BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al v. LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA et al
Plaintiff: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG and BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH
Defendant: LUPIN LIMITED and LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA
Case Number: 3:2018cv12663
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Rachel A. Smoot, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Katie A. Boda, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Matthew V. Anderson, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tara M. Raghavan, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Deanne M. Mazzochi, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Paul J. Molino, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William A. Rakoczy, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 21, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, WILLIAM A. RAKOCZY, PAUL J. MOLINO, DEANNE M. MAZZOCHI, TARA M. RAGHAVAN, MATTHEW V. ANDERSON, KATIE BODA and RACHEL A. SMOOT, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (km)
September 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee received in the amount of $ 1,050.00 as to William A. Rakoczy, Esq., Paul J. Molino, Esq., Deanne M. Mazzochi, Esq., Tara M. Raghavan, Esq., Matthew V. Anderson, Esq., Katie A. Boda, Esq., and Rachel A. Smoot, Esq., receipt number TRE095551 (km)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to William A. Rakoczy, Esq., Paul J. Molino, Esq., Deanne M. Mazzochi, Esq., Tara M. Raghavan, Esq., Matthew V. Anderson, Esq., Katie A. Boda, Esq., and Rachel A. Smoot, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/31/2018. (eaj)
August 28, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of William A. Rakoczy, Esq., Paul J. Molino, Esq., Deanne M. Mazzochi, Esq., Tara M. Raghavan, Esq., Matthew V. Anderson, Esq., Katie A. Boda, Esq., and Rachel A. Smoot, Esq. for by LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA, LUPIN LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William A. Rakoczy, Esq., #2 Declaration of Paul J. Molino, Esq., #3 Declaration of Deanne M. Mazzochi, Esq., #4 Declaration of Tara M. Raghavan, Esq., #5 Declaration of Matthew V. Anderson, Esq., #6 Declaration of Katie A. Boda, Esq., #7 Declaration of Rachel A. Smoot, Esq., #8 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 23, 2018 Filing 13 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Complaint.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA, LUPIN LIMITED (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. SOOS on behalf of LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA, LUPIN LIMITED (SOOS, JEFFREY)
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA, LUPIN LIMITED (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 23, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #13 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA, LUPIN LIMITED has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/30/2018. (km)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH. LUPIN LIMITED waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH. LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LEIGH MOSES on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (MOSES, DAVID)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (BATON, WILLIAM)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA, LUPIN LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jem)
August 13, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: This complaint has previously been opened as 3:18-cv-12662. In the event an error is made during the case opening process please call (609)989-2065 for assistance. DO NOT create a new case. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
August 13, 2018 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jem)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA, LUPIN LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8947327), filed by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al v. LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LIMITED
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?