FIELDTURF ARTIFICIAL TURF MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION
Plaintiff: BOROUGH OF CARTERET, COUNTY OF HUDSON, RANNEY SCHOOL, LAKEVIEW DAY CAMP, RICHARD GENTILE, STATE-OPERATED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEWARK, CHEROKEE CENTRAL SCHOOLS, THE CITY OF FREMONT, NEW CASTLE SCHOOL DISTRICT, TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD, THE PAW, INC., NESHANNOCK TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, LAKE TAHOE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, SANTA YNEZ VALLEY UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT, BROWNSVILLE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, LEVITTOWN UNION FREE SCHOOL DISTRICT, PAJARO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (PVUSD) and CHAFFEY JOINT UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT
Defendant: FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. and FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS
In Re: FIELDTURF ARTIFICIAL TURF MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2017md02779
Filed: June 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 164 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Vanessa M. Biondo to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9835612.) (KAMIN, CORREY)
July 23, 2019 Filing 163 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lindsey R. Skibell to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9835506.) (KAMIN, CORREY)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #155 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Vanessa M. Biondo, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/22/2019. (jem)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #154 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lindsey "Reid" R. Skibell, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/22/2019. (jem)
July 15, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by LARA BUESO BACH on behalf of FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. (BACH, LARA)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER that Alexis Kellert, Esq. withdraws as counsel for the Defendants in this matter and should no longer receive ECF notifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/27/2019. (jem)
June 27, 2019 Filing 158 Letter from Diane P. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Notice of Withdrawal)(SULLIVAN, DIANE)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 TEXT ORDER: Pending before the Court are the parties informal discovery disputes as well as their competing proposed schedules. The Court has determined to stay the entry of a schedule until after the discovery disputes are decided. The Court shall advise whether a hearing on the discovery disputes will be scheduled. Pending a decision on the aforementioned discovery disputes, the parties are directed to continue to exchange paper discovery as they are able. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 156 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J.. (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #155 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Vanessa M. Biondo, #154 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lindsey "Reid" R. Skibell. Motions set for 7/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
May 28, 2019 Filing 155 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Vanessa M. Biondo by FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Correy A. Kamin, #2 Certification of Vanessa M. Biondo, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KAMIN, CORREY)
May 28, 2019 Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lindsey "Reid" R. Skibell by FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Correy A. Kamin, #2 Certification of Lindsey "Reid" R. Skibell, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KAMIN, CORREY)
May 28, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by CORREY ANN KAMIN on behalf of FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KAMIN, CORREY)
May 22, 2019 Filing 152 Letter from Christopher A. Seeger re Joint Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
May 14, 2019 Filing 151 Letter from Christopher A. Seeger re Joint Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P1, #2 Exhibit P2, #3 Exhibit P3, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2, #6 Exhibit D-3, #7 Exhibit D-4, #8 Exhibit D-5, #9 Exhibit D-6, #10 Exhibit D-7, #11 Exhibit D-8, #12 Exhibit P4, #13 Exhibit D-9, #14 Exhibit P5, #15 Exhibit P6, #16 Exhibit D-10, #17 Exhibit P7, #18 Exhibit D-11, #19 Exhibit D-12)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
May 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ALEXIS KELLERT, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
May 7, 2019 Filing 150 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alexis Kellert to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9647250.) (SULLIVAN, DIANE)
April 29, 2019 Filing 149 Letter from Christopher A. Seeger re status update. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #145 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alexis Kellert, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/29/2019. (mmh)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 TEXT ORDER- The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 4/29/2019, with a written status update. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
April 12, 2019 Filing 146 Letter from Christopher A. Seeger to Hon. Tonianne J. Bongiovanni re: Meet and Confer. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
April 1, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 4/1/2019. The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 4/12/2019, with a written status update regarding the ESI discovery issue. (mm)
March 27, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #145 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexis Kellert. Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
March 26, 2019 Filing 145 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexis Kellert by FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Diane P. Sullivan, #2 Certification of Alexis Kellert, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SULLIVAN, DIANE)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 LETTER ORDER that Plaintiff shall initiate the Telephone Conference scheduled for 4/1/2019 at 1:00PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/18/2019. (km)
March 8, 2019 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. re #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (SULLIVAN, DIANE)
March 1, 2019 Filing 142 Letter from Christopher A. Seeger Re: Joint Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1, #2 Exhibit P-2, #3 Exhibit P-3, #4 Exhibit P-4, #5 Exhibit P-5, #6 Exhibit P-6, #7 Exhibit P-7, #8 Exhibit P-8, #9 Exhibit D-1, #10 Exhibit D-2, #11 Exhibit D-3, #12 Exhibit D-4, #13 Exhibit D-5)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
February 19, 2019 Filing 141 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by BOROUGH OF CARTERET, COUNTY OF HUDSON, LEVITTOWN UNION FREE SCHOOL DISTRICT, NESHANNOCK TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, SANTA YNEZ VALLEY UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT, STATE-OPERATED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEWARK, THE CITY OF FREMONT re #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 LETTER ORDER that the parties are directed to propound their initial discovery demands by 1/18/2019. The parties are to serve any objections to their adversary's demands by 2/18/2019. By 3/1/2019, the parties shall submit a single, joint letter to the Court outlining their limited remaining disputes. Plaintiffs' response to the pending partial motion to dismiss is due 2/18/2019. Defendants' reply is due by 3/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/19/2018. (mps)
December 17, 2018 Filing 139 Letter from Arvin Maskin re: Proposed Pretrial Schedule and Discovery Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SULLIVAN, DIANE)
December 17, 2018 Filing 138 Letter from Adam M. Moskowitz. (MOSKOWITZ, ADAM)
December 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KONRAD CAILTEUX and ARVIN MASKIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (eaj)
December 6, 2018 Filing 137 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Konrad Cailteux to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9220020.) (SULLIVAN, DIANE)
December 6, 2018 Filing 136 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Arvin Maskin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9220001.) (SULLIVAN, DIANE)
November 19, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON HEATHER SEMAYA on behalf of FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. (SEMAYA, ALLISON)
November 19, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 11/19/2018. A proposed schedule, which will also address the briefing schedule for the Motion to Dismiss [DE #132], shall be submitted by 12/17/2018. (mm)
November 19, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #132 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #128 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Arvin Maskin, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/16/2018. (mps)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #129 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Konrad Cailteux, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/16/2018. (mps)
November 16, 2018 Filing 132 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC.. Responses due by 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SULLIVAN, DIANE)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE AND ORDER of Withdrawal Of Counsel as to ELIZABETH JUSTINE GROSSMAN; JONATHAN HILLEL HURWITZ; ERIN JENNIFER MORGAN; GAVIN J. ROONEY; THEODORE V. WELLS, JR; ROBERT A. ATKINS and JOSEPH ALDO FISCHETTI. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/16/2018. (mps)
November 15, 2018 Filing 130 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Withdrawal and Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 15, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #129 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Konrad Cailteux, #128 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arvin Maskin. Motions set for 12/3/2018 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 8, 2018 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Konrad Cailteux by FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Diane P. Sullivan, #2 Certification of Konrad Cailteux, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SULLIVAN, DIANE)
November 8, 2018 Filing 128 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arvin Maskin by FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Diane P. Sullivan, #2 Certification of Arvin Maskin, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SULLIVAN, DIANE)
November 6, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE P. SULLIVAN on behalf of FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. (SULLIVAN, DIANE)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 TEXT ORDER: The status conference currently scheduled to take place on October 15, 2018 is hereby reset to November 16, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' are directed to initiate the conference. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER that FieldTurf shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint on or before 11/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/10/2018. (mps)
October 5, 2018 Filing 124 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER modifying the docket text re: docket entry #120 . Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/5/2018. (mmh)
October 2, 2018 Filing 122 Letter from Christopher A. Seeger re: Correction of Docket. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
October 2, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Amended Complaint d.e. #120 filed by Christopher A. Seeger on 10/1/2018 added parties not listed in the Amended Complaint. The Clerk's Office has removed these parties from the docket entry. In the future please enter all parties in capital letters. The Clerk's Office has made the correction to the docket. This message is for informational purposes only. (km)
October 1, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE by BOROUGH OF CARTERET, The City of Fremont of Change of Firm Name (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GIRARD, DANIEL)
October 1, 2018 Filing 120 AMENDED COMPLAINT - Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint against FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC., filed by BOROUGH OF CARTERET, THE CITY OF FREMONT, COUNTY OF HUDSON, LEVITTOWN UNION FREE SCHOOL DISTRICT, NESHANNOCK TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, STATE-OPERATED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEWARK, and SANTA YNEZ VALLEY UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 TEXT ORDER: The status conference currently scheduled to take place on September 24, 2018 is hereby reset to October 15, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiffs are directed to initiate the conference. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #91 Motion to Dismiss; Granting as to the state subclasses of which no Plaintiff is a member other than New York, New Jersey and Pennsylvania; Denied on all other grounds; Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Class Action Complaint within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/31/2018. (eaj)
August 31, 2018 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/31/2018. (eaj)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 TEXT ORDER: In light of status the status conference currently scheduled to take place on August 22, 2018 is hereby reset to September 24, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' are directed to initiate the conference. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 TEXT ORDER: The status conference currently scheduled to take place on July 19, 2018 is hereby reset to August 22, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. Plaintiffs are directed to initiate the conference. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 TEXT ORDER: The status telephone conference currently scheduled to take place on June 19, 2018 is hereby reset to July 19, 2018 at 3:30 p.m. Plaintiffs are directed to initiate the conference. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/18/2018. (eh, )
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TEXT ORDER: The status telephone conference currently scheduled to take place on May 16, 2018 is hereby reset to June 19, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiffs are directed to initiate the conference. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
April 20, 2018 Filing 112 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC. re #91 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 LETTER ORDER granting request that the date for filing of the Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss is extended by two (2) days. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/20/2018. (mps)
April 18, 2018 Filing 110 Letter from Robert A. Atkins to the Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J.. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 LETTER ORDER that a Telephone Status Conference is set for 5/16/2018 at 12:00 noon. Plaintiffs shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/17/2018. (mps)
April 6, 2018 Filing 108 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Honorable Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J.. (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 4, 2018 Filing 107 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J.. (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 30, 2018 Filing 106 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Honorable Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J.. (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 29, 2018 Filing 105 Transcript of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY ISSUES held on 3/22/2018, before Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Transcriber -Transcripts Plus, Inc. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 4/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2018. (kas, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 104 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney CHRISTOPHER BRENDAN HEALY terminated. (HEALY, CHRISTOPHER)
March 22, 2018 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone conference held regarding discovery issues held on 3/22/2018. Decision reserved. (DIGITALLY RECORDED) (mm)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without prejudice as to Civil Action 17-cv-4338. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/20/2018. (mps)
March 19, 2018 Filing 101 Letter from James E. Cecchi on behalf of all parties. (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 19, 2018 Filing 100 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BOROUGH OF CARTERET, COUNTY OF HUDSON, LEVITTOWN UNION FREE SCHOOL DISTRICT, NESHANNOCK TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, SANTA YNEZ VALLEY UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT, STATE-OPERATED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEWARK, The City of Fremont re #91 MOTION to Dismiss (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 19, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #99 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by JAMES E. CECCHI on 3/16/2018 appears to be filed in the incorrect case. PLEASE REVIEW and file it in 17-cv-4338. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
March 16, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 LETTER ORDER requesting parties to provide input on what impact, if any, that the #91 Motion to Dismiss will have on discovery issues. The parties are directed to submit letters on this issue by 3/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/15/2018. (mps)
February 2, 2018 Filing 97 Letter from Robert A. Atkins, Esq. to Hon. Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J. re #86 Letter. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 29, 2018 Filing 96 Transcript of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY ISSUES held on 1/23/2018, before Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Transcriber - Transcripts Plus, Inc. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 2/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2018. (kas)
January 29, 2018 Filing 95 Letter from Jonathan H. Hurwitz to the Honorable Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (HURWITZ, JONATHAN)
January 26, 2018 Per #83 Letter Order, deadlines as to #91 MOTION to Dismiss, have been re-set as follows: Responses due by 3/19/2018. Replies due by 4/18/2018. (gxh)
January 25, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER BRENDAN HEALY on behalf of BOROUGH OF CARTERET (HEALY, CHRISTOPHER)
January 25, 2018 Filing 93 Letter from Christopher B. Healy, Esq.. (HEALY, CHRISTOPHER)
January 23, 2018 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 1/23/2018 regarding discovery issues. Decision reserved.(DIGITALLY RECORDED) (mm)
January 22, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #91 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
January 18, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss by FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC.. Responses due by 3/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 18, 2018 Filing 90 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 9, 2018 Filing 89 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J. re #88 Letter. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 5, 2018 Filing 88 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #79 Letter, #85 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
December 18, 2017 Filing 87 Exhibit to #86 Letter by All Plaintiffs. (CECCHI, JAMES)
December 15, 2017 Filing 86 Letter from James E. Cecchi and Gavin J. Rooney to the Hon. Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(CECCHI, JAMES)
December 14, 2017 Filing 85 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to the Honorable Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J. re #79 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Daliere)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-3) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER ORDER setting the revised schedule for briefing the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is due 1/18/2018. Plaintiffs' opposition is due 3/19/2018. Defendants' reply to Plaintiffs' opposition is due 4/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/7/2017. (mps)
December 5, 2017 Filing 82 Letter from Robert A. Atkins re: extension of time. (ATKINS, ROBERT)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 LETTER ORDER granting request that the parties be permitted to submit moving and opposition briefs respectively of no greater than 60 pages in 14-point proportional font, and that defendants be permitted to file a reply brief of no greater than 25 pages in 14-point proportional font. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/30/2017. (mps)
November 29, 2017 Filing 80 Letter from Robert A. Atkins re: expansion of page limits. (ATKINS, ROBERT)
November 27, 2017 Filing 79 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 LETTER ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 1/23/2018 at 11:00 AM. A subsequent Status Conference is set for 3/22/2018 at 11:00 AM. Plaintiffs are directed to initiate both conferences. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/27/2017. (mps)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ESI AND PRODUCTION PROTOCOL STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/26/2017. (mps)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/26/2017. (mps)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due within 10 days of a decision on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/26/2017. (mps)
November 15, 2017 Filing 74 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ESI Protocol and [Proposed] Order, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Proposed DCO, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Proposed DCO, #4 Exhibit D - Blackline Comparison of DCOs)(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 10, 2017 Filing 73 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J. re #72 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 3, 2017 Filing 72 Letter from James E. Cecchi on behalf of all parties. (CECCHI, JAMES)
October 31, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE of Change of Address by BRADLEY KEITH KING (KING, BRADLEY)
October 25, 2017 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BOROUGH OF CARTERET, COUNTY OF HUDSON, LEVITTOWN UNION FREE SCHOOL DISTRICT, NESHANNOCK TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, SANTA YNEZ VALLEY UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT, STATE-OPERATED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEWARK, TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD, The City of Fremont re #69 Amended Complaint, - Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
October 20, 2017 Filing 69 AMENDED COMPLAINT - Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint against FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC., filed by COUNTY OF HUDSON, The City of Fremont, STATE-OPERATED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEWARK, NESHANNOCK TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, BOROUGH OF CARTERET, TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD, SANTA YNEZ VALLEY UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT.(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CASE MANAGMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/18/2017. (mps)
October 3, 2017 Filing 67 Letter from James E. Cecchi re consent Case Management Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Plaintiffs shall file the Consolidated Amended Complaint ("CAC") by 10/20/2017. Defendants shall file any Motion to Dismiss the CAC no later than 60 days from the date Plaintiffs file the CAC. Plaintiffs shall have 60 days therefrom to file any opposition to the motion. Defendants shall, in turn, have 30 days to file any reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/3/2017. (mps)
September 28, 2017 Filing 64 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order of MDL Panel (CTO - 2) transferring certain action to this court. (eh, )
September 26, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK JEFFREY DEARMAN on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD (DEARMAN, MARK)
August 22, 2017 Filing 62 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/28/2017, before Judge Michael J. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Court Reporter Cathy Ford (609-367-2777). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (km)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER APPOINTING LEAD COUNSEL AND PLAINTIFFS' EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE. Plaintiffs shall electronically file an amended consolidated case action complaint by 10/6/2017, which is forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/22/2017. (mps)
July 28, 2017 Filing 60 Letter from Lindborg & Mazor LLP. (LINDBORG, PETER)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MDL TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's instructions during the June 28, 2017 Initial Case Management Conference, all pending motions to dismiss in the MDL cases assigned to the Undersigned are administratively terminated. Plaintiffs shall file an amended consolidated class action complaint within forty-five days after resolution of the appointment of the leadership structure for Plaintiffs. Following the submission of the amended consolidated class action complaint, Defendants may answer or otherwise move. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/28/2017. (gxh)
July 26, 2017 Filing 58 Letter from Tina Wolfson in response to Rule 23(g) applications. (KING, BRADLEY)
July 26, 2017 Filing 57 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
July 24, 2017 Filing 56 Exhibit to #54 Letter by TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 24, 2017 Filing 55 Letter from Alexander Robertson, IV. (ROBERTSON, ALEXANDER)
July 24, 2017 Filing 54 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 24, 2017 Filing 53 Letter from Tina Wolfson re Rule 23(g) Application. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae, #2 Exhibit B - Diverse Teams Article, #3 Exhibit C - Female Lawyers Article)(KING, BRADLEY)
July 24, 2017 Filing 52 Letter from Zimmerman Reed LLP. (GUDMUNDSON, BRIAN)
July 24, 2017 Filing 51 Letter from Lindborg & Mazor on behalf of Chaffey Joint Union High School District. (LINDBORG, PETER)
July 24, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER ROBERTSON, IV on behalf of Cherokee Central Schools, Lake Tahoe Unified School District, NESHANNOCK TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, PAJARO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (PVUSD), SANTA YNEZ VALLEY UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT (ROBERTSON, ALEXANDER)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MDL TEXT ORDER: Responses to the Rule 23(g) applications shall be filed by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, July 26, 2017. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/21/2017. (gxh)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MDL LETTER ORDER directing that Rule 23(g) applications shall be filed by 5:00 p.m. on 7/24/2017. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/20/2017. (gxh)
July 20, 2017 Filing 47 Letter from Daniel K. Bryson. (BRYSON, DANIEL)
July 20, 2017 Filing 46 Letter from Steve W. Berman. (BERMAN, STEVE)
July 20, 2017 Filing 45 Letter from Mark J. Dearman re #44 Letter. (DEARMAN, MARK)
July 20, 2017 Filing 44 Letter from James E. Cecchi and Christopher A. Seeger. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 20, 2017 Filing 43 Letter from Matthew McCarley. (MCCARLEY, MATTHEW)
July 20, 2017 Filing 42 Letter from Carteret and Newark Counsel Regarding Joint Application for Leadership Positions re 40 Order,. (MOSKOWITZ, ADAM)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MDL TEXT ORDER: As discussed during the July 13, 2017 Telephone Conference, Plaintiffs' counsel shall submit their amended leadership structure proposal by Thursday, July 20, 2017 at noon (12:00 p.m.). So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/17/2017. (gxh)
July 17, 2017 Filing 41 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MARK JOE UYENO (mps)
July 17, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by HARRIS MICHAEL FISCHMAN on behalf of FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. (FISCHMAN, HARRIS)
July 13, 2017 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Telephone Conference held on 7/13/2017. Counsel are directed to meet and confer and to submit a second proposed leadership structure by July 20, 2017. (Court Reporter: CATHY FORD.) (gxh)
July 12, 2017 Filing 37 Letter from Robert A. Atkins, Esq.. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MDL TEXT ORDER: Upon review of the submission regarding the proposed leadership structure for Plaintiffs, the Court schedules a Telephone Conference for 7/13/2017 at 2:00 PM before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, P.C. shall be responsible for initiating the call. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/11/2017. (gxh)
July 11, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANGELICA ORNELAS and DANIEL C. GIRARD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
July 10, 2017 Filing 35 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Angelica Ornelas to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BEER, JEFFREY)
July 10, 2017 Filing 34 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel Girard to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BEER, JEFFREY)
July 7, 2017 Filing 33 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
July 6, 2017 Filing 32 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jennifer R. Scullion to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Payment Confirmation)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
July 6, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JENNIFER R. SCULLION, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MDL TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the June 20, 2017 Case Management Order No. 1 (ECF No. #13 ), the parties submitted joint correspondence, in pertinent part, related to the appointment of Lead Counsel and the submission of applications with respect to the Plaintiffs' leadership structure in this matter. By July 7, 2017, Plaintiffs shall e-file correspondence with their joint proposed leadership structure for the Court's consideration. If Plaintiffs do not reach an agreement with respect to their leadership structure, applications with respect to leadership positions and the leadership structure shall be electronically filed by July 7, 2017. Any responses to the applications shall be filed by July 12, 2017. The applications shall comply with the criteria set forth on pages three to four of the parties' June 27, 2017 correspondence. (ECF No. #21 .). So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/30/2017. (gxh)
June 29, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH JUSTINE GROSSMAN on behalf of FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. (GROSSMAN, ELIZABETH)
June 29, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN JENNIFER MORGAN on behalf of FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. (MORGAN, ERIN)
June 29, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN HILLEL HURWITZ on behalf of FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. (HURWITZ, JONATHAN)
June 29, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. ATKINS on behalf of FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. (ATKINS, ROBERT)
June 29, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MICHAEL R. LORIGAS, TAL J. LIFSHITZ and ADAM M. MOSKOWITZ, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. (mps) Modified on 7/5/2017 - L.Civ.R. 101.1 requirements are waived as to any attorney appearing in this action who is duly admitted to practice before any United States Court - see Letter Order #25 (gxh).
June 29, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, TINA WOLFSON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. (mps) Modified on 7/5/2017 - L.Civ.R. 101.1 requirements are waived as to any attorney appearing in this action who is duly admitted to practice before any United States Court - see Letter Order #25 (gxh).
June 28, 2017 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/28/2017. Correspondence as to the proposed leadership structure shall be filed by July 7, 2017. Applications with respect to leadership positions and leadership structure, if applicable, shall be electronically filed by July 7, 2017; responses shall be filed by July 12, 2017. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: CATHY FORD.) (gxh)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER ORDER dismissing #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/28/2017. (km)
June 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/28/2017. (mm)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER ORDER granting request for leave to appear telephonically at the initial conference on 6/28/2017 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/27/2017. (mps)
June 27, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELICA M. ORNELAS on behalf of BOROUGH OF CARTERET (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ORNELAS, ANGELICA)
June 27, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL C. GIRARD on behalf of BOROUGH OF CARTERET (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GIRARD, DANIEL)
June 27, 2017 Filing 21 Letter from James E. Cecchi on behalf of all parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: List of Related Cases)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 26, 2017 Filing 19 Letter from Tina Wolfson Requesting Telephonic Appearance at Initial Conference. (KING, BRADLEY)
June 26, 2017 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tina Wolfson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KING, BRADLEY)
June 26, 2017 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael Lorigas to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BEER, JEFFREY)
June 26, 2017 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tal J. Lifshitz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BEER, JEFFREY)
June 26, 2017 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Adam M. Moskowitz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BEER, JEFFREY)
June 21, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. GEORGE on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GEORGE, SCOTT)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1: The Court will hold an Initial Conference on 6/28/2017 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5W. By 6/27/2017 at 12:30 p.m. counsel must e-file joint correspondence. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/20/2017. (mps)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for defendant Lakeview to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended 45 days from the date of this order in Civil Case No. 17-3301. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/19/2017. (km)
June 19, 2017 Filing 12 Exhibit to #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
June 19, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of Jennifer R. Scullion submitted with the #11 Motion for Pro hac by Christopher A. Seeger on 6/16/2017 has not been signed. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT CERTIFICATION ONLY with a proper SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court (mps)
June 19, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jennifer R. Scullion, Esq.. Motion set for 7/17/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
June 16, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jennifer R. Scullion, Esq. by TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Christopher A. Seeger in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jennifer R. Scullion, #2 Certification Certification of Jennifer R. Scullion, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
June 16, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
June 16, 2017 Filing 9 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney enclosing proposed Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Respond to LakeView Day Camp's Initial Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
June 14, 2017 Filing 8 Letter from Lance J. Kalik to Court dated 6.14.17. (KALIK, LANCE)
June 14, 2017 Filing 7 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
June 13, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEVE W. BERMAN and JASON A. ZWEIG, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
June 12, 2017 Filing 6 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steve W. Berman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CRITCHLEY, MICHAEL)
June 12, 2017 Filing 5 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jason A. Zweig to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CRITCHLEY, MICHAEL)
June 9, 2017 Filing 4 Letter from Michael Critchley re #3 Letter. (CRITCHLEY, MICHAEL)
June 8, 2017 Filing 3 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney requesting an initial case management conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
June 1, 2017 Filing 2 MDL Notice to Counsel. (jjc)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Order of MDL Panel transferring certain actions to this court. (jjc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIELDTURF ARTIFICIAL TURF MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOROUGH OF CARTERET
Represented By: RYAN SETH MALC
Represented By: CURTIS M. PLAZA
Represented By: JEFFREY ALLEN BEER, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL M. DICICCO
Represented By: LANCE J. KALIK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BRENDAN HEALY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: ANGELICA M. ORNELAS
Represented By: DANIEL C. GIRARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF HUDSON
Represented By: MICHAEL D. CRITCHLEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANNEY SCHOOL
Represented By: MICHAEL D. CRITCHLEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKEVIEW DAY CAMP
Represented By: BRADLEY KEITH KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD GENTILE
Represented By: MICHAEL D. CRITCHLEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE-OPERATED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEWARK
Represented By: RYAN SETH MALC
Represented By: CURTIS M. PLAZA
Represented By: JEFFREY ALLEN BEER, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL M. DICICCO
Represented By: LANCE J. KALIK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHEROKEE CENTRAL SCHOOLS
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Represented By: PATRICK M WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CITY OF FREMONT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: DANIEL C. GIRARD
Represented By: Angelica Maria Ornelas
Represented By: JORDAN S. ELIAS
Represented By: ADAM E. POLK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW CASTLE SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD
Represented By: MARK JEFFREY DEARMAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: SCOTT A. GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PAW, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN C. GUDMUNDSON
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NESHANNOCK TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: D. Aaron Rihn
Represented By: ALEXANDER ROBERTSON, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKE TAHOE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Daniel K Bryson
Represented By: PATRICK M WALLACE
Represented By: ALEXANDER ROBERTSON, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTA YNEZ VALLEY UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: Daniel K Bryson
Represented By: PATRICK M WALLACE
Represented By: ALEXANDER ROBERTSON, IV
Represented By: Mark J Uyeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROWNSVILLE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEVITTOWN UNION FREE SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAJARO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (PVUSD)
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: Mark Joe Uyeno
Represented By: ALEXANDER ROBERTSON, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAFFEY JOINT UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: Irina J Mazor
Represented By: PETER F LINDBORG
Represented By: Jean-Rene Claude Basle
Represented By: Carol A Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIELDTURF USA, INC.
Represented By: GAVIN J. ROONEY
Represented By: JOSEPH ALDO FISCHETTI
Represented By: THEODORE V. WELLS, JR.
Represented By: ROBERT A. ATKINS
Represented By: JONATHAN HILLEL HURWITZ
Represented By: HARRIS MICHAEL FISCHMAN
Represented By: ELIZABETH JUSTINE GROSSMAN
Represented By: DIANE P. SULLIVAN
Represented By: ERIN JENNIFER MORGAN
Represented By: ALLISON HEATHER SEMAYA
Represented By: CORREY ANN KAMIN
Represented By: LARA BUESO BACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIELDTURF, INC.
Represented By: GAVIN J. ROONEY
Represented By: JOSEPH ALDO FISCHETTI
Represented By: THEODORE V. WELLS, JR.
Represented By: ROBERT A. ATKINS
Represented By: JONATHAN HILLEL HURWITZ
Represented By: HARRIS MICHAEL FISCHMAN
Represented By: ELIZABETH JUSTINE GROSSMAN
Represented By: DIANE P. SULLIVAN
Represented By: ERIN JENNIFER MORGAN
Represented By: ALLISON HEATHER SEMAYA
Represented By: CORREY ANN KAMIN
Represented By: LARA BUESO BACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARKETT INC.
Represented By: GAVIN J. ROONEY
Represented By: JOSEPH ALDO FISCHETTI
Represented By: ROBERT A. ATKINS
Represented By: JONATHAN HILLEL HURWITZ
Represented By: HARRIS MICHAEL FISCHMAN
Represented By: ELIZABETH JUSTINE GROSSMAN
Represented By: DIANE P. SULLIVAN
Represented By: ERIN JENNIFER MORGAN
Represented By: ALLISON HEATHER SEMAYA
Represented By: CORREY ANN KAMIN
Represented By: LARA BUESO BACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS
Represented By: GAVIN J. ROONEY
Represented By: JOSEPH ALDO FISCHETTI
Represented By: ROBERT A. ATKINS
Represented By: JONATHAN HILLEL HURWITZ
Represented By: HARRIS MICHAEL FISCHMAN
Represented By: ELIZABETH JUSTINE GROSSMAN
Represented By: DIANE P. SULLIVAN
Represented By: ERIN JENNIFER MORGAN
Represented By: ALLISON HEATHER SEMAYA
Represented By: CORREY ANN KAMIN
Represented By: LARA BUESO BACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: FIELDTURF ARTIFICIAL TURF MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?