VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al v. AIG INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA et al

Plaintiff: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. and AGMS, INC.
Defendant: IRONSHORE CANADA LTD, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, AIG INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA, TEMPLE INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AWH 2232, XL INSURANCE COMPANY SE, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE NAV 1221, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S UNDERWRITERS, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE BRT 2987, HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, ARCH INSURANCE CANADA LTD, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE HCC 4141, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE SJC 2003, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, EVEREST INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA, ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY and LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885)
Case Number: 3:2018cv00493
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Somerset
0 Judge: Lois H Goodman
1 Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2018 135 Featured Case TEXT ORDER that the in-person status conference previously scheduled for 08/20/2018 is hereby adjourned to 09/27/2018 at 2:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 08/16/2018. (Gonzalez, P)
August 15, 2018 134 AMENDED ANSWER to #77 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by IRONSHORE CANADA LTD. (CANONI, JOHN)
August 14, 2018 133 Featured Case ORDER granting #131 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/14/2018. (km)
August 13, 2018 132 Letter from Arleo & Donohue LLC to Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J.. (ARLEO, FRANK)
August 8, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #131 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
August 8, 2018 131 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims by IRONSHORE CANADA LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Answer (Blackline))(CANONI, JOHN)
July 18, 2018 130 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE SJC 2003.(VOUTYRAS, SARAH)
July 9, 2018 129 LETTER ROGATORY ISSUED, re: docket entries #123 , #124 , #125 , #126 , #127 , and #128 . (Original sent to Attorney per Request.) (km)
July 9, 2018 128 Featured Case ORDER and REQUEST for Issuance of Letter Rogatory with Respect to Canadian Person - Sean Murphy, President/Attorney in Fact in Canada, Lloyd's Canada, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/9/2018. (Original sent to Attorney per Request.)(km)
July 9, 2018 127 Featured Case ORDER and REQUEST for Issuance of Letter Rogatory with Respects to Canadian Person - Lloyd's Canada Inc. as Attorney in Fact. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/9/2018. (Original sent to Attorney per Request.) (km)
July 9, 2018 126 Featured Case ORDER and REQUEST for International Judicial Assistance (Letters Rogatory). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/9/2018. (Original sent to Attorney per Request.) (km)
July 9, 2018 125 Featured Case ORDER Granting Issuance of Letters Rogatory; re #124 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/9/2018. (Original sent to Attorney per Request.) (km)
June 25, 2018 124 Letter. (PASTOR, SHERILYN)
June 13, 2018 123 Featured Case ORDER granting #122 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/13/2018. (km)
June 12, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #122 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial. Motion set for 7/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
June 12, 2018 122 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE SJC 2003. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Answer (Redline))(VOUTYRAS, SARAH)
June 7, 2018 121 NOTICE of Appearance by SALLY A. CLEMENTS on behalf of ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY (CLEMENTS, SALLY)
May 23, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee in the amount of $ 150.00 received as to Alexis J. Rogoski, receipt number TRE091935 (km)
May 11, 2018 120 Transcript of Initial Conference held on 5/1/2018, before Judge Lois H. Goodman. Transcriber TRANSCRIPTS PLUS, INC. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 6/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2018. (km)
May 1, 2018 119 Featured Case ORDER granting #107 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alexis J. Rogoski. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/1/2018. (km)
May 1, 2018 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/1/2018. Discovery schedule set. Order to follow. (Court Reporter/Recorder Digitally.) (if, )
April 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, NATHAN R. LANDER, JOHH E. FAILLA, SETH B. SCHAFLER, RUSSELL T. GORKIN, OM V. ALLADI and SETH FIUR, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km)
April 27, 2018 117 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Seth D. Fiur to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8696317.) (PASTOR, SHERILYN)
April 27, 2018 116 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Om V. Alladi to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8696287.) (PASTOR, SHERILYN)
April 27, 2018 115 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Russell T. Gorkin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8696243.) (PASTOR, SHERILYN)
April 27, 2018 114 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Seth B. Schafler to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8696007.) (PASTOR, SHERILYN)
April 27, 2018 113 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John Failla to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8695819.) (PASTOR, SHERILYN)
April 27, 2018 112 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Nathan R. Lander to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8695762.) (PASTOR, SHERILYN)
April 25, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JESSE R. DUNBAR and KEVIN D. SZCZEPANSKI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km)
April 25, 2018 111 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kevin D. Szczepanski to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CANONI, JOHN)
April 25, 2018 110 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jesse R. Dunbar to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CANONI, JOHN)
April 24, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to Kevin D. Szczepanski, Esq. and Jesse R. Dunbar, Esq., receipt number TRE091049 (mps)
April 12, 2018 109 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Defendant XL INSURANCE COMPANY SE. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/12/2018. (km)
April 9, 2018 108 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to XL Insurance Company SE by XL INSURANCE COMPANY SE. (VOUTYRAS, SARAH)
April 4, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #107 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
April 3, 2018 107 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE SJC 2003. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Sarah F. Voutyras, Esq., #2 Certification of Alexis J. Rogoski, Esq., #3 Exhibit A - New York Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit B - Illinois Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(VOUTYRAS, SARAH)
April 2, 2018 106 Featured Case ORDER Granting leave to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin D. Szczepanski and Jesse R. Dunbar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 4/2/2018. (km)
March 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, BARRY STORK and RODERIC MCLAUCHLAN, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mmh)
March 23, 2018 105 ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
March 23, 2018 104 ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
March 23, 2018 103 ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
March 23, 2018 102 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by All Plaintiffs. (PASTOR, SHERILYN)
March 23, 2018 101 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Barry Stork to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8574116.) (KOEPFF, PAUL)
March 23, 2018 100 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Roderic McLauchlan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8574024.) (KOEPFF, PAUL)
March 23, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Requests for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by Paul Koepff on 3/22/2018 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has been admitted and the application fee paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. (mmh)
March 22, 2018 99 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice RODERIC MCLAUCHLAN to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KOEPFF, PAUL)
March 22, 2018 98 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice BARRY STORK to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KOEPFF, PAUL)
March 22, 2018 97 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AWH 2232. (KOEPFF, PAUL)
March 19, 2018 96 Featured Case THIRD STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending the time to answer, move, or otherwise reply until 3/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/19/2018. (km) Modified on 4/2/2018 (eaj, ).
March 19, 2018 95 Featured Case ORDER granting #58 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John E. Failla, Seth B. Schafler, Nathan R. Lander, Russell T. Gorkin, Seth D. Fiur, and Om V. Alladi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/19/2018. (km)
March 16, 2018 94 STIPULATION (Third) Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to the Complaint by XL INSURANCE COMPANY SE. (VOUTYRAS, SARAH)
March 8, 2018 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARCH INSURANCE CANADA LTD identifying Arch Capital Group Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (LAYDEN, DANIEL)
March 8, 2018 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE BRT 2987, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE HCC 4141, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE NAV 1221, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA. (BROWN, MELISSA)
March 6, 2018 91 NOTICE of Appearance by LEONARD SARMIENTO on behalf of LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AWH 2232 (SARMIENTO, LEONARD)
March 2, 2018 90 ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
March 2, 2018 89 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against AGMS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. by ARCH INSURANCE CANADA LTD.(LAYDEN, DANIEL)
March 2, 2018 88 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AWH 2232.(KOEPFF, PAUL)
March 2, 2018 87 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against AGMS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. by TEMPLE INSURANCE COMPANY.(ROSATO, STEVEN)
March 2, 2018 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIG INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA. (ARLEO, FRANK)
March 2, 2018 85 ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
March 2, 2018 84 FIRST ANSWER to Complaint OF ARLEO & DONOHUE, LLC by AIG INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ARLEO, FRANK)
March 2, 2018 83 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by EVEREST INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SATINE, DAVID)
March 2, 2018 82 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE SJC 2003. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VOUTYRAS, SARAH)
March 1, 2018 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY. (COUGHLIN, KEVIN)
March 1, 2018 80 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COUGHLIN, KEVIN)
March 1, 2018 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Certificate of Service, #9 Certificate of Service, #10 Certificate of Service, #11 Certificate of Service, #12 Certificate of Service, #13 Certificate of Service, #14 Certificate of Service, #15 Certificate of Service, #16 Certificate of Service)(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
March 1, 2018 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IRONSHORE CANADA LTD identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. (ultimate parent) as Corporate Parent.. (CANONI, JOHN)
March 1, 2018 77 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by IRONSHORE CANADA LTD.(CANONI, JOHN)
March 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to Joseph G. Finnerty III, Esq. and John Vukelj, Esq., receipt number TRE089306 (mps)
March 1, 2018 76 STIPULATION (Second) Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to the Complaint by XL INSURANCE COMPANY SE. (VOUTYRAS, SARAH)
February 27, 2018 75 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons on 1-10-2018, filed by AGMS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (PASTOR, SHERILYN)
February 27, 2018 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons on 1-9-2018, filed by AGMS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
February 27, 2018 73 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons on 1-8-2018, filed by AGMS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
February 27, 2018 72 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons on 1-5-2018, filed by AGMS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Affidavit, #10 Affidavit, #11 Affidavit, #12 Affidavit, #13 Affidavit, #14 Affidavit, #15 Affidavit, #16 Affidavit)(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
February 23, 2018 71 Certification of John Vukelj on behalf of TEMPLE INSURANCE COMPANY Re #66 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear. (ROSATO, STEVEN)
February 23, 2018 70 Certification of Joseph G. Finnerty III on behalf of TEMPLE INSURANCE COMPANY Re #66 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear. (ROSATO, STEVEN)
February 21, 2018 69 Featured Case ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Roderic McLauchl and Barry Stork. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/21/2018. (km) Modified on 3/6/2018 (km, ).
February 20, 2018 68 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply by ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY. (COUGHLIN, KEVIN)
February 20, 2018 67 NOTICE by IRONSHORE CANADA LTD (Attachments: #1 Certification Canoni Certification, #2 Certification Szczepanski Certification, #3 Certification Dunbar Certification, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CANONI, JOHN)
February 20, 2018 66 Featured Case ORDER granting #59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph G. Finnerty III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/20/2018. (km)
February 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHRISTOPHER T. CONRAD, DAVID A. WILFORD, SABINA B. DANEK and RONALD P. SCHILLER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km)
February 15, 2018 65 COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE BRT 2987, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE NAV 1221, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE HCC 4141.(ROBINS, SEAN)
February 15, 2018 64 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ronald P. Schiller, Esquire to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LAYDEN, DANIEL)
February 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Ronald P. Schiller, Esq., receipt number TRE088896 (mps)
February 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $450 received as to Christopher T. Conrad, Esq., David A. Wilford, Esq., and Sabina B. Danek, Esq., receipt number TRE088899 (mps)
February 15, 2018 63 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sabrina A. Danek to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BROWN, MELISSA)
February 15, 2018 62 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David A. Wilford to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BROWN, MELISSA)
February 15, 2018 61 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher T. Conrad to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BROWN, MELISSA)
February 15, 2018 60 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE BRT 2987, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE HCC 4141, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE NAV 1221.(BROWN, MELISSA)
February 15, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 14, 2018 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by TEMPLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification Steven M Rosato in Support of pro hac vice Applications, #2 Certification of Joseph G. Finnerty III in Support of pro hac vice Application, #3 Certification of John Vukelj in Support of pro hac vice Application, #4 Text of Proposed Order granting admission pro hac vice applications for Joseph G. Finnerty III and John Vukelj)(ROSATO, STEVEN)
February 14, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 13, 2018 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of S. Pastor, #2 Certification Certification of J. Failla, #3 Certification Certification of S. Schafler, #4 Certification Certification of Lander, #5 Certification Certification of Gorkin, #6 Certification Certification of S. Fiur, #7 Certification Certification of Alladi, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
February 13, 2018 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEMPLE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Mnchener Rckversicherungs-Gesellschaft as Corporate Parent.. (ROSATO, STEVEN)
February 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 9, 2018 56 ANSWER to Counterclaim OF CERTAIN COUNTER-PLAINTIFFS, ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
February 9, 2018 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AWH 2232. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul R. Koepff, Esq., #2 Certification of Roderic McLauchlan, Esq., #3 Certification of Barry Stork, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order)(KOEPFF, PAUL)
February 8, 2018 54 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher T. Conrad, Esq., David A. Wilford, Esq., and Sabina B. Danek, Esq. The #49 Motion is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/8/2018. (mps) Modified on 2/22/2018 (eaj, ).
February 8, 2018 53 Featured Case ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ronald P. Schiller, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/8/2018. (mps)
February 7, 2018 52 NOTICE by XL INSURANCE COMPANY SE re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (VOUTYRAS, SARAH)
February 5, 2018 51 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER that the time for Defendants Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London subscribing to Policy No. B0509FINMW1500618 via Syndicate NAV 1221, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London subscribing to Policy No. B0509FINMW1500630, and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London subscribing to Policy No. 150142820113 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 2/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/5/2018. (km)
February 5, 2018 50 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendants Lloyd's Syndicate SJC 2003 and XL Insurance Company SE to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 3/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/5/2018. (mps)
February 5, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 5, 2018 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE BRT 2987, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE HCC 4141, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE NAV 1221, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Melissa Brown in support of application, #2 Certification of Christopher T. Conrad, #3 Certification of David A. Wilford, #4 Certification of Sabina B. Danek, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, MELISSA)
February 2, 2018 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AGMS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (PASTOR, SHERILYN)
February 2, 2018 47 ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(PASTOR, SHERILYN)
February 2, 2018 46 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, extending time to answer, move or otherwise reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE BRT 2987, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE HCC 4141, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE NAV 1221. (BROWN, MELISSA)
February 2, 2018 45 NOTICE by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE SJC 2003 re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (VOUTYRAS, SARAH)
February 2, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Pro Hac Vice Certifications attached to d.e. #44 submitted by Melissa Brown on 2/2/2018 contains an improper signatures. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km)
February 2, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 2, 2018 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE BRT 2987, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE HCC 4141, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE NAV 1221, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA. (Attachments: #1 Certification in support, #2 Certification of Christopher T. Conrad, #3 Certification of David A. Wilford, #4 Certification of Sabina B. Danek, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, MELISSA)
February 2, 2018 43 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN on behalf of LLOYD'S SYNDICATE BRT 2987, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE HCC 4141, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE NAV 1221 (BROWN, MELISSA)
January 31, 2018 42 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN MICHAEL ROSATO on behalf of TEMPLE INSURANCE COMPANY (ROSATO, STEVEN)
January 31, 2018 41 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. LEONARD on behalf of EVEREST INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA (LEONARD, JEFFREY)
January 29, 2018 40 Featured Case ORDER that he deadline for Defendant Arch Insurance Canada Ltd. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended 3/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/29/2018. (km)
January 29, 2018 39 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID IAN SATINE on behalf of EVEREST INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA (SATINE, DAVID)
January 29, 2018 38 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER that the parties time for Everest to answer, move or otherwise reply to the Complaint extended to 3/2/2018; that a facsimile, photocopy or other electronic reproduction of this Stipulation shall have the same force and effect as the original. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/29/2018. (km)
January 29, 2018 37 Featured Case ORDER that he deadline for Defendant Temple Insurance Company to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended 3/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/29/2018. (km) (Main Document 37 replaced on 1/31/2018) (km, ).
January 29, 2018 36 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. SCHIAVONE on behalf of EVEREST INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA (SCHIAVONE, JOSEPH)
January 29, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
January 26, 2018 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ARCH INSURANCE CANADA LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Statement, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LAYDEN, DANIEL)
January 26, 2018 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EVEREST INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA identifying Everest Underwriting Group (Ireland) Limited as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SATINE, DAVID)
January 26, 2018 33 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. LAYDEN on behalf of ARCH INSURANCE CANADA LTD (LAYDEN, DANIEL)
January 26, 2018 32 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE REPLY by AIG INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA. (ARLEO, FRANK)
January 25, 2018 31 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by IRONSHORE CANADA LTD. (CANONI, JOHN)
January 25, 2018 30 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH F. VOUTYRAS on behalf of LLOYD'S SYNDICATE SJC 2003, XL INSURANCE COMPANY SE (VOUTYRAS, SARAH)
January 25, 2018 29 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AWH 2232. (KOEPFF, PAUL)
January 25, 2018 28 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to the Complaint by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE SJC 2003, XL INSURANCE COMPANY SE. (VOUTYRAS, SARAH)
January 24, 2018 27 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN CANONI on behalf of IRONSHORE CANADA LTD (CANONI, JOHN)
January 23, 2018 26 Featured Case ORDER granting #24 Motion to Strike docket entries #15 and #16 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/23/2018. (km)
January 22, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Strike #15 Answer to Complaint,, #16 Counterclaim,, . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
January 22, 2018 25 NOTICE of Appearance by SUZANNE COCCO MIDLIGE on behalf of ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY (MIDLIGE, SUZANNE)
January 22, 2018 24 MOTION to Strike #15 Answer to Complaint,, #16 Counterclaim,, by ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA. Responses due by 2/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Sean Robins, Esquire, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ROBINS, SEAN)
January 22, 2018 23 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN T. COUGHLIN on behalf of ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY (COUGHLIN, KEVIN)
January 22, 2018 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA re #19 Counterclaim,, (ROBINS, SEAN)
January 22, 2018 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA re #20 Answer to Complaint,, (ROBINS, SEAN)
January 22, 2018 20 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA.(ROBINS, SEAN)
January 22, 2018 19 COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886.(ROBINS, SEAN)
January 22, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Counterclaim d.e. #18 submitted by Sean Robins on 1/19/2018 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km)
January 19, 2018 18 COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200.(ROBINS, SEAN)
January 19, 2018 17 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA.(ROBINS, SEAN)
January 19, 2018 16 STRICKEN - COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY.(KELLY, SEAN) Modified on 1/23/2018 (km).
January 19, 2018 15 STRICKEN - ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA.(KELLY, SEAN) Modified on 1/23/2018 (km).
January 19, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2018 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/1/2018. (km)
January 19, 2018 13 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE REPLY by ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY. (COUGHLIN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JOANN K. DOBRANSKY on behalf of AIG INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA (DOBRANSKY, JOANN)
January 19, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK P. ARLEO on behalf of AIG INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA (ARLEO, FRANK)
January 18, 2018 10 NOTICE by TEMPLE INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (ROSATO, STEVEN)
January 17, 2018 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BENJAMIN, ROBERT)
January 17, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL R. KOEPFF on behalf of LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AWH 2232 (KOEPFF, PAUL)
January 16, 2018 7 NOTICE by AIG INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Joinder in Removal (DONOHUE, TIMOTHY)
January 16, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY MICHAEL DONOHUE on behalf of AIG INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA (DONOHUE, TIMOTHY)
January 16, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN on behalf of ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA (BROWN, MELISSA)
January 12, 2018 4 NOTICE by ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885), LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210, LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886, LLOYD'S UNDERWRITERS, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA re #1 Notice of Removal, (KELLY, SEAN)
January 12, 2018 3 Featured Case TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman for all further proceedings. Judge Anne E. Thompson, Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/12/2018. (jjc)
January 12, 2018 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jjc, )
January 12, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against AGMS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BENJAMIN, ROBERT)
January 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey Somerset County Law Division, case number SOM-L-1483-17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8393599), filed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(BENJAMIN, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al v. AIG INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRONSHORE CANADA LTD
Represented By: JOHN CANONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE CVS 1919
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE INA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA
Represented By: FRANK P. ARLEO
Represented By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL DONOHUE
Represented By: JOANN K. DOBRANSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN MICHAEL ROSATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ANV 1861
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AWH 2232
Represented By: PAUL R. KOEPFF
Represented By: LEONARD SARMIENTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL INSURANCE COMPANY SE
Represented By: SARAH F. VOUTYRAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE NAV 1221
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, A DIVISION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S UNDERWRITERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE ARGO 1200
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE BRT 2987
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: PATRICK STOLTZ
Represented By: ROBERT A. BENJAMIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MITSUI 3210
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE QBE 1886
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCH INSURANCE CANADA LTD
Represented By: DANIEL J. LAYDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE HCC 4141
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE SJC 2003
Represented By: SARAH F. VOUTYRAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE AMA 1200
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S SYNDICATE MIT 3210
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVEREST INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA
Represented By: JEFFREY S. LEONARD
Represented By: DAVID IAN SATINE
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SCHIAVONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SALLY A. CLEMENTS
Represented By: SUZANNE COCCO MIDLIGE
Represented By: KEVIN T. COUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD'S CONSORTIUM 9885 (A/K/A STARR FINANCIAL LINES CONSORTIUM 9885)
Represented By: SEAN ROBINS
Represented By: SEAN X. KELLY
Represented By: MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: GITA F. ROTHSCHILD
Represented By: SHERILYN PASTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: GITA F. ROTHSCHILD
Represented By: SHERILYN PASTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGMS, INC.
Represented By: GITA F. ROTHSCHILD
Represented By: SHERILYN PASTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?