CUDJOE v. VENTURES TRUST 2013I-H-R BY MCM CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLP et al

Plaintiff: MARY CUDJOE
Defendant: VENTURES TRUST 2013I-H-R BY MCM CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLP, BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP, KELLER WILLIAMS MONMOUTH OCEAN, IFTIKHAR HAQ, COLDWELL RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE, FREEMAN JEFFREY SMITH, WILLIAM BRAUKMANN, KIMBERLY BRAUKMANN, JOHN DOES NOS. 1-10 and ABC CORPORATION NOS. 1-10
Case Number: 3:2018cv10158
Filed: June 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Hunterdon
Presiding Judge: Anne E. Thompson
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 8/16/2019. (jem)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part Defendant Ventures Trust's 72 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; the Second Amended Complaint 79 is DISMISSED as to Defendant Ventures Trust on Count Five (conspiracy). Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 7/22/2019. (jem)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 5/15/2019. (jem)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff's 48 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend is granted. Defendant Ventures Trust 2013I-H-R's 45 Motion to Dismiss is dismissed as moot. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint by 4/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 4/9/2019. (mps)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 2/26/2019. (jem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUDJOE v. VENTURES TRUST 2013I-H-R BY MCM CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY CUDJOE
Represented By: KIRSTEN B. ENNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VENTURES TRUST 2013I-H-R BY MCM CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLER WILLIAMS MONMOUTH OCEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IFTIKHAR HAQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLDWELL RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREEMAN JEFFREY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BRAUKMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY BRAUKMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES NOS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION NOS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?