BROWN v. MJH HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH M. BROWN
Defendant: ROBERT GOLDSMITH, MJH ASSOCIATES, INC., MICHAEL J. HENNESSY AND ASSOCIATES, INC. and MJH HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv13283
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MICHAEL J. HENNESSY AND ASSOCIATES, INC., ROBERT GOLDSMITH, MJH HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, LLC, MJH ASSOCIATES, INC. has been DENIED. The 14 day Clerk's Extension Application contains incorrect information regarding the date of service and answer deadline. Please review the #4 Waiver of Service filed on 9/4/2018. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants, MJH Healthcare Holdings, LLC; Michael J. Hennessy and Associates, Inc.; MJH Associates, Inc.; and Robert Goldsmith.. (PASSANNANTE, JENNIFER)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER ANN PASSANNANTE on behalf of All Defendants (PASSANNANTE, JENNIFER)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELIZABETH M. BROWN. ROBERT GOLDSMITH waiver sent on 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; MICHAEL J. HENNESSY AND ASSOCIATES, INC. waiver sent on 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; MJH ASSOCIATES, INC. waiver sent on 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; MJH HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, LLC waiver sent on 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (KARPF, ARI)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY STEVEN SEILER on behalf of ELIZABETH M. BROWN (SEILER, TIMOTHY)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ROBERT GOLDSMITH, MICHAEL J. HENNESSY AND ASSOCIATES, INC., MJH ASSOCIATES, INC., MJH HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
August 28, 2018 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jem)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT GOLDSMITH, MICHAEL J. HENNESSY AND ASSOCIATES, INC., MJH ASSOCIATES, INC., MJH HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8985239) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELIZABETH M. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(KARPF, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. MJH HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GOLDSMITH
Represented By: JENNIFER ANN PASSANNANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJH ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER ANN PASSANNANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. HENNESSY AND ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER ANN PASSANNANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJH HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JENNIFER ANN PASSANNANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH M. BROWN
Represented By: ARI R. KARPF
Represented By: TIMOTHY STEVEN SEILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?