TUORTO v. HARENBERG et al
Plaintiff: KAREN J. TUORTO
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. and JOANNE L. HARENBERG
Case Number: 3:2018cv12179
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 11/5/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER granting request for an adjournment of one cycle as to the #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/27/2018. (mps)
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 Letter from Joseph F. Trinity, Esq.. (TRINITY, JOSEPH)
September 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEPHANIE R. REISS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stephanie Reiss to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9034546.) (ROSENBLATT, RICHARD)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Stephanie R. Reiss, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/18/2018. (mps)
September 13, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 10/15/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by JOANNE L. HARENBERG re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant, American Water Works (DIFAZIO, SALVATORE)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.. (ROSENBLATT, RICHARD)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses by JOANNE L. HARENBERG.(DIFAZIO, SALVATORE)
September 6, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.. Responses due by 9/17/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Andy Markwardt, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andy Markwardt, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Andy Markwardt)(ROSENBLATT, RICHARD)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RUDOLPH J. BURSHNIC on behalf of AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. (BURSHNIC, RUDOLPH)
August 24, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JOANNE L. HARENBERG has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/6/2018. (mps)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Joanne L. Harenberg.. (DIFAZIO, SALVATORE)
August 22, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/6/2018. (mps)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (ROSENBLATT, RICHARD)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint CCS and Summons served on American Water and Joanne Harenberg on August 2, 2018, filed by KAREN J. TUORTO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service J. Harenberg Certificate of Service)(TRINITY, JOSEPH)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC., JOANNE L. HARENBERG. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
July 30, 2018 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jem)
July 30, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC., JOANNE L. HARENBERG, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORP. 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8916765) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KAREN J. TUORTO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(TRINITY, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TUORTO v. HARENBERG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD G. ROSENBLATT
Represented By: RUDOLPH J. BURSHNIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANNE L. HARENBERG
Represented By: SALVATORE P. DIFAZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN J. TUORTO
Represented By: JOSEPH F. TRINITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?