witte Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 48 Part Two to Witte Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 49 to 50 to Witte Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 51 to Witte Declaration)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 31, 2019 Filing 415 BRIEF in Opposition on Remand (Attachments: #1 Declaration Patterson Declaration, #2 Declaration Schwartz Declaration, #3 Declaration Witte Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 15 to 21, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 22 Part One, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 22 Part Two, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 23 Part One, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 23 Part Two, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 25 Part One, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 25 Part Two, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 26 Part One, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 26 Part Two, #15 Exhibit Exhibits 27 to 40, #16 Exhibit Exhibits 41 to 43, #17 Exhibit Exhibits 44 to 45, #18 Exhibit Exhibits 46 to 47)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 21, 2019 Filing 414 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg re #411 Letter,, #413 Letter,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 20, 2019 Filing 413 Letter from STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY re #412 Application/Petition,,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 17, 2019 Filing 412 APPLICATION/PETITION for Submission of New Evidence for by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Kenney, #2 Declaration of Somnath Sharma, #3 Declaration of Christopher Smith)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 17, 2019 Filing 411 Letter from STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY re #405 Brief,, #406 Brief,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 17, 2019 Filing 410 REDACTION to #405 Brief,, on Remand in Support of Lifting the Preliminary Injunction by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Benjamin D. Witte [PUBLIC VERSION])(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
May 17, 2019 Filing 409 REDACTION to #406 Brief, on Remand from Third Circuit by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
May 14, 2019 Filing 408 Letter from Jed Marcus. (MARCUS, JED)
May 13, 2019 Filing 407 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg re #402 Letter,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 10, 2019 Filing 406 BRIEF on Remand from Third Circuit (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 10, 2019 Filing 405 BRIEF on Remand in Support of Lifting the Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin D. Witte)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER that Par's motion to compel (Civ. No. 18-17471) is granted in part and denied in part; that QuVa's motion for a Protective Order (Civil No. 17-6115, ECF No. #313 ) is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/30/2019. (mmh) Modified on 5/8/2019 (eaj, ).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER that both parties will file opening briefs, limited to thirty pages in length, on May 10, 2019; that upon an application to the Court by May 17, 2019, demonstrating good cause, additional discovery and/or presentation of evidence may be authorized in light of arguments made by the other party in its opening brief; that, absent an application for additional discovery, each party will file an opposition brief to the other partys opening brief, limited to thirty pages in length, by May 31, 2019; that no reply briefs are permitted, except for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/29/2019. (mmh)
April 29, 2019 Filing 402 Letter from Jed Marcus. (MARCUS, JED)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 27, 2019 Filing 401 Letter from Joint Letter. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
April 26, 2019 Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 4/25/2019. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (mmh)
April 26, 2019 Pursuant to the #397 MANDATE of the USCA, the Order of the USDC dated 3/1/2018 is AFFIRMED in part and REMANDED for proceedings consistent with this opinion. (mmh)
April 26, 2019 Filing 400 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg re #396 Letter. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 25, 2019 Filing 399 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney DAVID C. KISTLER terminated. (KISTLER, DAVID)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 398 TEXT ORDER re #396 Letter request for leave to file short sur-reply, set forth in letter brief, to address the last sentence of Par's reply brief is Granted. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/25/2019. (DS)
April 25, 2019 Filing 397 MANDATE of USCA as to #233 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by MIKE RUTKOWSKI, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC. (Finance notified) (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Clerk's Letter to District Court)(ca3jk, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 396 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire re #393 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
April 23, 2019 Filing 395 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RAY DARBEE on behalf of DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT (DARBEE, MICHAEL)
April 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JEFFERSON J. HARWELL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mmh)
April 22, 2019 Filing 394 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jefferson J. Harwell, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 15, 2019 Filing 393 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC re #380 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Jefferson J. Harwell. Receipt number TRE101487 (in-jdb, )
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER granting #344 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/9/2019. (mmh)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 391 CONSENT ORDER granting #369 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jefferson J. Harwell, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/8/2019. (mmh) Modified on 4/30/2019 (eaj, ).
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiffs' request for a one week extension of time to respond to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/4/2019. (mmh)
April 3, 2019 Filing 389 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Judge Arpert Requesting Extension to File Reply Brief re #380 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 3, 2019 Filing 388 USCA JUDGMENT as to #233 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by MIKE RUTKOWSKI, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC. (ca3jk, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 387 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #380 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin D. Witte with Exhibit A)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER granting #368 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/18/2019. (mmh)
March 13, 2019 Filing 385 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg re #372 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
March 13, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #380 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims. Motion reset for 4/15/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
March 13, 2019 Filing 384 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #380 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims (KISTLER, DAVID)
March 11, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #380 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims. Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
March 8, 2019 Filing 383 REDACTION to #381 Brief in Support of Motion,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
March 8, 2019 Filing 382 Certification of Service on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC Re #381 Brief in Support of Motion,, #380 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
March 8, 2019 Filing 381 BRIEF in Support filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC re #380 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 8, 2019 Filing 380 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
March 7, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - MICHELLE P. WOODHOUSE does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (jml, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 379 Defendants QuVa's, Hinchen's and Jenkins' ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM [PUBLIC VERSION OF ECF NO. 376] against PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC by QUVA PHARMA, INC., STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS.(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 378 Defendant Short's ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by DAVID SHORT.(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 377 Defendant Rutkowski's ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC by MIKE RUTKOWSKI.(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 376 Defendants QuVa's, Hinchen's and Jenkins' ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC by QUVA PHARMA, INC., STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS.(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 27, 2019 Filing 375 Defendant McGrady's ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by TRAVIS MCGRADY.(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 374 Defendant Kohut's ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC by DONNA KOHUT.(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 373 Defendant Hartley's ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by DAVID HARTLEY.(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that QuVa's motion for a Protective Order #277 is denied without prejudice; that Par's motion to compel #279 is granted in part and denied in part; that, the Court having denied Par's motion to compel forensic imaging, Rhoades' motion for a Protective Order #281 is denied as moot; that the joint proposed Scheduling Order to be submitted by the parties should include a date by which Defendants will respond to RFP Nos. 1 and 2; that the parties are to submit the joint proposed Scheduling Order within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/27/2019. (mmh)
February 26, 2019 Filing 371 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #313 MOTION for Protective Order [PUBLIC VERSION OF ECF NO. 363] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Benjamin D. Witte [PUBLIC VERSION])(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 370 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by STEPHEN RHOADES.(MARCUS, JED)
February 25, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: In Person Status Conference held on 2/25/2019. (ce3)
February 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #369 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jefferson J. Harwell. Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
February 25, 2019 Filing 369 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jefferson J. Harwell by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #2 Certification of Jefferson J. Harwell, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
February 20, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #368 Joint MOTION to Seal. Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 368 Joint MOTION to Seal by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky with Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg with Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Eric J. Marandett with Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
February 11, 2019 Filing 367 Letter from All Parties re #350 Order,, Set Hearings,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
February 6, 2019 Filing 366 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney DAVID LEIT terminated. (LEIT, DAVID)
February 6, 2019 Filing 365 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney JARRETT R. SCHINDLER terminated. (SCHINDLER, JARRETT)
February 6, 2019 Filing 364 Letter from Jarrett R. Schindler to Judge Martinotti requesting the withdrawal of Bain Capital as an interested party. (SCHINDLER, JARRETT)
February 4, 2019 Filing 363 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #313 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin D. Witte)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 1, 2019 Filing 362 NOTICE of Appearance by JARRETT R. SCHINDLER on behalf of BAIN CAPITAL (SCHINDLER, JARRETT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 361 REDACTED OPINION re #348 Opinion. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 1/11/2019. (mmh)
January 28, 2019 Filing 360 REDACTED OPINION re #346 Opinion. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 1/11/2019. (mmh)
January 28, 2019 Filing 359 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC re #313 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, with Exhibits, #2 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 LETTER ORDER granting request of Defendants QuVa Pharma, Inc., Stuart Hinchen, Peter Jenkins, Mike Rutkowski, Donna Kohut, David Short, Travis McGrady, and David Hartley for a 30 days extension of time, until 2/27/2019, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/25/2019. (mmh)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 LETTER ORDER granting request of Stephen Rhoades for a 30 day extension of time, until 2/27/2019, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/25/2019. (mmh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 356 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LEIT on behalf of BAIN CAPITAL (LEIT, DAVID)
January 24, 2019 Filing 355 APPLICATION/PETITION for by STEPHEN RHOADES. (MARCUS, JED)
January 24, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #354 Letter Request for an Extension of Time filed by Jed Marcus on 1/23/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Request USING Application/Petition found under Civil - Other Filings - Other Documents. The deadlines created by this filing have been terminated. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 354 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by STEPHEN RHOADES. (MARCUS, JED)
January 23, 2019 Filing 353 Letter from David C. Kistler, Esquire. (KISTLER, DAVID)
January 22, 2019 Filing 352 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON ROBERT HALPIN on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC (HALPIN, JASON)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER that any opposition to QuVa's motion to compel must be filed no later than January 28, 2019; that QuVa may file a reply no later than 7 days after the opposition brief is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/14/2019. (mmh)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER: In-Person Status Conference set for 2/25/2019 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. No later than February 11, 2019, the parties are to submit a joint status letter setting forth all matters that remain pending before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/14/2019. (mmh)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER that Par's Motion to Dismiss QuVa's Counterclaim Six for failure to state a claim (ECF No. #66 ) is DENIED AS MOOT; that Defendants Kohut, Short, McGrady, and Hartley's Motion to Dismiss Par's Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction (ECF No. #165 ) is DENIED; that Defendant Kohut's Motion to Dismiss Count Eight of the Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim (ECF No. #167 ) is DENIED; that Defendants QuVa, Hinchen, Jenkins, Rutkowski, Kohut, Short, McGrady, and Hartleys Motion to Dismiss Counts Three, Four, Thirteen, Fourteen, Fifteen, and Sixteen of the Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim (ECF No. #168 ) is DENIED; that Defendant Rhoades Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction, lack of venue, and failure to state a claim (ECF No. #182 ) is DENIED; that the Opinion be filed under temporary seal; that the parties shall submit to the Court within fourteen (14) days via e-mail at njdnef_Martinotti@njd.uscourts.gov a joint proposed redacted version of the opinion to be publicly posted to the docket following this Courts approval. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 1/11/2019. (mmh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 348 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 1/11/2019. (mmh)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER denying #219 Motion for Reconsideration; that the Opinion be filed under temporary seal; that the parties shall submit to the Court within fourteen (14) days via e-mail at njdnef_Martinotti@njd.uscourts.gov a joint proposed redacted version of the opinion to be publicly posted to the docket following this Court's approval. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 1/11/2019. (mmh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 346 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 1/11/2019. (mmh)
December 3, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #344 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 345 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire [Public Version of 342] re #342 Letter,, #338 Letter,, #340 Letter,,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
December 3, 2018 Filing 344 MOTION to Seal by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky with Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
November 19, 2018 Filing 343 Letter from Jed Marcus in response to Par's Nov. 8 letter re #340 Letter,,. (MARCUS, JED)
November 14, 2018 Filing 342 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire re #338 Letter,, #340 Letter,,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting #334 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/13/2018. (mmh)
November 8, 2018 Filing 340 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg, Esq. to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti re #338 Letter,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 1, 2018 Filing 339 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Public Version of ECF338 re #338 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donna Kohut)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 338 Letter from S. Orlofsky to Judge Martinotti. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donna Kohut, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Donna Kohut)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 29, 2018 Filing 337 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg, Esq. to Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. [Redacted Version] re #331 Letter,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
October 29, 2018 Filing 336 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg, Esq. to Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. [Redacted Version] re #329 Letter,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
October 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #334 Joint MOTION to Seal. Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
October 26, 2018 Filing 335 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky: Public Version of Docket Entry 330 re #330 Letter,,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
October 26, 2018 Filing 334 Joint MOTION to Seal by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky with Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg with Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
October 22, 2018 Filing 333 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg, Esq. to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert (REDACTED Version) re #303 Letter,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
October 18, 2018 Filing 332 Letter from S. Orlofsky re: Discovery [Public Version]. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emer Simic, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E-H, #5 Exhibit I-M)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 331 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg, Esq. to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 12, 2018 Filing 330 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emer L. Simic with Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C through J)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Timothy O'Brien, Esq., receipt number TRE096124 (mps)
October 5, 2018 Filing 329 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg, Esq. to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re #327 Letter,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #317 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/4/2018. (mmh)
September 28, 2018 Filing 327 Letter from Jed Marcus re: Discovery Issues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(MARCUS, JED)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #302 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/25/2018. (mmh)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to Timothy O'Brien, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/21/2018. (mmh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 324 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire re #314 Brief in Support of Motion,,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 20, 2018 Filing 323 Letter from David C. Kistler, Esquire. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David C. Kistler, Esquire, #2 Declaration of Timothy O'Brien, Esquire, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(KISTLER, DAVID)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 LETTER ORDER withdrawing PEI HSIEN REN, ESQ. as pro hac vice counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/18/2018. (mmh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 321 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: withdrawal of pro hac vice counsel. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
September 14, 2018 Filing 320 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
September 13, 2018 Filing 319 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky (Public Version) re #313 MOTION for Protective Order , #318 Brief in Support of Motion,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
September 13, 2018 Filing 318 BRIEF in Support filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #313 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration Benjamin D. Witte)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
September 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #317 Joint MOTION to Seal Parties' Discovery Letters. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
September 12, 2018 Filing 317 Joint MOTION to Seal Parties' Discovery Letters by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Stephen Orlofsky, #3 Declaration of Lawrence Lustberg)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 316 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re #315 Letter,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
September 11, 2018 Filing 315 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire re #313 MOTION for Protective Order , #314 Brief in Support of Motion,,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 7, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #313 MOTION for Protective Order . Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
September 7, 2018 Filing 314 BRIEF in Support filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #313 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin D. Witte)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 7, 2018 Filing 313 MOTION for Protective Order by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
September 4, 2018 Filing 312 REDACTION to #291 Certification in Support of Motion,, Declaration of Benjamin DiLorenzo [PUBLIC VERSION] by STEPHEN RHOADES. (Attachments: #1 Certification Jed Marcus)(EFFINGHAM, ANN)
September 4, 2018 Filing 311 REDACTION to #290 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, [PUBLIC VERSION] by STEPHEN RHOADES. (EFFINGHAM, ANN)
August 31, 2018 Filing 310 REDACTION to #301 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg in Support of Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Production)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 31, 2018 Filing 309 REDACTION to #293 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 31, 2018 Filing 308 REDACTION to #280 Brief in Support of Motion,,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg in Support of Motion to Compel Production, #2 Exhibit A through G to Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 31, 2018 Filing 307 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #302 Joint MOTION to Seal and Redact, #277 MOTION for Protective Order Redacted Version of ECF299 (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
August 31, 2018 Filing 306 BRIEF in Support filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #302 Joint MOTION to Seal and Redact, #277 MOTION for Protective Order Redacted Versions of ECF277 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emer L. Simic)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
August 31, 2018 Filing 305 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #302 Joint MOTION to Seal and Redact, #279 MOTION to Compel Production Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 Redacted Versions of ECF292 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emer L. Simic)(BUZIAK, LEIGH ANN)
August 30, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #302 Joint MOTION to Seal and Redact. Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
August 29, 2018 Filing 304 Letter from S. Orlofsky re: Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emer Simic, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E-H, #5 Exhibit I-M)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 29, 2018 Filing 303 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re: Discovery Issues. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 29, 2018 Filing 302 Joint MOTION to Seal and Redact by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg in Support of Consolidated Motion to Redact and Seal, #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky in Support of Consolidated Motion to Redact and Seal, #3 [Proposed] Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Consent Order)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 15, 2018 Filing 301 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC re #279 MOTION to Compel Production Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 LETTER ORDER granting request that the 8/22/2018 settlement conference be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/13/2018. (mmh)
August 13, 2018 Filing 299 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #277 MOTION for Protective Order (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 13, 2018 Filing 298 Letter from Defendants Jointly with Plaintiff re: Settlement Conference. (KISTLER, DAVID)
August 8, 2018 Filing 297 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN ELIZABETH QUERNS on behalf of DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT (QUERNS, ANN)
August 7, 2018 Filing 296 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg and Stephen M. Orlofsky to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re #57 Letter,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 LETTER ORDER withdrawing #289 Cross-Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/7/2018. (mmh)
August 7, 2018 Filing 294 Letter from Jed Marcus re #289 Cross MOTION to Compel . (MARCUS, JED)
August 7, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #289 Cross MOTION to Compel . Motion set for 8/20/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
August 6, 2018 Filing 293 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC re #277 MOTION for Protective Order (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 6, 2018 Filing 292 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #279 MOTION to Compel Production Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emer L. Simic with Exhibits A-G)(BUZIAK, LEIGH ANN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 6, 2018 Filing 291 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by STEPHEN RHOADES re #289 Cross MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Certification Ben DiLorenzo, #2 Certification Jed Marcus)(MARCUS, JED)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 6, 2018 Filing 290 BRIEF in Opposition filed by STEPHEN RHOADES re #279 MOTION to Compel Production Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37, #289 Cross MOTION to Compel (MARCUS, JED)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 6, 2018 Filing 289 Cross MOTION to Compel by STEPHEN RHOADES. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Jed Marcus re Opposition to Par's Motion to Compel and Cross-Motion to Compel, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Cross-Motion)(MARCUS, JED)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting #268 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/27/2018. (mmh)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #275 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/27/2018. (mmh)
July 23, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #281 First MOTION for Protective Order , #279 MOTION to Compel Production Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37. Motions reset for 8/20/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 LETTER ORDER that the Motions to Compel and for a Protective Order are adjourned to 8/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/23/2018. (mmh)
July 23, 2018 Filing 285 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Brian R. Martinotti, U.S.D.J.. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
July 19, 2018 Filing 284 Letter from David C. Kistler, Esquire re #277 MOTION for Protective Order . (KISTLER, DAVID)
July 19, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #279 MOTION to Compel Production Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37. Motion reset for 8/20/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 LETTER ORDER granting request for a one-cycle adjournment of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (d.e. #279 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/18/2018. (mmh)
July 17, 2018 Filing 282 Letter from David C. Kistler, Esquire re #279 MOTION to Compel Production Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37. (KISTLER, DAVID)
July 16, 2018 Filing 281 First MOTION for Protective Order by STEPHEN RHOADES. (MARCUS, JED)
July 16, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #279 MOTION to Compel Production Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37. Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
July 13, 2018 Filing 280 BRIEF in Support filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC re #279 MOTION to Compel Production Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, Esq. In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibits to Lustberg Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 13, 2018 Filing 279 MOTION to Compel Production Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
July 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #277 MOTION for Protective Order . Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
July 12, 2018 Filing 278 BRIEF in Support filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #277 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emer Simic, Esquire)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 12, 2018 Filing 277 MOTION for Protective Order by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
July 12, 2018 Filing 276 Letter from Defendants to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti re #166 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #183 Brief in Support of Motion,,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
July 2, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #275 MOTION to Seal and Redact. Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
June 29, 2018 Filing 275 MOTION to Seal and Redact by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg in Support of Unopposed Motion to Redact and Seal, #2 [Proposed] Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Consent Order)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
June 29, 2018 Filing 274 Letter from the Parties to Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: Litigation Schedule. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
June 28, 2018 Filing 273 BRIEF re ECF247 (Public Version) (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 28, 2018 Filing 272 BRIEF re ECF246 (Public Version) (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 28, 2018 Filing 271 BRIEF re ECF244 (Public Version) (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 28, 2018 Filing 270 BRIEF re ECF241 (Public Version) (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 28, 2018 Filing 269 BRIEF re ECF220 (Public Version) (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 28, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Damon Gupta, Esq.: $150, receipt number TRE092937 (mmh)
June 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #268 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #246 Letter,, #220 Brief in Support of Motion,, #244 Letter,, #247 Letter,, #241 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, . Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
June 27, 2018 Filing 268 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #246 Letter,, #220 Brief in Support of Motion,, #244 Letter,, #247 Letter,, #241 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky with Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg with Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to Damon Gupta, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/22/2018. (mmh)
June 22, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 6/22/2018. (ce3)
June 22, 2018 Filing 266 Letter from David C. Kistler, Esquire re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Damon Gupta. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David C. Kistler, Esquire, #2 Declaration of Damon Gupta, Esquire, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(KISTLER, DAVID)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference set for 6/22/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert WILL PROCEED as scheduled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 06/21/2018. (Biamonte, J)
June 20, 2018 Filing 264 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 19, 2018 Filing 263 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC identifying ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC as Corporate Parent.. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #236 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/18/2018. (mmh)
June 18, 2018 Filing 261 BRIEF re ECF152 (Public Version) (KISTLER, DAVID)
June 18, 2018 Filing 260 BRIEF re ECF142 (Public Version) (KISTLER, DAVID)
June 18, 2018 Filing 259 BRIEF re ECF127 (Public Version) (KISTLER, DAVID)
June 18, 2018 Filing 258 BRIEF re ECF116 (Public Version) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen R. Howe)(KISTLER, DAVID)
June 18, 2018 Filing 257 BRIEF re ECF224 (Public Version) (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 18, 2018 Filing 256 BRIEF re ECF186 (Public Version) (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 18, 2018 Filing 255 BRIEF re ECF176 (Public Version) (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 18, 2018 Filing 254 BRIEF re ECF166 (Public Version) (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 18, 2018 Filing 253 BRIEF re ECF104 (Public Version) (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 18, 2018 Filing 252 BRIEF re ECF089 (Public Version) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 306-317, #2 Exhibit 318-324, #3 Exhibit 325-353, #4 Exhibit 354-427)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 18, 2018 Filing 251 BRIEF re ECF088 (Public Version) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen R. Howe, #2 Exhibit 205-212, #3 Exhibit 213, #4 Exhibit 214-237, #5 Exhibit 238-260, #6 Exhibit 261-305)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 18, 2018 Filing 250 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire (Public Version) re #65 Letter,,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 18, 2018 Filing 249 BRIEF re ECF024 (Public Version) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stuart Hinchen, #2 Declaration Stephen R. Howe, #3 Declaration Peter Jenkins, #4 Declaration Harold Patterson)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
June 18, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/22/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. (ce3)
June 14, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 6/14/2018. (ce3)
June 13, 2018 Filing 248 Letter from Jed L. Marcus, Esq. to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: Discovery Disputes. (MARCUS, JED)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 12, 2018 Filing 247 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re: Discovery Disputes. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 12, 2018 Filing 246 Letter from Defendants re: Discovery Disputes. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 12, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: The Telephone Status Conference currently scheduled for 6/14/2018 03:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert WILL NOW BE HELD ON 6/14/2018 AT 2:00 P.M. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. (ce3)
June 11, 2018 Filing 245 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti re #244 Letter,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
June 11, 2018 Filing 244 Letter from Defendants re #241 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 5, 2018 Filing 243 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC re #242 Redacted Document (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
June 5, 2018 Filing 242 REDACTION to #241 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #2 Exhibit A)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
June 4, 2018 Filing 241 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC re #219 MOTION for Reconsideration re #211 Order on Motion for Bond, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 CONSENT ORDER Granting Stipulated Motion for Transfer of Preliminary Injunction Bond into an Interest-Bearing Account. (Finance Notified) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/31/2018. (mmh)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #218 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/31/2018. (mmh)
May 31, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #238 MOTION for Bond Transfer to an Interest-Bearing Account. Motion set for 7/2/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
May 31, 2018 Filing 238 MOTION for Bond Transfer to an Interest-Bearing Account by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
May 30, 2018 Filing 237 USCA Case Number 18-2177 for #233 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by MIKE RUTKOWSKI, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC. USCA Case Manager James (Document Restricted - Court Only) (lr)
May 30, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #236 Joint MOTION to Seal and Redact Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3. Motion set for 7/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
May 29, 2018 Filing 236 Joint MOTION to Seal and Redact Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3 by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire, #2 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, Esquire, #3 Exhibit Redacted 3-12-18 Brief & Declarations, #4 Exhibit Redacted 5-14-18 Reply Brief, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit, #6 Exhibit Redacted 2-12-18 Supplemental Brief, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits to Lustberg Declaration, #8 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits to Lustberg Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
May 29, 2018 Filing 235 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiffs request for leave to serve and file the attached demand for jury trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/29/2018. (mmh)
May 25, 2018 Filing 233 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #158 Order,, by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-8766324. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
May 22, 2018 Filing 232 REDACTION REDACTED version of Docket No.: 223, Reply Brief IFSO of First Motion to Dismiss by STEPHEN RHOADES. (MARCUS, JED)
May 22, 2018 Filing 231 REDACTION REDACTED version of Docket No.: 184, Declaration with Exhibits ISO of First Motion to Dismiss by STEPHEN RHOADES. (MARCUS, JED)
May 22, 2018 Filing 230 REDACTION to #183 Brief in Support of Motion,, REDACTED version of Docket No.: 183, Brief ISO of First Motion to Dismiss by STEPHEN RHOADES. (MARCUS, JED)
May 21, 2018 Filing 229 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. Requesting Leave for Jury Demand. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
May 21, 2018 Filing 228 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney DANIEL J. MCGRADY terminated. Attorney KATE ELIZABETH JANUKOWICZ for PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.,KATE ELIZABETH JANUKOWICZ for PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.,KATE ELIZABETH JANUKOWICZ for PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC,KATE ELIZABETH JANUKOWICZ for PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JANUKOWICZ, KATE)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 LETTER ORDER that Plaintiffs opposition to the Motion for Reconsideration is due 6/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/16/2018. (mmh)
May 16, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing:The Court will conduct a Settlement Conference on 8/22/2018 at 10:00 A.M. in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. Counsel are to submit confidential settlement memos to chambers, via email to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov at least 48 hours in advance of the conference. A Telephone Status Conference has been set for 6/14/2018 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Counsel for Defense is responsible for setting up and initiating the call.(ce3)
May 14, 2018 Filing 226 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #168 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 14, 2018 Filing 225 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DONNA KOHUT re #167 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
May 14, 2018 Filing 224 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAVID HARTLEY, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, DAVID SHORT re #165 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 14, 2018 Filing 223 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by STEPHEN RHOADES re #182 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and venueFirst MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state claims for relief (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jed Marcus, #2 Jed Marcus letter to court)(MARCUS, JED)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 14, 2018 Filing 222 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re: extension to file opposition re #219 MOTION for Reconsideration re #211 Order on Motion for Bond, . (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
May 11, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #219 MOTION for Reconsideration re #211 Order on Motion for Bond, . Motion set for 6/4/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
May 11, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #218 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #178 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #186 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,, #210 Opinion, #176 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, . Motion set for 6/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
May 11, 2018 Filing 221 Clerk's Certificate of Cash Deposit filed (Finance Notified) (km)
May 11, 2018 Filing 220 BRIEF in Support filed by QUVA PHARMA, INC. re #219 MOTION for Reconsideration re #211 Order on Motion for Bond, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Jenkins (Second Supplemental), #2 Declaration of Mohan Rao, Ph.D., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 11, 2018 Filing 219 MOTION for Reconsideration re #211 Order on Motion for Bond, by QUVA PHARMA, INC.. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
May 11, 2018 Filing 218 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #178 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #186 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,, #210 Opinion, #176 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
May 10, 2018 Filing 217 Clerk's Certificate of Cash Deposit in the amount of $ 18,400,000.00, Receipt Number NEW036362 filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. (Finance Notified) (sms)
May 10, 2018 Filing 216 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Entry of a Preliminary Injunction Bond (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
May 10, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/10/2018. (ce3)
May 10, 2018 ATTENTION COUNSEL: Please disregard the previous docket entry re: Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 5/10/2018 - this was erroneously docketed in this case. (ce3)
May 10, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 5/10/2018. (ce3)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER Establishing protocol for production of documents and electronically stored information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/4/2018. (km)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #213 Motion to Redact 187 Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/1/2018. (km)
April 30, 2018 Filing 213 Joint MOTION to Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording 187 Transcript,,, by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky in Support of Motion with Defendants' Index, #2 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg in Support of Motion with Plaintiffs' Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
April 30, 2018 Filing 212 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire re #211 Order on Motion for Bond,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting QuVa's #175 Motion to Set the Required Bond Amount; that Par shall post a bond of $18.4 million; that the Court's Order of 3/1/2018 is reinstated; that the parties shall submit a joint proposed redacted opinion by 5/11/2018. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/27/2018. (jjc)
April 27, 2018 Filing 210 OPINION. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/27/2018. (jjc)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 LETTER ORDER granting request that the deadline to file a Motion to Seal be extended to 5/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/27/2018. (mmh)
April 26, 2018 Filing 208 Letter from Defendants re: Request for Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 TEXT ORDER re #198 Letter request for two week extension of time to file reply until 5/14/2018 is Granted. Further ordered request to stay discovery is referred to the magistrate judge. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/26/2018. (DS)
April 26, 2018 Filing 206 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 5/10/2018 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due 7 days prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov (ce3)
April 26, 2018 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN MARIE EFFINGHAM on behalf of STEPHEN RHOADES (EFFINGHAM, ANN)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #177 Motion to Seal Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/25/2018. (km)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 LETTER ORDER granting two week extension to file reply brief only. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/25/2018. (km)
April 25, 2018 Filing 202 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg re #198 Letter. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 24, 2018 Filing 201 DECLARATION re #193 Declaration,, [REDACTED VERSION] by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits [REDACTED])(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 24, 2018 Filing 200 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #182 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and venueFirst MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state claims for relief [REDACTED VERSION] (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 24, 2018 Filing 199 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #165 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [REDACTED VERSION] (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 24, 2018 Filing 198 Letter from Jed Marcus re Rhoades Request for Extention of Time and for Stay of Discovery re #195 Letter. (MARCUS, JED)
April 24, 2018 Filing 197 Letter from Defendants re #196 Letter. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
April 24, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Emer Simic, Esq., receipt number TRE091064 (mps)
April 24, 2018 Filing 196 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Brian R. Martinotti, U.S.D.J. re #195 Letter. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 24, 2018 Filing 195 Letter from Defendants re: Request for Extension of Time to File Replies in Further Support of Motions to Dismiss. (KISTLER, DAVID)
April 23, 2018 Filing 194 Certification on behalf of All Plaintiffs Re #191 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #190 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #193 Declaration,, #189 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #192 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 23, 2018 Filing 193 DECLARATION re #190 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #189 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #192 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-13, #2 Exhibits 14-27, #3 Exhibits 28-42)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 23, 2018 Filing 192 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #182 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and venueFirst MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state claims for relief (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 23, 2018 Filing 191 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #168 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 23, 2018 Filing 190 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #167 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 23, 2018 Filing 189 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #165 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 23, 2018 Filing 188 NOTICE by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT Withdrawing Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Stephen R. Howe and Emily M. Wessels of Merchant & Gould PC (KISTLER, DAVID)
April 13, 2018 Filing 186 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT re #175 MOTION for Bond Amount (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Peter Jenkins, #2 Declaration of Harold Patterson)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Emer Simic. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/11/2018. (km)
April 10, 2018 Filing 184 DECLARATION re #182 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and venueFirst MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state claims for relief, #183 Brief in Support of Motion,, by STEPHEN RHOADES. (MARCUS, JED)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 10, 2018 Filing 183 BRIEF in Support filed by STEPHEN RHOADES re #182 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and venueFirst MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state claims for relief (MARCUS, JED)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 10, 2018 Filing 182 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and venue, First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state claims for relief by STEPHEN RHOADES. Responses due by 4/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Alternate No. 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Alternate No. 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Alternate No. 3)(MARCUS, JED)
April 10, 2018 Filing 181 Letter from David C. Kistler, Esquire with consented Pro Hac Vice Application of Emer Simic, Esquire. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David C. Kistler, Esquire, #2 Declaration of Emer Simic, Esquire, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(KISTLER, DAVID)
April 9, 2018 Filing 180 BRIEF in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Set Required Bond Amount [PUBLIC VERSION OF ECF NO. 178] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Antonio Pera (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Dr. Christine S. Meyer (Redacted), #3 Declaration of Dr. Michael J. Miller (Redacted), #4 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #5 Exhibits 1-16 to Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
April 9, 2018 Filing 179 NOTICE of Change of Address by DAVID C. KISTLER (KISTLER, DAVID)
April 6, 2018 Filing 178 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #175 MOTION for Bond Amount (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Antonio Pera, #2 Declaration of Dr. Christine S. Meyer, #3 Declaration of Dr. Michael J. Miller, #4 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #5 Exhibits 1-6 of the Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #6 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 4, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #177 MOTION to Seal Document #116 Brief in Support of Motion, #69 Brief in Support of Motion. Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
April 3, 2018 Filing 177 MOTION to Seal Document #116 Brief in Support of Motion,, #69 Brief in Support of Motion,,,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg with Annexed Exhibit, #2 Declaration of David C. Kistler with Annexed Exhibit, #3 [Proposed] Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Consent Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
March 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #175 MOTION for Bond Amount. Motion set for 4/16/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
March 26, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #174 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by STEPHEN RHOADES has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/16/2018. (mmh)
March 23, 2018 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by QUVA PHARMA, INC. re #175 MOTION for Bond Amount (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky with Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 23, 2018 Filing 175 MOTION for Bond Amount by QUVA PHARMA, INC.. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
March 23, 2018 Filing 174 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Stephen Rhoades.. (MARCUS, JED)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 LETTER ORDER that the deadline for the parties to file a motion to seal certain materials is extended to 4/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/22/2018. (mmh)
March 20, 2018 Filing 172 Letter from Defendants re: Request for Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
March 16, 2018 Filing 171 REDACTED OPINION re #157 Opinion. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/1/2018. (mmh)
March 16, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #167 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted, #165 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #168 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted. Motions reset for 5/7/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
March 15, 2018 Filing 170 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #167 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted, #165 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #168 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted . (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
March 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #168 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted. Motion set for 4/16/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
March 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #167 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted. Motion set for 4/16/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
March 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #165 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion set for 4/16/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER that the Court's Order dated 3/1/2018 granting Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is temporarily vacated without prejudice solely in order for the Court to determine an appropriate security bond and for Plaintiffs to give such appropriate bond pursuant to F.R.C.P. 65(c); that Defendants shall not market or release their planned vasopressin product during the pendency of the proceedings; setting the Briefing Schedule on the amount of an appropriate security bond Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/12/2018. (mmh)
March 12, 2018 Filing 168 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted by DAVID HARTLEY, STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DAVID SHORT. Responses due by 4/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
March 12, 2018 Filing 167 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can Be Granted by DONNA KOHUT. Responses due by 4/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
March 12, 2018 Filing 166 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by DAVID HARTLEY, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, DAVID SHORT re #165 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen R. Howe, Esquire, #2 Declaration of Donna Kohut, #3 Declaration of Mike Hartley, #4 Declaration of David Short, #5 Declaration of Travis McGrady)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 12, 2018 Filing 165 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DAVID HARTLEY, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, DAVID SHORT. Responses due by 4/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER that Plaintiffs' application for permission to submit portions of the deposition testimony of Travis Leeah to the FDA is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/9/2018. (mmh)
March 9, 2018 Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Telephone Conference held on 3/9/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder Not on the record.) (DS)
March 6, 2018 Filing 162 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN RHOADES. STEPHEN RHOADES waiver sent on 1/31/2018, answer due 4/2/2018. (MARCUS, JED)
March 6, 2018 Filing 161 Letter from Jed Marcus re Mr. Rhoades' deadline to file answer or other responsive pleading. (MARCUS, JED)
March 2, 2018 Filing 160 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti re #159 Letter. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
March 2, 2018 Filing 159 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky to the Hon. Brian R. Martinotti. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER that the accompanying Opinion be filed UNDER SEAL; Par's #68 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Defendants are enjoined from marketing and releasing their planned vasopressin product through the conclusion of trial; parties shall submit via e-mail a joint proposed redacted opinion by 3/15/2018; Defendants' #47 Motion to Dismiss is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED; Defendants may answer or otherwise respond to Par's First Amended Complaint by 3/12/2018; Par's #66 Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Sixth Counterclaim remains pending. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/1/2018. (km)
March 1, 2018 Filing 157 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/1/2018. (km)
February 26, 2018 Filing 156 BRIEF (Supplement) in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [PUBLIC VERSION OF ECF No. 152] (KISTLER, DAVID)
February 26, 2018 Filing 155 BRIEF (Supplement) in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [PUBLIC VERSION OF ECF No. 142-1] (KISTLER, DAVID)
February 20, 2018 Filing 154 BRIEF [Post-hearing] in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction [PUBLIC VERSION] (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
February 16, 2018 Filing 153 BRIEF [Post-hearing] in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 16, 2018 Filing 152 BRIEF in Opposition filed by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Supplemental Brief) (KISTLER, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 16, 2018 Filing 151 Letter from Jed L. Marcus Clarifying Issues Pertaining to Mr. Rhoades. (MARCUS, JED)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 16, 2018 Filing 150 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID HARTLEY, DAVID SHORT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, DONNA KOHUT. (Attachments: #1 Summons Service Waiver of Donna Kohut, #2 Summons Service Waiver of David Short, #3 Summons Service Waiver of Travis McGrady, #4 Summons Service Waiver of David Hartley)(KISTLER, DAVID)
February 16, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #146 Executed Waivers of Service filed by David Kistler on 2/15/2018 were submitted incorrectly as an attachment to a letter. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Waivers USING Waiver of Service Executed found under Civil - Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 LETTER ORDER that the time for Defendants QuVa Pharma, Inc., Stuart Hinchen, Peter Jenkins and Mike Rutkowski to respond to the complaint is extended to 3/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/16/2018. (mmh)
February 15, 2018 Filing 147 Letter from Defendants to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re: Consent Request for Extension of Time to Answer or Plead to First Amended Complaint. (KISTLER, DAVID)
February 15, 2018 Filing 146 Letter from Defendants re: Executed Waivers of Service. (KISTLER, DAVID)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the courtroom will be sealed for the duration of the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction; that the individual parties to this litigation, as well as in-house attorneys who have involvement in the parties' commercial activities, may be present during the hearing but are prohibited from disclosing outside of the hearing any of the confidential information presented; that no party shall use this stipulation to argue an absense or lack of reasonable efforts to keep their information secret. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 2/15/2018. (mmh)
February 14, 2018 Filing 148 Transcript of TELECONFERENCE RE: PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY APPLICATION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION [DOC. #124] held on 2/1/2018, before Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Transcriber - Transcripts Plus, Inc. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 3/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2018. (kas)
February 14, 2018 Filing 144 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Motion Hearing held on 2/14/2018 re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. Ordered Decision Reserved. (Court Reporter: Megan McKay-Soule.) (DS) (Main Document 144 replaced on 2/14/2018) (DS).
February 13, 2018 Filing 143 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti, U.S.D.J. requesting Sur-Reply [PUBLIC VERSION] re #139 Letter,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #3 Exhibit 451, #4 Exhibit 452, #5 Exhibit 453, #6 Exhibit 454, #7 Exhibit 455, #8 Exhibit 456, #9 Exhibit 457, #10 Exhibit 458, #11 Exhibit 459, #12 Exhibit 460, #13 Exhibit 461, #14 Exhibit 462, #15 Exhibit 463, #16 Exhibit 464, #17 Exhibit 465, #18 Declaration of Scott Cooper)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
February 13, 2018 Filing 142 Letter from Defendants to Honorable Brian R. Martinotti, U.S.D.J. requesting Leave to File Sur-Reply re re #139 Letter,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Brief (Supplement) in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(KISTLER, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #117 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/13/2018. (mmh)
February 12, 2018 Filing 140 Exhibit to #139 Letter,,,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 465)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 12, 2018 Filing 139 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Brian R. Martinotti, U.S.D.J. requesting Sur-Reply re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #3 Exhibit 451, #4 Exhibit 452, #5 Exhibit 453, #6 Exhibit 454, #7 Exhibit 455, #8 Exhibit 456, #9 Exhibit 457, #10 Exhibit 458, #11 Exhibit 459, #12 Exhibit 460, #13 Exhibit 461, #14 Exhibit 462, #15 Exhibit 463, #16 Declaration of Scott Cooper, CMC)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 9, 2018 Filing 138 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Consent Order re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying #115 Motion to Strike Undisclosed Trade Secrets. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 2/8/2018. (mps)
February 8, 2018 Filing 136 (REDACTED) OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 2/8/2018. (mps) (Main Document 136 replaced on 2/9/2018) (DS). Modified on 2/9/2018 (DS).
February 8, 2018 Filing 135 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re #134 Letter,,. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
February 7, 2018 CLERK'S NOTE: Courtroom technology tutorial has been set for Wednesday, 2/14/2018 at 9:30 a.m. IT Technicians and paralegals are encouraged to be present to learn how to connect a laptop to our in-house audio/video system. Please make sure your device has a VGA/monitor port; and for MAC users, a VGA converter cable will be needed. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. (DS)
February 6, 2018 Filing 134 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire re #128 Letter. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 LETTER ORDER granting stipulation that the deadlines be extended to 3/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/6/2018. (km)
February 5, 2018 Filing 132 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re: extension of deadlines to file motions to seal. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
February 2, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN JAMES DILORENZO on behalf of STEPHEN RHOADES (DILORENZO, BENJAMIN)
February 2, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA C. MANNING on behalf of STEPHEN RHOADES (MANNING, DIANA)
February 1, 2018 Filing 129 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE HELD ON THE RECORD ON 2/1/2018. Ordered Plaintiffs Emergency Application to Compel Deposition [doc. #124] - GRANTED (digitally recorded.) (ce3)
February 1, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/1/2018 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. (ce3)
January 31, 2018 Filing 128 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
January 29, 2018 Filing 127 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI re #115 MOTION to Strike Undisclosed Trade Secrets (KISTLER, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 29, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by JED L. MARCUS on behalf of STEPHEN RHOADES (MARCUS, JED)
January 29, 2018 Filing 125 Letter from Jed Marcus Opposing Application to Compel Deposition re #124 Letter. (MARCUS, JED)
January 26, 2018 Filing 124 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Brian R. Martinotti, U.S.D.J. re: Emergency Application to Compel Deposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
January 25, 2018 Filing 122 SUMMONS ISSUED on AMENDED COMPLAINT as to DAVID HARTLEY, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, STEPHEN RHOADES, DAVID SHORT Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Melissa M. Haneke* (mmh)
January 24, 2018 Filing 121 Request for Summons to be Issued by PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. as to DAVID HARTLEY, DONNA KOHUT, TRAVIS MCGRADY, STEPHEN RHOADES, DAVID SHORT. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
January 23, 2018 Filing 120 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #115 MOTION to Strike Undisclosed Trade Secrets [PUBLIC VERSION] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #2 Exhibits A - I to Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #3 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
January 22, 2018 Filing 119 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #115 MOTION to Strike Undisclosed Trade Secrets (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #2 Exhibits A-I to the Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #3 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 22, 2018 Filing 118 Letter from Defendants re: Local Civil Rule 6.1 Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. (KISTLER, DAVID)
January 17, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #117 MOTION to Seal Document #104 Certification in Opposition to Motion. Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 16, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION to Seal Document #104 Certification in Opposition to Motion,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg in Support of Joint Motion to Seal Documents, #2 Exhibit A, #3 [Proposed] Consent Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
January 16, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #115 MOTION to Strike Undisclosed Trade Secrets. Motion set for 2/5/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 12, 2018 Filing 116 BRIEF in Support filed by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI re #115 MOTION to Strike Undisclosed Trade Secrets (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen R. Howe in Support of Motion with Exhibits)(KISTLER, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 12, 2018 Filing 115 MOTION to Strike Undisclosed Trade Secrets by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI. Responses due by 1/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen R. Howe in Support of Motion to Strike, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KISTLER, DAVID)
January 12, 2018 Filing 114 AMENDED COMPLAINT against STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI, DONNA KOHUT, DAVID SHORT, STEPHEN RHOADES, TRAVIS MCGRADY, DAVID HARTLEY, filed by PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER that Par's motion for leave to file an Amended Complaint (ECF No. #87 ) is GRANTED; that Par is to file their Amended Complaint no later than January 17, 2018; that Defendants' motion to seal (ECF No. #86 ) is GRANTED; that Par's letter application to remove the confidentiality designation from certain discovery material is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/12/2018. (mmh)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/10/2018. (mmh)
January 10, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction set for 2/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Parties confirmed. (DS)
January 9, 2018 Filing 111 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti re: preliminary injunction oral argument. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
January 8, 2018 Filing 123 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Telephone Conference held on 1/8/2018; Set Hearing as to #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for 2/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (Court Reporter: Not on the record.) (DS)
January 5, 2018 Filing 110 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti on behalf of all parties re: preliminary injunction motion. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
January 2, 2018 Filing 109 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #87 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint [PUBLIC VERSION] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
January 2, 2018 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #87 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint [UNDER SEAL] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 2, 2018 Filing 107 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant QuVa Pharma, Inc.'s Sixth Counterclaim (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
December 28, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee received in the amount of $ 150.00 as to Emily M. Wessels, receipt number TRE087291 (km)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 LETTER ORDER that the Deadline to file the Motion(s) to Seal is extended to 2/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/28/2017. (km)
December 28, 2017 Filing 105 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re: Motion to Seal deadline. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
December 22, 2017 Filing 104 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI re #87 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (KISTLER, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 22, 2017 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI re #87 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen R. Howe)(KISTLER, DAVID)
December 22, 2017 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant QuVa Pharma, Inc.'s Sixth Counterclaim (KISTLER, DAVID)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 LETTER ORDER that the time for Plaintiffs to file their replies to the pending motions is extended until 1/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/19/2017. (mmh)
December 19, 2017 Filing 100 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Redacted Public Version (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 205-237, #2 Exhibit 238-305, #3 Exhibit 306-317, #4 Exhibit 318-353, #5 Exhibit 354-427)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
December 19, 2017 Filing 99 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re #97 Order. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
December 18, 2017 Filing 98 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of David S. Almeling, #2 Exhibits to Declaration of David S. Almeling, #3 Declaration (Supplemental) of Michael J. Miller, #4 Declaration (Supplemental) of Scott Cooper)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 LETTER ORDER that the time for Defendants to file their opposition briefs to the pending motions is extended to 12/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/18/2017. (mmh)
December 15, 2017 Filing 96 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of David S. Almeling, #2 Exhibits 428-439, #3 Exhibits 440-441, #4 Exhibits 442-450, #5 Declaration (Supplemental) of Michael J. Miller, #6 Declaration (Supplemental) of Scott Cooper, #7 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 LETTER ORDER that the time for Defendants to file their opposition briefs to the pending motions is extended to 12/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/14/2017. (mmh)
December 14, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MICHELLE P. WOODHOUSE and PEI HSIEN REN, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mmh)
December 13, 2017 Filing 94 Letter from Defendants re: Request for Extension of Time to File Opposition. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
December 13, 2017 Filing 93 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michelle P. Woodhouse to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8328638.) (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
December 13, 2017 Filing 92 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Pei Hsien Ren to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8328617.) (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
December 12, 2017 Filing 91 BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [REDACTED VERSION] (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CONSENT ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to Pei Hsien Ren, Esq. and Michelle P. Woodhouse, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/11/2017. (mmh) Modified on 1/9/2018 (mmh).
December 8, 2017 Filing 89 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 306-317, #2 Exhibit 318-324, #3 Exhibit 325-353, #4 Exhibit 354-427)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 8, 2017 Filing 88 BRIEF in Opposition filed by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen R. Howe with Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 205-212, #3 Exhibit 213, #4 Exhibit 214-237, #5 Exhibit 238-260, #6 Exhibit 261-305)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 6, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #87 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 1/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
December 5, 2017 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
December 4, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #86 MOTION to Seal Document #65 Letter, #64 Letter. Motion set for 1/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
December 1, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION to Seal Document #65 Letter,, #64 Letter,, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David C. Kistler in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order of Defendants, #3 Text of Proposed Order of Plaintiffs, #4 Certificate of Service)(KISTLER, DAVID)
December 1, 2017 Filing 85 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lawrence S. Lustberg in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Pei Hsien Ren in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Declaration of Michelle P. Woodhouse in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
November 29, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DANIEL G. BROWN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mmh)
November 28, 2017 Filing 84 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel G. Brown to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8286087.) (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
November 21, 2017 Filing 83 AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #72 Exhibit (to Document),,, Exhibits 20-37 to the Declaration of David Almeling [Under Seal]. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CONSENT ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to Daniel G. Brown, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/21/2017. (mmh)
November 21, 2017 Reset Deadlines as to #66 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant QuVa Pharma, Inc.'s Sixth Counterclaim. Motion reset for 1/4/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
November 20, 2017 Filing 81 BRIEF in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [PUBLIC VERSION] [ECF Nos. 68-75] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Cooper [PUBLIC VERSION], #2 Declaration of Jonathan Lee [PUBLIC VERSION], #3 Declaration of Dr. Christine S. Meyer [PUBLIC VERSION], #4 Declaration of Antonio Pera [PUBLIC VERSION], #5 Declaration of Michael J. Miller [PUBLIC VERSION], #6 Declaration of David S. Almeling [PUBLIC VERSION], #7 Exhibits 1-204 of the Declaration of David S. Almeling [PUBLIC VERSION], #8 Text of Proposed Order [PUBLIC VERSION])(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
November 20, 2017 Filing 80 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re: pro hac vice application of Daniel G. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #2 Certification of Daniel G. Brown, #3 Proposed Consent Order)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
November 20, 2017 Filing 79 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #47 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts of Plaintiffs' Complaint (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/20/17. (mem, )
November 20, 2017 Filing 77 Letter from Defendants re: Local Civil Rule 7.1 Extension. (KISTLER, DAVID)
November 20, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #67 MOTION to Seal. Motion set for 12/18/2017 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
November 20, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #66 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant QuVa Pharma, Inc.'s Sixth Counterclaim. Motion set for 12/18/2017 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
November 18, 2017 Filing 75 Exhibit to #71 Declaration,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 153 - 157 to Almeling Declaration, #2 Exhibit 158 (Part 1) to Almeling Declaration, #3 Exhibit 158 (Part 2) to Almeling Declaration, #4 Exhibit 158 (Part 3) to Almeling Declaration, #5 Exhibit 158 (Part 4) to Almeling Declaration, #6 Exhibit 159 (Part 1) to Almeling Declaration, #7 Exhibit 159 (Part 2) to Almeling Declaration, #8 Exhibit 159 (Part 3) to Almeling Declaration, #9 Exhibit 159 (Part 4) to Almeling Declaration, #10 Exhibit 160 (Part 1) to Almeling Declaration, #11 Exhibit 160 (Part 2) to Almeling Declaration, #12 Exhibits 161 - 165 to Almeling Declaration, #13 Exhibits 166 (Part 1) to Almeling Declaration, #14 Exhibit 166 (Part 2) to Almeling Declaration, #15 Exhibit 167 to Almeling Declaration, #16 Exhibits 168 - 188 to Almeling Declaration, #17 Exhibit 191 to Almeling Declaration, #18 Exhibits 192 - 195 to Almeling Declaration, #19 Exhibit 196 to Almeling Declaration, #20 Exhibits 197 - 204 to Almeling Declaration, #21 Text of Proposed Order, #22 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 18, 2017 Filing 74 Exhibit to #71 Declaration,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 110 to Almeling Declaration, #2 Exhibit 111 to Almeling Declaration, #3 Exhibits 112 - 115 to Almeling Declaration, #4 Exhibits 116 - 120 to Almeling Declaration, #5 Exhibits 121 - 122 to Almeling Declaration, #6 Exhibit 123 (Part 1) to Almeling Declaration, #7 Exhibit 123 (Part 2) to Almeling Declaration, #8 Exhibit 123 (Part 3) to Almeling Declaration, #9 Exhibit 123 (Part 4) to Almeling Declaration, #10 Exhibit 123 (Part 5) to Almeling Declaration, #11 Exhibit 124 to Almeling Declaration, #12 Exhibit 125 (Part 1) to Almeling Declaration, #13 Exhibit 125 (Part 2) to Almeling Declaration, #14 Exhibit 126 to Almeling Declaration, #15 Exhibit 127 to Almeling Declaration, #16 Exhibits 128 - 138 to Almeling Declaration, #17 Exhibit 139 to Almeling Declaration, #18 Exhibits 140 - 151 to Almeling Declaration, #19 Exhibit 152 (Part 1) to Almeling Declaration, #20 Exhibit 152 (Part 2) to Almeling Declaration)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 18, 2017 Filing 73 Exhibit to #71 Declaration,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 49 - 52 to Almeling Declaration, #2 Exhibit 53 to Almeling Declaration, #3 Exhibits 54 - 59 to Almeling Declaration, #4 Exhibits 60 - 67 to Almeling Declaration, #5 Exhibit 68 (Part 1) to Almeling Declaration, #6 Exhibit 68 (Part 2) to Almeling Declaration, #7 Exhibits 69 - 91 to Almeling Declaration, #8 Exhibit 92 to Almeling Declaration, #9 Exhibits 93 - 106 to Almeling Declaration, #10 Exhibits 107 - 108 to Almeling Declaration, #11 Exhibit 109 to Almeling Declaration)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 18, 2017 Filing 72 Exhibit to #71 Declaration,, by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 5 to Almeling Declaration, #2 Exhibit 6 to Almeling Declaration, #3 Exhibits 7 - 18 to Almeling Declaration, #4 Exhibits 19 - 37 to Almeling Declaration, #5 Exhibit 38 to Almeling Declaration, #6 Exhibits 39 - 46 to Almeling Declaration, #7 Exhibit 47 to Almeling Declaration, #8 Exhibit 48 to Almeling Declaration)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting leave to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Emily M. Wessels. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/17/2017. (km)
November 17, 2017 Filing 71 DECLARATION of David S. Almeling in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 17, 2017 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Michael J. Miller in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 17, 2017 Filing 69 BRIEF in Support filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Cooper, CMC, in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Jonathan Lee in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Dr. Christine S. Meyer in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration of Antonio Pera in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 17, 2017 Filing 68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
November 17, 2017 Filing 67 MOTION to Seal by STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David C. Kistler, Esquire, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(KISTLER, DAVID)
November 17, 2017 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant QuVa Pharma, Inc.'s Sixth Counterclaim by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Partial Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
November 15, 2017 Filing 65 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire re #64 Letter,,. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 14, 2017 Filing 64 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: Emergent Request to De-Designate Testimony. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 14, 2017 Filing 63 Letter from David C. Kistler, Esquire with Pro Hac Vice Application for Emily M. Wessels, Esquire. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David C. Kistler, Esquire, #2 Declaration of Emily M. Wessels, Esquire, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(KISTLER, DAVID)
November 10, 2017 Filing 62 Letter from Defendants re: Plaintiffs' Letter of November 9, 2017 re #60 Letter. (KISTLER, DAVID)
November 9, 2017 Filing 60 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Michael A. Shipp. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 LETTER ORDER granting the request for a one week extension of time, until 11/20/2017, for Defendants to file their reply papers in further support of their partial motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/8/2017. (mmh)
November 8, 2017 Filing 59 Letter from Defendants Requesting Extension of Time to File Reply. (KISTLER, DAVID)
November 6, 2017 Filing 58 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #47 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts of Plaintiffs' Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
November 3, 2017 Filing 57 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. [UNDER SEAL] re #56 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 3, 2017 Filing 56 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibits B through K [Filed Under Seal])(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
October 31, 2017 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #55 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/17/2017. (mmh)
October 27, 2017 Filing 55 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Par Sterile Products, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
October 27, 2017 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 10/27/2017. (ce3)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/26/2017. (mmh)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER directing the exchange of certain information and materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/26/2017. (mmh)
October 25, 2017 Filing 52 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
October 20, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction re #46 Transcript,,, by DAVID C. KISTLER (KISTLER, DAVID)
October 20, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #47 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts of Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 11/20/2017 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
October 19, 2017 Filing 50 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #47 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts of Plaintiffs' Complaint . (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
October 18, 2017 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUVA PHARMA, INC.. (KISTLER, DAVID)
October 16, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #47 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts of Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
October 13, 2017 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
October 13, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts of Plaintiffs' Complaint by All Defendants. Responses due by 10/23/2017 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Stephen R. Howe with Exhibits A-D, #3 Exhibit E-H to Howe Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/10/2017. (km)
October 9, 2017 Filing 46 Transcript of TELECONFERENCE RE: EXPEDITED DISCOVERY held on 9/29/2017, before Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Transcriber - Transcripts Plus, Inc. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 10/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2018. (kas, )
October 6, 2017 Filing 44 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re: Discovery Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CONSENT ORDER granting expedited discovery and setting a schedule for preliminary injunction briefing and hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/4/2017. (mmh)
October 3, 2017 Filing 42 Letter from Defendant regarding Expedited Discovery. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
October 3, 2017 Filing 41 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: Expedited Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
September 29, 2017 Filing 40 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re: Proposed Consent Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Order Granting Expedited Discovery and Setting a Schedule for Preliminary Injunction Briefing and Hearing)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
September 29, 2017 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: TELECONFERENCE HELD ON THE RECORD ON 9/29/2017 RE: Expedited Discovery. (digitally recorded.) (ce3)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER ORDER that the time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended from 9/29/2017 to 10/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/26/2017. (mmh)
September 26, 2017 Filing 37 Letter from Defendants re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (KISTLER, DAVID)
September 26, 2017 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: TELECONFERENCE HELD ON THE RECORD ON 9/26/2017 RE: #15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Expedited Discovery Should Not Be Granted And A Scheduling Order Should Not Be Required. Decision reserved. A telephone status conference has been set for 9/29/2017 at 10:30 A.M. Counsel for Plaintiffs is responsible for setting up and initiating the call.(digitally recorded.) (ce3)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER ORDER withdrawing #25 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/22/2017. (mmh)
September 22, 2017 Filing 34 Letter from Defendants Withdrawing First Motion to Seal. (KISTLER, DAVID)
September 22, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #33 Joint MOTION to Seal. Motion set for 10/16/2017 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
September 21, 2017 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Seal by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
September 21, 2017 Filing 32 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: conference call on September 26, 2017. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
September 21, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/26/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3)
September 20, 2017 Filing 31 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re: request for telephone conference. (MCGRADY, DANIEL)
September 20, 2017 Filing 30 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg to Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re #29 Letter. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
September 19, 2017 Filing 29 Letter from Defendants re: Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (KISTLER, DAVID)
September 14, 2017 Filing 28 Letter from Defendants re: Executed Waivers of Service. (KISTLER, DAVID)
September 11, 2017 Filing 27 Letter from Defendants in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Reply re #26 Brief. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
September 8, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee of $450 received as to Jeffrey S. Ward, Esq., Wendy M. Ward, Esq. and Stephen R. Howe, Esq., receipt number TRE083982 (mps)
September 8, 2017 Filing 26 BRIEF (Letter) in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Expedited Discovery (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
September 7, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #25 MOTION to Seal Document #24 Brief,, in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Expedited Discovery. Motion set for 10/2/2017 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
September 7, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION to Seal Document #24 Brief,, in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Expedited Discovery by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
September 7, 2017 Filing 24 BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Expedited Discovery (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 7, 2017 Filing 23 BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Expedited Discovery (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen R. Howe with Exhibits A-O, #2 Declaration of Stuart Hinchen, #3 Declaration of Peter Jenkins with Exhibit A, #4 Declaration of Harold Patterson with Exhibits 1-11)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to Jeffrey S. Ward, Esq., Wendy M. Ward, Esq. and Stephen R. Howe, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/31/2017. (mmh)
August 31, 2017 Filing 21 Letter from David Kistler to Judge Arpert re: pro hac vice applications. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Kistler, #2 Declaration Jeffrey Ward, #3 Declaration Wendy Ward, #4 Declaration Stephen Howe, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(KISTLER, DAVID)
August 30, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DVID S. ALMELING, JEFFREY A. BARKER, BRETT J. WILLIAMSON and DANIEL M. PETROCELLI, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mmh)
August 29, 2017 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David S. Almeling to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8056314.) (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 29, 2017 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey A. Barker to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8056258.) (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 29, 2017 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brett J. Williamson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8056220.) (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 29, 2017 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel M. Petrocelli to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8056162.) (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER ORDER that the time for all four Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to 9/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/29/2017. (mmh)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Expedited Discovery Should Not Be Granted And A Scheduling Order Should Not Be Required. Defendants shall show cause, in writing, on or before 9/7/2017, why discovery should not be conducted on an expedited basis and why the proposed Scheduling Order re: Plaintiffs' forthcoming motion for injunctive relief should not enter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/29/2017. (mmh)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel M. Petrocelli, Brett J. Williamson, Jeffrey A. Barker, and David S. Almeling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/29/2017. (mmh)
August 29, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel M. Petrocelli, Brett J. Williamson, Jeffrey A. Barker, and David S. Almeling. Motion set for 10/2/2017 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
August 28, 2017 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for An Order to Show Cause Why Expedited Discovery Should Not Be Granted and a Scheduling Order Should Not Be Required [FILED UNDER SEAL] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G to the Declaration of David S. Almeling [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit H to the Declaration of David S. Almeling [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Antonio Pera [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Antonio Pera [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Antonio Pera [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Antonio Pera [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Antonio Pera [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Antonio Pera [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit X to the Declaration of Antonio Pera [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Declaration of Brian Harris [FILED UNDER SEAL])(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 28, 2017 Filing 12 APPLICATION/PETITION for an Order to Show Cause Why Expedited Discovery Should Not Be Granted and a Scheduling Order Should Not Be Required for by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for an Order to Show Cause Why Expedited Discovery Should Not Be Granted and a Scheduling Order Should Not Be Required [REDACTED], #2 Declaration of David S. Almeling, #3 Exhibits A - L to Declaration of David S. Almeling [REDACTED], #4 Declaration of Antonio Pera, #5 Exhibits A - O to Declaration of Antonio Pera (Part 1 of 2) [REDACTED], #6 Declaration Exhibits P - X to Declaration of Antonio Pera (Part 2 of 2) [REDACTED], #7 Declaration of Brian Harris [REDACTED], #8 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Brian Harris, #9 [Proposed] Order to Show Cause Why Expedited Discovery Should Not Be Granted and a Scheduling Order Should Not Be Required, #10 [Proposed] Order Granting Expedited Discovery and Setting a Schedule For Preliminary Injunction Briefing and Hearing, #11 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 28, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel M. Petrocelli, Brett J. Williamson, Jeffrey A. Barker, and David S. Almeling by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lawrence S. Lustberg in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admissions, #2 Certification of Daniel M. Petrocelli in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certification of Brett J. Williamson in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certification of Jeffrey A. Barker in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Certification of David S. Almeling in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 28, 2017 Filing 10 Letter from David Kistler to Judge Arpert requesting an extension of time for defendants to respond to the complaint. (KISTLER, DAVID)
August 28, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by LEIGH ANN BUZIAK on behalf of All Defendants (BUZIAK, LEIGH ANN)
August 28, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID C. KISTLER on behalf of All Defendants (KISTLER, DAVID)
August 28, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY on behalf of All Defendants (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
August 18, 2017 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. MIKE RUTKOWSKI served on 8/16/2017, answer due 9/6/2017. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 18, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. QUVA PHARMA, INC. served on 8/16/2017, answer due 9/6/2017. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 16, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. MCGRADY on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC (MCGRADY, DANIEL)
August 16, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem)
August 15, 2017 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mem, )
August 14, 2017 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0312-8025745 (ld, )
August 14, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC identifying Endo International plc as Corporate Parent. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
August 14, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STUART HINCHEN, PETER JENKINS, QUVA PHARMA, INC., MIKE RUTKOWSKI with JURY DEMAND, filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement Pursuant to Local Civil RUle 10.1(a), #3 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. et al v. QUVA PHARMA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Represented By: DANIEL J. MCGRADY
Represented By: KATE ELIZABETH JANUKOWICZ
Represented By: JASON ROBERT HALPIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Represented By: DANIEL J. MCGRADY
Represented By: KATE ELIZABETH JANUKOWICZ
Represented By: JASON ROBERT HALPIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUVA PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Represented By: DAVID C. KISTLER
Represented By: ANN ELIZABETH QUERNS
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Represented By: LEIGH ANN BUZIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER JENKINS
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Represented By: DAVID C. KISTLER
Represented By: ANN ELIZABETH QUERNS
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Represented By: LEIGH ANN BUZIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART HINCHEN
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Represented By: DAVID C. KISTLER
Represented By: ANN ELIZABETH QUERNS
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Represented By: LEIGH ANN BUZIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE RUTKOWSKI
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Represented By: DAVID C. KISTLER
Represented By: ANN ELIZABETH QUERNS
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Represented By: LEIGH ANN BUZIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA KOHUT
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Represented By: ANN ELIZABETH QUERNS
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID HARTLEY
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Represented By: ANN ELIZABETH QUERNS
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS MCGRADY
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Represented By: ANN ELIZABETH QUERNS
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SHORT
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Represented By: ANN ELIZABETH QUERNS
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN RHOADES
Represented By: DIANA C. MANNING
Represented By: BENJAMIN JAMES DILORENZO
Represented By: JED L. MARCUS
Represented By: ANN MARIE EFFINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BAIN CAPITAL
Represented By: JARRETT R. SCHINDLER
Represented By: DAVID LEIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?