WASHINGTON v. ELLIS et al
Plaintiff: RANDY WASHINGTON
Defendant: CHARLES ELLIS, T. FRIEL, MERCER COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER EMPLOYEES, MERCER COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER and MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF
Case Number: 3:2017cv07243
Filed: September 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Peter G. Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/15/2021. (abr, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 122 Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Judge Bongiovannis rulings are AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/2/2020. (jdb)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 02/19/2020. (jdb)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 09/18/2019. (jmh)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM ORDER that all claims against Defendant Mercer County Correctional Institution and Mercer County Sheriff are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Pro Bono Counsel is Denied without prejudice. JOHN DOE MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICERS added. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/3/2018. (km)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. Case Administratively Terminated. If Plaintiff whishes to reopen open the case he shall notify the Court within 30 days of the entry date of this order.. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/2/2017. (Blank IFP Application sent to Plaintiff via USPS.)(km)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WASHINGTON v. ELLIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY WASHINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. FRIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCER COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER EMPLOYEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCER COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?